Cassandra Clark
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02110 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
doc
05/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
05/21/2018
Employee Income Records
doc
05/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset-Auto Assign)
05/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/22/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Financial Management Course
09/12/2018
Closing Order: Discharge Trustee, Release Bond Liability & Close Case (Ch 7 No Asset Non-Image) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.