Carter v. Rudinplay, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

1:2018-cv-00117 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 124 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/13/2018
COMPLAINT against Rudinplay, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2194355, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Tonja B. Carter.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Civil Cover Sheet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2018: #
4
Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw
4 Attachments
2
03/13/2018
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Tonja B. Carter
3
03/13/2018
MOTION for leave to Seal Document by Tonja B. Carter.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
03/13/2018
MOTIONS REFERRED: 3 MOTION for leave to Seal Document & 4 Sealed Document to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
03/13/2018
Summons Issued as to Rudinplay, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
6
03/13/2018
Service Order entered 3/13/2018. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 4/27/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/13/2018.
7
03/13/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Tonja B. Carter.
8
03/14/2018
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement 7 filed by Tonja B. Carter.
9
03/14/2018
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk is directed to maintain Exhibit B (Doc. 4) UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 3/14/2018.
10
03/16/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by Reggie Copeland, Jr. on behalf of Tonja B. Carter Modified on 3/19/2018
11
03/20/2018
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonja B. Carter. Rudinplay, Inc. served on 3/17/2018, answer due 4/9/2018
12
04/06/2018
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rudinplay, Inc., filed by Tonja B. Carter.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
13
04/09/2018
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer by Rudinplay, Inc.
1
Exhibit Declaration of Scott Rudin
2
Exhibit Declaration of Stefan Schick
2 Attachments
14
04/09/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Rudinplay, Inc.
15
04/09/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Paul Doss on behalf of Rudinplay, Inc.
16
04/09/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by John Gordon Thompson, Jr on behalf of Rudinplay, Inc.
17
04/09/2018
MOTION for Jonathan Zavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207750, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.
1
Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
2
Exhibit B - Application for Admission
2 Attachments
18
04/09/2018
MOTION for Jonathan Neil Strauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207753, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.
1
Errata A - Certificate of Good Standing
2
Exhibit B - Application for Admission
2 Attachments
19
04/09/2018
MOTION for Sara Slavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207754, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.
1
Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
2
Exhibit B - Application for Admission
2 Attachments
20
04/09/2018
MOTION for Sarah Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207755, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Rudinplay, Inc.
1
Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
2
Exhibit B - Application for Admission
2 Attachments
21
04/10/2018
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement 14 filed by Rudinplay, Inc.
04/10/2018
MOTIONS REFERRED: 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2018
MOTIONS REFERRED: 17 MOTION for Jonathan Zavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207750, Online Credit Card Payment.), 18 MOTION for Jonathan Neil Strauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207753, Online Credit Card Payment.), 19 MOTION for Sara Slavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207754, Online Credit Card Payment.) & 20 MOTION for Sarah Schacter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2207755, Online Credit Card Payment.) - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
04/10/2018
Order re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer. Responses due by 4/23/2018, Replies due by 4/30/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/10/2018.
23
04/10/2018
Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to Jeffrey M. Anderson; Admission & Registration due within 7 days.
24
04/10/2018
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 17] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jonathan Zavin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018.
25
04/10/2018
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 18] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jonathan Neil Strauss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018.
26
04/10/2018
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 19] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sara Slavin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018.
27
04/10/2018
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 20] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sarah Schacter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/10/2018.
28
04/23/2018
RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, to Transfer filed by Tonja B. Carter.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
8 Attachments
29
04/23/2018
MOTION to Strike and Objection to Paragraphs 7, 8, and 9 of the Declaration of Stefan Schick by Tonja B. Carter.
04/24/2018
REFERRAL OF 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2018
MOTIONS REFERRED: 29 MOTION to Strike and Objection to Paragraphs 7, 8, and 9 of the Declaration of Stefan Schick to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
04/24/2018
Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action by Tonja B. Carter.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
31
04/24/2018
Order re: 30 Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Tonja B. Carter. Responses due by 4/27/2018, Replies due by 4/30/2018. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 4/24/2018.
04/24/2018
REFERRAL OF 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2018
MOTIONS REFERRED: 29 MOTION to Strike and Objection to Paragraphs 7, 8, and 9 of the Declaration of Stefan Schick to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
04/27/2018
RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 Emergency MOTION Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Rudinplay, Inc.
1
Exhibit A - Declaration of Scott Rudin
2
Exhibit B - Declaration of Scott Rudin
3
Exhibit C - Letter Agreement
4
Exhibit D - March 9, 2018 Letter
5
Exhibit E - Declaration of Jonathan Zavin
6
Exhibit F - Declaration of Jonathan Strauss
7
Exhibit G - Declaration of Sara Slavin
8
Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 1)
9
Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 2)
10
Exhibit H - SDNY Complaint (Part 3)
11
Exhibit I - Proposed Order to Show Cause
12
Exhibit J - Order to Show Cause
13
Exhibit K - Rudinplay's Memorandum of Law
14
Exhibit L - Motion for PHV Appearance
15
Exhibit M - Carter's Opposition to Expedited Discovery
15 Attachments
04/30/2018
REFERRAL OF 32 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
04/30/2018
REPLY to Response to Motion 30 to Enjoin From Further Prosecuting Second-Filed Action filed by Tonja B. Carter.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
34
04/30/2018
REPLY to Response to Motion 13 filed by Rudinplay, Inc.
1
Reply Declaration of Scott Rudin (with Exhibits A-C)
1 Attachment
35
04/30/2018
NOTICE by Rudinplay, Inc. of Action by the Southern District of New York
1
Exhibit A - Order Setting Trial
2
Exhibit B - Transcript of Hearing
3
Exhibit C - Scheduling Order
3 Attachments
05/01/2018
REFERRAL OF 33 Reply to Response to Motion, 34 Reply to Response to Motion, 35 Notice of Action by the Southern District of New York to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
05/07/2018
ORDER granting in part denying in part the 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. This action is transferred to the Southern District of New York. The 29 Motion to Strike is moot. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/7/2018.
37
05/08/2018
***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Southern District of New York, Case Number 1:18-cv-04097.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.