Carolyn J Boykin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81556 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/30/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
20
09/11/2018
Notice of Filing Claim by Debtor or Trustee
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.