Carlson v. Luna
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cv-00165 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
104
07/30/2018
Status Report
08/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
106
10/25/2018
Appoint Counsel
107
10/25/2018
Notice (Other)
108
10/26/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
109
11/01/2018
Notice of Appearance
110
11/01/2018
Notice of Appearance
11/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.