Cassity v. GCI, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
54
07/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
55
08/06/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
56
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
57
08/20/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
58
08/20/2018
Declaration
59
08/24/2018
Notice (Other)
60
08/28/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
61
08/28/2018
Declaration
62
09/04/2018
Status Report
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
09/04/2018
Declaration
66
09/17/2018
Leave to File Document
67
09/17/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
68
09/24/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
69
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.