Carroll v. Enterprise Mortgage, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

1:1998-cv-01199 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 692 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/22/1998
DEMAND for jury trial by Sam Carroll III (dkt clerk)
2
10/22/1998
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Enterprise Mortgage & Kenneth A. Saverin to the Circuit Court of Dale County, AL. Referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (dkt clerk) Modified on 10/28/1998
3
10/22/1998
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Enterprise Mortgage & Kenneth A. Saverin to Plaintiff and his counsel. Referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (dkt clerk)
10/28/1998
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for all parties (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/28/1998
File referred to Mag. Judge Walker (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/28/1998
MOTION by Enterprise Mortgage & Kenneth A. Saverin to Dismiss Claims against defendants. Referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (dkt clerk)
5
10/28/1998
MOTION by Sam Carroll III for Default as to Enterprise Mortgage, Kenneth A. Saverin referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker WITHDRAWAL PER STAMPED ORDER OF 11/5/98 (vmc) Modified on 11/05/1998
6
10/29/1998
RESPONSE by Enterprise Mortgage & Kenneth A. Saverin in Opposition to [5-1] motion for Default as to Enterprise Mortgage & Kenneth A. Saverin by Sam Carroll III; (Exhibit A attached). Referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (dkt clerk)
7
11/02/1998
ORDER, brief in support due by 11/10/98 for Kenneth A. Saverin, for Enterprise Mortgage, Response to Motion reset to 11/17/98 for [4-1] motion to Dismiss Claims against defendants [4-1] motion to Dismiss Claims against defendants by Kenneth A. Saverin, Enterprise Mortgage set for submission on 11/17/98; that if the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned Magistrate Judge, they must each confirm their consent by completing the attached consent form and sending it to the Clerk of the Court by 11/17/98; (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel.
8
11/02/1998
MOTION by Sam Carroll III to Withdraw [5-1] motion for Default as to Enterprise Mortgage, Kenneth A. Saverin by Sam Carroll III ; referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
11/05/1998
Stamped ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Withdraw [5-1] motion for Default as to Enterprise Mortgage, Kenneth A. Saverin by Sam Carroll III terminating [5-1] motion for Default as to Enterprise Mortgage, Kenneth A. Saverin (by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/06/1998
MOTION by Enterprise Mortgage, Kenneth A. Saverin for Extension of Time for briefing ; referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
10
11/12/1998
RESPONSE by Sam Carroll III to [9-1] motion for Extension of Time for briefing by Kenneth A. Saverin, Enterprise Mortgage referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
11/17/1998
Stamped ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Extension of Time for briefing, brief in support due by 11/24/98 for Kenneth A. Saverin, for Enterprise Mortgage (by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/1998
CASE reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson (ydw) Modified on 11/30/1998 (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
11/23/1998
ORDER, setting Rule 16 Status Conference 8:15 12/7/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson, in Montgomery, AL ; If any attorney desires that the conference be conducted by telephone, he or she must arrange for the telephone conference call; the attorney must also notify the court and all other attorneys of the arrangement at least two days prior to the status conference; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW and MT.
12
11/25/1998
MOTION by Sam Carroll III for continuance of status conference set for 12/7/98 at 8:15 AM ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
13
12/08/1998
ORDER that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with leave to the parties, within 45 days, to stipulate to a different basis for dismissal or to stipulate to the entry of judgment instead of dismissal, and with leave to any party to file, within 45 days, a motion to have the dismissal set aside and the case reinstated or the settlement enforced, should the settlement not be consummated; denying as moot [12-1] motion for continuance of status conference set for 12/7/98 at 8:15 AM; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW.
12/08/1998
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.