Carr v. Williams
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cv-00131 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
54
05/22/2018
Status Report
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
08/13/2018
Status Report
08/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
11/24/2018
Status Report
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.