Carol Ann Martin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00125 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
07/17/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
19
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
07/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
07/30/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
22
07/31/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
23
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/03/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.