Carleatha W. Cunningham
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01387 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
doc
05/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/15/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/08/2018
Objection to Claim(s)
51
10/23/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Public)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.