Carla Holmes Hines
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00538 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[6] Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/14/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 18-00538-DSC Carla Holmes Hines Chapter 7 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: admin Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: def005 Total Noticed: 2 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 14, 2018. db +Carla Holmes Hines, 452 Russet Hill Road, Birmingham, AL 35244-8225 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 01:29:22 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 TOTAL: 1 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 14, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 10, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Andre' M Toffel trustee@toffelpc.com, jcraft@toffelpc.com;atoffel@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Carla Holmes Hines brent@brentwdavis.com, bwdllcmyecfmail@gmail.com;brentwdavisassociatesllc@gmail.com;r41804@notify.bestcase.com TOTAL: 2 Case 18-00538-DSC7 Doc 9 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 Def−005 [Notice to File Certification] (Rev. 12/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 18−00538−DSC7 Carla Holmes Hines Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−9401 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE A CERTIFICATION ABOUT A FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT COURSE (Official Form 423) Notice is hereby given that, subject to limited exceptions, a Debtor must complete an instructional course in personal financial management in order to receive a discharge under chapter 7 (11 U.S.C. § 727) or chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. § 1328). Generally, financial course providers will file a certificate with the Court to indicate that the Debtor has completed the course. If the course provider fails to file the certificate, a Debtor must complete and file Certification About a Financial Management Course (Official Form 423) pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007(b)(7). If Rule 1007(b)(7) requires a Debtor to file Official Form 423 and a Debtor fails to do so, the Court will not enter a discharge and will close the case. If a Debtor subsequently files a Motion to Reopen the Case to allow for the filing of the Official Form 423, the full reopening fee must be paid for filing the motion, and the fee cannot be waived. Depending on the circumstances, the Court may order the Debtor's attorney to pay the reopening fee instead of the Debtor. Dated: February 10, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court Case 18-00538-DSC7 Doc 9 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/09/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Carla Holmes Hines
3
02/09/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Carla Holmes Hines.
4
02/09/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Carla Holmes Hines.
02/09/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00538-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21706291. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
02/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/12/2018 at 01:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 05/11/2018.
6
02/10/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
02/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 02/11/2018.
02/12/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Carla Holmes Hines Case Number 96-03422, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/20/1996, Standard Discharge on 06/11/1998.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/12/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 2/12/2018.
02/12/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Carla Holmes Hines Case Number 96-03422, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/20/1996, Standard Discharge on 06/11/1998.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
02/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[6] Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/14/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.