Carolyn M Moody
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80482 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
doc
05/21/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/23/2018
Approving
doc
05/23/2018
Approving
48
01/30/2019
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay
49
01/30/2019
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
01/30/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
01/31/2019
Relief from Stay
52
01/31/2019
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay
53
01/31/2019
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
01/31/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
03/20/2019
Limit Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.