Carol A. Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00033 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/31/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/31/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/31/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
02/01/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
02/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
02/04/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
02/04/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
02/14/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
13
02/14/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
14
02/14/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
15
02/14/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
16
02/14/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
17
02/14/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
18
02/14/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
02/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/26/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
20
02/27/2019
Request for Special Notice
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
03/14/2019
Certificate of Service
22
03/14/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
23
03/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
03/27/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/29/2019
Proceeding Memo
25
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
26
04/08/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
27
04/15/2019
Extend Time
28
04/17/2019
Employ (CM41)
29
04/17/2019
Declaration
30
04/17/2019
Extend Time
31
04/17/2019
Employ

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.