Catskill Mountains Chapter of v. United States Environmental Pr
Court Docket Sheet

2014-01823 (ca2)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/02/2014
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al., FILED. [1239400] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/03/2014 02:31 PM]
3
06/02/2014
DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/28/2014, RECEIVED.[1239412] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/03/2014 02:38 PM]
4
06/02/2014
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2014, RECEIVED.[1239413] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/03/2014 02:39 PM]
2
06/02/2014
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al., district court docket entry re: receipt # 0208-9713723, FILED.[1239411] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/03/2014 02:37 PM]
5
06/02/2014
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1239420] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/03/2014 02:41 PM]
6
06/03/2014
NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Eldon V.C. Greenberg for Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon, David Guest for Appellee Sierra Club, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, Friends of the Everglades and Florida Wildlife Federation, Thomas A. Harnett for Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon, Joseph J. Mann for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. and Trout Unlimited, Inc., James G. Murphy for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. and Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Bernardo Roman, III for Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[1239427] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/03/2014 02:43 PM]
10
06/03/2014
NEW CASE 14-1909, on behalf of Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors, FILED.[1243769] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:36 PM]
11
06/03/2014
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors, FILED. [1243774] [14-1909] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:38 PM]
12
06/03/2014
DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/28/2014, RECEIVED.[1243788] [14-1909] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:48 PM]
13
06/03/2014
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2014, RECEIVED.[1243791] [14-1909] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:48 PM]
14
06/03/2014
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1243796] [14-1909] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:49 PM]
59
06/03/2014
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors, district court receipt # 0208-9730094, FILED.[1247684] [14-1909] [Entered: 06/13/2014 09:33 AM]
16
06/09/2014
CAPTION, to reflect 14-1909, AMENDED.[1243800] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:51 PM]
15
06/09/2014
NOTE: See lead case, 14-1823, containing complete set of docket entries.[1243798] [14-1909] [Entered: 06/09/2014 04:50 PM]
17
06/10/2014
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1823, States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1244917] [14-1823, 14-1909] [Entered: 06/10/2014 04:27 PM]
18
06/10/2014
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1823, States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1244929] [14-1823, 14-1909] [Entered: 06/10/2014 04:32 PM]
21
06/11/2014
FORM C, on behalf of Appellants Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/11/2013 by CM/ECF.[1245864] [14-1909, 14-1823]--[Edited 06/11/2014 by YL] [Entered: 06/11/2014 01:59 PM]
22
06/11/2014
FORM D, on behalf of Appellants Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/11/2014 by CM/ECF.[1245871] [14-1909, 14-1823]--[Edited 06/11/2014 by YL] [Entered: 06/11/2014 02:01 PM]
25
06/11/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1823, States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/11/2014 by CM/ECF.[1246137] [14-1823, 14-1909] [Entered: 06/11/2014 03:52 PM]
26
06/11/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/11/2014 by CM/ECF.[1246330] [14-1909, 14-1823] [Entered: 06/11/2014 05:24 PM]
60
06/11/2014
NEW CASE 14-2016, on behalf of South Florida Water Management District, FILED.[1248037] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:08 PM]
61
06/11/2014
NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, FILED. [1248042] [14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:11 PM]
62
06/11/2014
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2014, RECEIVED.[1248051] [14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:16 PM]
29
06/12/2014
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency, FILED. [1247140] [14-1991] [Entered: 06/12/2014 03:10 PM]
30
06/12/2014
DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/28/2014, RECEIVED.[1247145] [14-1991] [Entered: 06/12/2014 03:12 PM]
31
06/12/2014
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2014, RECEIVED.[1247147] [14-1991] [Entered: 06/12/2014 03:13 PM]
32
06/12/2014
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1247154] [14-1991] [Entered: 06/12/2014 03:14 PM]
33
06/12/2014
NOTE: See lead case, 14-1823, containing complete set of docket entries.[1247157] [14-1991] [Entered: 06/12/2014 03:16 PM]
34
06/12/2014
CAPTION, to reflect 14-1991 and Appellant Gina McCarthy, pursuant to Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 43(c)(2), as substitute for former Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency, AMENDED.[1247184] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/12/2014 03:22 PM]
36
06/12/2014
NEW CASE 14-1997, on behalf of South Florida Water Management District, FILED.[1247319] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:08 PM]
37
06/12/2014
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, FILED. [1247327] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:09 PM]
38
06/12/2014
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, district court receipt # 0208-9711658, FILED.[1247334] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:11 PM]
39
06/12/2014
DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/28/2014, RECEIVED.[1247337] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:12 PM]
40
06/12/2014
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2014, RECEIVED.[1247341] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:12 PM]
41
06/12/2014
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1247347] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:13 PM]
42
06/12/2014
NOTE: See lead case, 14-1823, containing complete set of docket entries.[1247354] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:14 PM]
43
06/12/2014
CAPTION, to reflect 14-1997, AMENDED.[1247356] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:15 PM]
45
06/12/2014
NEW CASE 14-2003, on behalf of City of New York, FILED.[1247461] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:00 PM]
46
06/12/2014
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, FILED. [1247463] [14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:01 PM]
48
06/12/2014
DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/28/2014, RECEIVED.[1247468] [14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:04 PM]
49
06/12/2014
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2014, RECEIVED.[1247469] [14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:05 PM]
50
06/12/2014
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1247470] [14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:06 PM]
51
06/12/2014
NOTE: See lead case, 14-1823, containing complete set of docket entries.[1247471] [14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:07 PM]
52
06/12/2014
CAPTION, to reflect 14-2003, AMENDED.[1247473] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:08 PM]
55
06/12/2014
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, 14-1991, FILED. Service date 06/12/2014 by CM/ECF.[1247521] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 06:40 PM]
56
06/12/2014
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, 14-1991, FILED. Service date 06/12/2014 by CM/ECF.[1247522] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 06:41 PM]
47
06/12/2014
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City of New York, district court receipt # 465401096692, FILED.[1247466] [14-2003] [Entered: 06/12/2014 05:04 PM]
28
06/12/2014
NEW CASE 14-1991, on behalf of Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency, FILED.[1247135] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/12/2014 03:09 PM]
63
06/12/2014
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1248061] [14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:20 PM]
65
06/13/2014
NOTE: See lead case, 14-1823, containing complete set of docket entries.[1248068] [14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:22 PM]
66
06/13/2014
CAPTION, to reflect 14-2016, AMENDED.[1248069] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:22 PM]
67
06/13/2014
ATTORNEY, Benjamin H. Torrance for Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency, in cases 14-1991, 14-1823, [1248055-2], ADDED.[1248074] [14-1991, 14-1823] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:25 PM]
68
06/13/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency, FILED. Service date 06/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1248081] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:30 PM]
69
06/13/2014
ORDER, dated 06/13/2014, dismissing appeal docket number 14-1997 by 6/27/2014 unless Appellant South Florida Water Management District submits Form C and Form D, FILED.[1248088] [14-1997] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:33 PM]
70
06/13/2014
ORDER, dated 06/13/2014, dismissing appeal docket number 14-2003 by 6/27/2014 unless Appellant City of New York submits Form C and Form D, FILED.[1248108] [14-2003] [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:46 PM]
71
06/13/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, -- Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/13/2014 by CM/ECF.[1248154] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 01:06 PM]
72
06/13/2014
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1997, 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/13/2014 by CM/ECF.[1248176] [14-1997, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 01:19 PM]
73
06/13/2014
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1997, 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/13/2014 by CM/ECF.[1248179] [14-1997, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 01:20 PM]
75
06/13/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/13/2014 by CM/ECF.[1248224] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 01:51 PM]
76
06/13/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, -- Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/13/2014 by CM/ECF.[1248564] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/13/2014 05:14 PM]
78
06/16/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1248739] [14-2003, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 09:41 AM]
79
06/16/2014
ATTORNEY, Julie Steiner, [78], in place of attorney Francis Ferdinand Caputo, SUBSTITUTED.[1248836] [14-2003, 14-1823] [Entered: 06/16/2014 10:27 AM]
80
06/16/2014
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1248859] [14-2003, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 10:38 AM]
81
06/16/2014
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1248871] [14-2003, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 10:46 AM]
82
06/16/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [80], Form D [81], on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1997, 14-1823, 14-2016, FILED.[1248897] [14-1997, 14-1823, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 11:00 AM]
83
06/16/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1249035] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 11:53 AM]
84
06/16/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249181] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 01:29 PM]
85
06/16/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [83], on behalf of Appellees State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-2016, FILED.[1249201] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 01:47 PM]
86
06/16/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, 14-1909, FILED. Service date 06/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1249299] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/16/2014 02:47 PM]
89
06/16/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [83], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-2016, FILED.[1249860] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 09:33 AM]
87
06/17/2014
ATTORNEY, Monica K. Reimer for Sierra Club, Friends of the Everglades, Florida Wildlife Federation, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, in case 14-1823, [84], ADDED.[1249844] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/17/2014 09:25 AM]
88
06/17/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [84], on behalf of Appellees Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club, FILED.[1249850] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/17/2014 09:27 AM]
90
06/17/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249885] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 09:41 AM]
91
06/17/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1249914] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 09:53 AM]
92
06/17/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, informing Court of proposed due date 09/15/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1249922] [14-2003, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 09:56 AM]
93
06/17/2014
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1997, 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1250001] [14-1997, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 10:38 AM]
94
06/17/2014
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1997, 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1250004] [14-1997, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 10:39 AM]
95
06/17/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1250039] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 10:55 AM]
96
06/17/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [84], on behalf of Appellees Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club, FILED.[1250359] [14-1823] [Entered: 06/17/2014 01:49 PM]
97
06/17/2014
ATTORNEY, S. Peter Manning for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon, in case 14-1991,14-1909, 14-1823, 14-2003, 14-1997, 14-2016, [91], ADDED.[1250367] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 01:55 PM]
98
06/17/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE Form C [80], Form D [81], on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1997, 14-1823, 14-2016, FILED.[1250374] [14-1997, 14-1823, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/17/2014 01:59 PM]
104
06/18/2014
NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1251049] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/18/2014 10:09 AM]
106
06/18/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF.[1251093] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 06/18/2014 10:34 AM]
107
06/18/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and notice of appearance, [106], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washingon in 14-1823, FILED.[1251140] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/18/2014 11:01 AM]
108
06/18/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1251491] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/18/2014 02:38 PM]
109
06/19/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 06/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1252265] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 06/19/2014 10:39 AM]
110
06/19/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1252373] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/19/2014 11:22 AM]
112
06/19/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1252718] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/19/2014 02:26 PM]
113
06/24/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM [107], [109], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED.[1255618] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/24/2014 07:08 AM]
114
06/24/2014
ATTORNEY, Ronald L. Lavigne for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-2016, [108], ADDED.[1255619] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/24/2014 07:11 AM]
115
06/24/2014
ATTORNEY, Yinet Pino, [112], in place of attorney Bernardo Roman III, SUBSTITUTED.[1255621] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/24/2014 07:20 AM]
116
06/24/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823 Brief due date as 09/15/2014;. Joint Appendix due date as 09/15/2014, FILED.[1255622] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/24/2014 07:24 AM]
117
06/24/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256403] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/24/2014 02:40 PM]
118
06/24/2014
ATTORNEY, David Lewis Ormond Jr. for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-2016, [117], ADDED.[1256493] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/24/2014 03:31 PM]
119
06/24/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1823, informing Court of proposed due date 09/09/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1256595] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/24/2014 04:26 PM]
121
06/25/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/25/2014 by CM/ECF.[1257426] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/25/2014 02:08 PM]
123
06/25/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1909, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1823, informing Court of proposed due date 09/10/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 06/25/2014 by CM/ECF.[1257809] [14-1909, 14-1823, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/25/2014 07:50 PM]
125
06/26/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,acknowledgement and notice of appearance and LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [1257424-2], [1257420-2], on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1997, FILED.[1257821] [14-1997, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/26/2014 07:00 AM]
128
06/26/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al. in 14-1823 Brief due date as 09/09/2014;. Joint Appendix due date as 09/09/2014, FILED.[1258184] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/26/2014 11:45 AM]
129
06/26/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1909, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1823 Brief due date as 09/10/2014;. Joint Appendix due date as 09/10/2014, FILED.[1258193] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/26/2014 11:50 AM]
130
06/26/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1258437] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/26/2014 03:05 PM]
131
06/26/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-2016, informing Court of proposed due date 09/11/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 06/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1258440] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/26/2014 03:06 PM]
133
06/27/2014
MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/27/2014 by email.[1258868] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/27/2014 09:53 AM]
138
06/30/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/30/2014 by CM/ECF.[1260792] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/30/2014 04:15 PM]
139
06/30/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016, informing Court of proposed due date 09/12/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 06/30/2014 by CM/ECF.[1260800] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/30/2014 04:17 PM]
140
06/30/2014
MOTION, to withdraw document, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 06/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1260827] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/30/2014 04:23 PM]
141
06/30/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 06/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1260977] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 06/30/2014 05:54 PM]
142
07/01/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to withdraw document, [140], on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, FILED.[1261011] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 06:58 AM]
144
07/01/2014
ATTORNEY, Cecelia C. Chang, [141], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[1261024] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 08:07 AM]
145
07/01/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM AND SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION [125], [138], [139], on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, FILED.[1261439] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 11:44 AM]
146
07/01/2014
MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2016, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF. [1261463] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 11:55 AM]
147
07/01/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEAL [142], [146], on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-2016, FILED.[1261475] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 11:59 AM]
152
07/01/2014
ATTORNEY,Cecilia Chang, [141], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[1261977] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 03:34 PM]
153
07/01/2014
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal [146] filed by Appellant South Florida Water Management District, FILED. [1261988][153] [14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 03:37 PM]
154
07/01/2014
NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[1261993] [14-2016] [Entered: 07/01/2014 03:37 PM]
156
07/08/2014
NEW PARTY, Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1909, Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1991, Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1997, Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-2003 and Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-2016, ADDED.[1265367] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/08/2014 10:54 AM]
157
07/08/2014
CAPTION, Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada added, AMENDED.[1265373] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, 14-2016] [Entered: 07/08/2014 10:56 AM]
158
07/09/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, informing Court of proposed due date 09/11/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 07/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1266941] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/09/2014 03:35 PM]
161
07/10/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1267747] [14-1823] [Entered: 07/10/2014 11:55 AM]
162
07/10/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1267776] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/10/2014 12:01 PM]
163
07/10/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1267787] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/10/2014 12:07 PM]
164
07/10/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, acknowledgement and notice of appearance, [161], on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED.[1267800] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/10/2014 12:12 PM]
165
07/10/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGEMENT FORM [164], [163], on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED.[1267802] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/10/2014 12:15 PM]
168
07/11/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823 Brief due date as 09/12/2014; FILED.[1268841] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/11/2014 10:58 AM]
169
07/11/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823 Brief due date as 09/11/2014;. Joint Appendix due date as 09/11/2014, FILED.[1268896] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/11/2014 11:09 AM]
170
07/11/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [162], on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED.[1269015] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/11/2014 11:49 AM]
171
07/14/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 07/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1270540] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/14/2014 03:29 PM]
172
07/15/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGEMENT FORM [170], [171], on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED.[1270802] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/15/2014 07:16 AM]
173
07/15/2014
ATTORNEY, Richard A. Wegman for Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, in case 14-1991 Richard A. Wegman for Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, in case 14-1909 Richard A. Wegman for Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, in case 14-1823 Richard A. Wegman for Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, in case 14-1997 Richard A. Wegman for Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, in case 14-2003, [171], ADDED.[1270803] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/15/2014 07:17 AM]
174
07/17/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/17/2014 by CM/ECF, email. [1274139] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/17/2014 05:27 PM]
175
07/18/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 07/18/2014 by email, CM/ECF. [1274342] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/18/2014 10:03 AM]
176
07/21/2014
ATTORNEY, Leah M. P. Hedman for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1991 Leah M. P. Hedman for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1909 Leah M. P. Hedman for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1823 Leah M. P. Hedman for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1997 Leah M. P. Hedman for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-2003, [175], ADDED.[1275104] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/21/2014 08:11 AM]
177
07/22/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as additional counsel, [174], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED.[1275986] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/22/2014 07:30 AM]
178
07/22/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM [177], [175], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED.[1275988] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/22/2014 07:33 AM]
182
08/06/2014
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [133] filed by Appellee Missouri, by CFD, FILED. [1287932][182] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/06/2014 09:53 AM]
183
08/06/2014
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 08/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1288346] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/06/2014 12:08 PM]
184
09/08/2014
States of Colorado, New Mexico, et al., replaced by State of Colorado, SUBSTITUTED.[1314266] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/08/2014 01:23 PM]
185
09/08/2014
NEW PARTY, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico in 14-1823, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico in 14-1909, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico in 14-1991, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico in 14-1997 and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico in 14-2003, ADDED.[1314275] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/08/2014 01:26 PM]
186
09/08/2014
State Water Contractors, TERMINATED.[1314291] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003]--[Edited 09/08/2014 by AC] [Entered: 09/08/2014 01:33 PM]
187
09/08/2014
CAPTION, State Water Contractors, State of Texas, State of Alaska, State of Idaho, State of Nevada, State of Utah, Arizona Department of Water Resources Intervenor Defendants - Appellants - Cross Appellees,AMENDED.[1314564] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/08/2014 03:37 PM]
188
09/08/2014
NEW PARTY, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1823, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1997 and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-2003, ADDED.[1314754] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/08/2014 04:49 PM]
189
09/08/2014
CAPTION, State of North Dakota, AMENDED.[1314798] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/08/2014 05:34 PM]
190
09/09/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315875] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 06:51 PM]
191
09/09/2014
SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315886] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 09:30 PM]
192
09/09/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-298), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315888] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 10:49 PM]
193
09/09/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 299-598), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315889] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 10:51 PM]
194
09/09/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 599-898), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315890] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 10:52 PM]
195
09/09/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 899-1198), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315892] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 10:56 PM]
196
09/09/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1199-1498), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315893] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 10:58 PM]
197
09/09/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1499-1584), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315895] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 10:59 PM]
198
09/09/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 899-1198), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315899] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/09/2014 11:10 PM]
200
09/10/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Joint Appendix Volumes 1-6, [198], [197], [196], [194], [193], [192], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED.[1316491] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 12:51 PM]
201
09/10/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-298), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316910] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 04:40 PM]
202
09/10/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 299-598), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316915] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 04:43 PM]
203
09/10/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 599-898), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316924] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 04:47 PM]
204
09/10/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 899-1198), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316932] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 04:50 PM]
205
09/10/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1199-1498), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316940] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 04:52 PM]
206
09/10/2014
JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1499-1548), on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316944] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 04:53 PM]
207
09/10/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1823, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1317005] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/10/2014 11:00 PM]
208
09/11/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE JOINT APPENDIX Volumes 1-6 [200], [201], [202], [203], [204], [205], [206], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, FILED.[1317010] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/11/2014 07:26 AM]
210
09/11/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 09/11/2014 by CM/ECF.[1318082] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/11/2014 07:28 PM]
211
09/12/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, 14-1997, FILED. Service date 09/12/2014 by CM/ECF.[1319040] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/12/2014 04:09 PM]
214
09/15/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 09/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1319412] [14-2003, 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997] [Entered: 09/15/2014 09:44 AM]
215
09/15/2014
ATTORNEY, Larry Sonnenshein for City of New York, in case 14-1991 Larry Sonnenshein for City of New York, in case 14-1909 Larry Sonnenshein for City of New York, in case 14-1823 Larry Sonnenshein for City of New York, in case 14-2003 Larry Sonnenshein for City of New York, in case 14-1997, [214], ADDED.[1319437] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/15/2014 09:56 AM]
216
09/15/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 09/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1319483] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/15/2014 10:14 AM]
217
09/15/2014
ATTORNEY, Hilary M. Meltzer for City of New York, in case 14-1991 Hilary M. Meltzer for City of New York, in case 14-1909 Hilary M. Meltzer for City of New York, in case 14-1823 Hilary M. Meltzer for City of New York, in case 14-2003 Hilary M. Meltzer for City of New York, in case 14-1997, [216], ADDED.[1319499] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/15/2014 10:21 AM]
218
09/15/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 09/15/2014 by CM/ECF.[1319730] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/15/2014 11:50 AM]
221
09/18/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, State of California, FILED. Service date 09/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323222] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/18/2014 12:00 PM]
222
09/18/2014
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of State of California, FILED. Service date 09/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323233] [14-1823] [Entered: 09/18/2014 12:04 PM]
223
09/18/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae State of California in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae State of California in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae State of California in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae State of California in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae State of California in 14-2003, ADDED.[1323259] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/18/2014 12:17 PM]
224
09/18/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, amicus brief, [222], on behalf of Amicus Curiae State of California in 14-1823, FILED.[1323280] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/18/2014 12:33 PM]
225
09/18/2014
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of State of California, FILED. Service date 09/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323323] [14-1823] [Entered: 09/18/2014 12:56 PM]
226
09/18/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF [224], [225], on behalf of Amicus Curiae State of California in 14-1823, FILED.[1323342] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/18/2014 01:02 PM]
227
09/18/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, American Public Power Association, Sabine River Authority of Texas, Sabine River Authority State of Louisiana, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323768] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/18/2014 04:38 PM]
228
09/18/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, American Public Power Association, Sabine River Authority of Texas, Sabine River Authority State of Louisiana, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323769] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/18/2014 04:38 PM]
229
09/18/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, American Public Power Association, Sabine River Authority of Texas, Sabine River Authority State of Louisiana, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323770] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/18/2014 04:39 PM]
230
09/18/2014
AMICUS BRIEF, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, American Public Power Association, Sabine River Authority of Texas, Sabine River Authority State of Louisiana, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323781] [14-1823] [Entered: 09/18/2014 04:45 PM]
231
09/19/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Hydropower Association in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae National Hydropower Association in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae National Hydropower Association in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae National Hydropower Association in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae National Hydropower Association in 14-2003, ADDED.[1323870] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 07:17 AM]
232
09/19/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Northwest Hydroelectric Association in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae Northwest Hydroelectric Association in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae Northwest Hydroelectric Association in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae Northwest Hydroelectric Association in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae Northwest Hydroelectric Association in 14-2003, ADDED.[1323871] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 07:18 AM]
233
09/19/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Public Power Association in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae American Public Power Association in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae American Public Power Association in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae American Public Power Association in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae American Public Power Association in 14-2003, ADDED.[1323872] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 07:19 AM]
234
09/19/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Texas in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Texas in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Texas in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Texas in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Texas in 14-2003, ADDED.[1323873] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 07:20 AM]
235
09/19/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Louisiana in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Louisiana in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Louisiana in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Louisiana in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae Sabine River Authority of Louisiana in 14-2003, ADDED.[1323874] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 07:21 AM]
236
09/19/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Oglethorpe Power Corporation in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae Oglethorpe Power Corporation in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae Oglethorpe Power Corporation in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae Oglethorpe Power Corporation in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae Oglethorpe Power Corporation in 14-2003, ADDED.[1323875] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 07:22 AM]
237
09/19/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of appearance as amicus counsel, [228], [227], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Public Power Association, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Sabine River Authority of Louisiana and Sabine River Authority of Texas in 14-1823, FILED.[1323876] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 07:29 AM]
238
09/19/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Public Power Association, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Sabine River Authority of Louisiana and Sabine River Authority of Texas, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323966] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 09:01 AM]
239
09/19/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Public Power Association, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Sabine River Authority of Louisiana and Sabine River Authority of Texas, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1323970] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 09:02 AM]
240
09/19/2014
ATTORNEY, Charles R. Sensiba for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1991 Charles R. Sensiba for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1909 Charles R. Sensiba for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1823 Charles R. Sensiba for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-2003 Charles R. Sensiba for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1997, [238], ADDED.[1324047] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 09:37 AM]
241
09/19/2014
ATTORNEY, Michael Swiger for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1991 Michael Swiger for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1909 Michael Swiger for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1823 Michael Swiger for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-2003 Michael Swiger for Sabine River Authority of Louisiana Sabine River Authority of Texas American Public Power Association National Hydropower Association Oglethorpe Power Corporation Northwest Hydroelectric Association, in case 14-1997, [239], ADDED.[1324060] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 09:41 AM]
242
09/19/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [237], [238], [239], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Public Power Association, National Hydropower Association, Northwest Hydroelectric Association, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Sabine River Authority of Louisiana and Sabine River Authority of Texas in 14-1823, FILED.[1324063] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 09:42 AM]
243
09/19/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Farm Bureau Federation, Florida Farm Bureau Federation, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1324433] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 12:13 PM]
244
09/19/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Farm Bureau Federation, Florida Farm Bureau Federation, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1324448] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/19/2014 12:17 PM]
245
09/19/2014
AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of American Farm Bureau Federation, Florida Farm Bureau Federation, FILED. Service date 09/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1324592] [14-1823] [Entered: 09/19/2014 01:33 PM]
246
09/22/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Farm Bureau Federation in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae American Farm Bureau Federation in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae American Farm Bureau Federation in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae American Farm Bureau Federation in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae American Farm Bureau Federation in 14-2003, ADDED.[1325089] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/22/2014 07:10 AM]
247
09/22/2014
NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Florida Farm Bureau Federtion in 14-1823, Amicus Curiae Florida Farm Bureau Federtion in 14-1909, Amicus Curiae Florida Farm Bureau Federtion in 14-1991, Amicus Curiae Florida Farm Bureau Federtion in 14-1997 and Amicus Curiae Florida Farm Bureau Federtion in 14-2003, ADDED.[1325090] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/22/2014 07:11 AM]
248
09/22/2014
ATTORNEY, Michael B. Kimberly for American Farm Bureau Federation Florida Farm Bureau Federtion, in case 14-1991 Michael B. Kimberly for American Farm Bureau Federation Florida Farm Bureau Federtion, in case 14-1909 Michael B. Kimberly for American Farm Bureau Federation Florida Farm Bureau Federtion, in case 14-1823 Michael B. Kimberly for American Farm Bureau Federation Florida Farm Bureau Federtion, in case 14-2003 Michael B. Kimberly for American Farm Bureau Federation Florida Farm Bureau Federtion, in case 14-1997, [244], ADDED.[1325092] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/22/2014 07:14 AM]
252
09/22/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Water Works Association, FILED. Service date 09/22/2014 by CM/ECF. [1326169] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/22/2014 06:50 PM]
253
09/22/2014
MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date09/22/2014 by CM/ECF.[1326202] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/22/2014 11:12 PM]
254
09/23/2014
NEW PARTY, Movant American Water Works Association in 14-1823, Movant American Water Works Association in 14-1909, Movant American Water Works Association in 14-1991, Movant American Water Works Association in 14-1997 and Movant American Water Works Association in 14-2003, ADDED.[1326215] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:11 AM]
255
09/23/2014
NEW PARTY, Movant National Association of Clean Water Agencies in 14-1823, Movant National Association of Clean Water Agencies in 14-1909, Movant National Association of Clean Water Agencies in 14-1991, Movant National Association of Clean Water Agencies in 14-1997 and Movant National Association of Clean Water Agencies in 14-2003, ADDED.[1326217] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:12 AM]
256
09/23/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as amicus counsel, [252], on behalf of Movant American Water Works Association and National Association of Clean Water Agencies in 14-1823, FILED.[1326218] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:14 AM]
257
09/23/2014
NEW PARTY, Movant Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies in 14-1823, Movant Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies in 14-1909, Movant Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies in 14-1991, Movant Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies in 14-1997 and Movant Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies in 14-2003, ADDED.[1326219] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:18 AM]
258
09/23/2014
NEW PARTY, Movant National League of Cities in 14-1823, Movant National League of Cities in 14-1909, Movant National League of Cities in 14-1991, Movant National League of Cities in 14-1997 and Movant National League of Cities in 14-2003, ADDED.[1326220] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:18 AM]
259
09/23/2014
NEW PARTY, Movant Water Enviroment Federation in 14-1823, Movant Water Enviroment Federation in 14-1909, Movant Water Enviroment Federation in 14-1991, Movant Water Enviroment Federation in 14-1997 and Movant Water Enviroment Federation in 14-2003, ADDED.[1326221] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:19 AM]
260
09/23/2014
NEW PARTY, Movant National Association of Water Companies in 14-1823, Movant National Association of Water Companies in 14-1909, Movant National Association of Water Companies in 14-1991, Movant National Association of Water Companies in 14-1997 and Movant National Association of Water Companies in 14-2003, ADDED.[1326222] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:20 AM]
261
09/23/2014
NEW PARTY, Movant US Conference of Mayors in 14-1823, Movant US Conference of Mayors in 14-1909, Movant US Conference of Mayors in 14-1991, Movant US Conference of Mayors in 14-1997 and Movant US Conference of Mayors in 14-2003, ADDED.[1326223] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:21 AM]
262
09/23/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to file amicus curiae brief, [253], on behalf of Movant American Water Works Association and Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies in 14-1823, FILED.[1326224] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/23/2014 07:23 AM]
264
09/24/2014
MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date09/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1328072] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/24/2014 12:30 PM]
265
09/24/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Association of Clean Water Agencies, National League of Cities, Water Enviroment Federation, National Association of Water Companies, United States Conference of Mayors, FILED. Service date 09/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1328133] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/24/2014 01:16 PM]
266
09/24/2014
MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date09/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1328144] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/24/2014 01:29 PM]
267
09/24/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [256], [265], on behalf of Movant Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies, National Association of Clean Water Agencies, National Association of Water Companies, US Conference of Mayors and Water Enviroment Federation in 14-1823, FILED.[1328150] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/24/2014 01:32 PM]
268
09/24/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION [262], [264], [266], on behalf of Movant American Water Works Association, Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies, National Association of Clean Water Agencies, National Association of Water Companies, National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors and Water Enviroment Federation in 14-1909, FILED.[1328159] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/24/2014 01:42 PM]
272
09/25/2014
MOTION ORDER, referring United States Conference of Mayors's, American Water Works Association's, Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies's, National Association of Clean Water Agencies's, National Association of Water Companies's, and Water Environment Federation's motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief supporting the City of New York to the panel that will determine the merits of this appeal [266], [264] FILED. [1328776][272] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/25/2014 09:30 AM]
275
09/26/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, informing Court of proposed due date 12/15/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 09/26/2014 by CM/ECF.[1330050] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/26/2014 12:08 PM]
278
09/29/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823 Brief due date as 12/15/2014, FILED.[1330731] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/29/2014 09:34 AM]
279
09/29/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, informing Court of proposed due date 12/15/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2014 by CM/ECF.[1330818] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/29/2014 10:21 AM]
281
09/29/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, informing Court of proposed due date 12/15/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2014 by CM/ECF.[1330901] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/29/2014 10:53 AM]
285
09/30/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Brief due date as 12/15/2014, FILED.[1331878] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/30/2014 09:37 AM]
286
09/30/2014
SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823 Brief due date as 12/15/2014, FILED.[1332031] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/30/2014 10:55 AM]
287
10/03/2014
LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, informing Court of proposed due date 12/15/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 10/03/2014 by CM/ECF.[1336084] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/03/2014 12:56 PM]
288
10/06/2014
OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file amicus curiae brief [266], on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades and Sierra Club, FILED. Service date 10/06/2014 by CM/ECF. [1337829][288] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/06/2014 09:15 PM]
291
10/07/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, scheduling notification, [287], on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED.[1338022] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/07/2014 09:45 AM]
292
10/07/2014
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, RECEIVED. Service date 10/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1338457] [14-1823] [Entered: 10/07/2014 12:24 PM]
293
10/07/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER [291], [292], on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, FILED.[1338603] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/07/2014 01:40 PM]
294
10/09/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 10/09/2014 by CM/ECF. [1340541] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/09/2014 09:42 AM]
295
10/09/2014
ATTORNEY, Meredith Lee-Clark for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1991 Meredith Lee-Clark for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1909 Meredith Lee-Clark for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1823 Meredith Lee-Clark for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1997 Meredith Lee-Clark for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-2003, [294], ADDED.[1340566] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/09/2014 09:51 AM]
296
11/05/2014
MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 11/05/2014 by CM/ECF. [1363402] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 11/05/2014 10:13 PM]
300
11/12/2014
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [296] filed by Appellant-Cross-Appellee United States Environmental Protection Agency and Gina McCarthy, Appellant United States Environmental Protection Agency and Gina McCarthy, by RKW, FILED. [1367212][300] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 11/12/2014 11:52 AM]
301
12/05/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Trout Unlimited, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/05/2014 by CM/ECF. [1386189] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/05/2014 02:18 PM]
302
12/08/2014
ATTORNEY, Karl Stephen Coplan for Environment America Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc. Environment Florida Trout Unlimited, Inc. National Wildlife Federation Riverkeeper, Inc. Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc. Environment Rhode Island Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc. Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc. Environment New Hampshire Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., in case 14-1991 Karl Stephen Coplan for Environment America Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc. Environment Florida Trout Unlimited, Inc. National Wildlife Federation Riverkeeper, Inc. Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc. Environment Rhode Island Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc. Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc. Environment New Hampshire Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., in case 14-1909 Karl Stephen Coplan for Environment America Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc. Environment Florida Trout Unlimited, Inc. National Wildlife Federation Riverkeeper, Inc. Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc. Environment Rhode Island Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc. Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc. Environment New Hampshire Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., in case 14-1823 Karl Stephen Coplan for Environment America Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc. Environment Florida Trout Unlimited, Inc. National Wildlife Federation Riverkeeper, Inc. Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc. Environment Rhode Island Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc. Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc. Environment New Hampshire Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., in case 14-2003 Karl Stephen Coplan for Environment America Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc. Environment Florida Trout Unlimited, Inc. National Wildlife Federation Riverkeeper, Inc. Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc. Environment Rhode Island Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc. Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc. Environment New Hampshire Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., in case 14-1997, [301], ADDED.[1386702] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/08/2014 08:14 AM]
303
12/12/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/12/2014 by CM/ECF. [1392630] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/12/2014 02:59 PM]
304
12/15/2014
ATTORNEY, Judith Naomi Vale for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1991 Judith Naomi Vale for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1909 Judith Naomi Vale for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1823 Judith Naomi Vale for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1997 Judith Naomi Vale for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-2003, [303], ADDED.[1393042] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/15/2014 07:36 AM]
305
12/17/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1396991] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/17/2014 05:46 PM]
306
12/18/2014
ATTORNEY, Steven Wu for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1991 Steven Wu for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1909 Steven Wu for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1823 Steven Wu for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1997 Steven Wu for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-2003, [305], ADDED.[1397055] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/18/2014 08:15 AM]
307
12/18/2014
MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1397731] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/18/2014 02:12 PM]
311
12/19/2014
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [307] filed by Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, by DAL, FILED. [1399159][311] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/19/2014 03:24 PM]
312
12/23/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402369] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/23/2014 06:27 PM]
313
12/23/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402399] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/23/2014 07:48 PM]
314
12/23/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402405] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/23/2014 10:27 PM]
316
12/24/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief, [313], on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., Florida Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, FILED.[1402659] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/24/2014 10:14 AM]
318
12/24/2014
BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1402936] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/24/2014 12:12 PM]
319
12/29/2014
AMICUS BRIEF, Leon G. Billings, Tom Jorling, Jefferey G. Miller, Robert W. Adler, William Andreen, Harrison Dunning, Mark Squillace, Sandra B. Zellmer, FILED. Service date 12/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1404251] [14-1823] [Entered: 12/29/2014 04:19 PM]
320
12/29/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Leon G. Billings, FILED. Service date 12/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1404288] [14-1823] [Entered: 12/29/2014 04:46 PM]
321
12/29/2014
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office>, FILED. Service date 12/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1404290] [14-1823] [Entered: 12/29/2014 04:48 PM]
322
12/30/2014
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Julie Steiner for Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, Attorney Julie Steiner for Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 12/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1405144] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/30/2014 03:32 PM]
323
12/31/2014
CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF [316], [318], on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, FILED.[1405423] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/31/2014 08:15 AM]
324
12/31/2014
NEW PARTY, Leon G Billings in 14-1823, Leon G Billings in 14-1909, Leon G Billings in 14-1991, Leon G Billings in 14-1997 and Leon G Billings in 14-2003, ADDED.[1405522] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/31/2014 09:34 AM]
325
12/31/2014
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of appearance as amicus counsel, [320], [321], on behalf of Leon G Billings in 14-1823, FILED.[1405527] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/31/2014 09:37 AM]
329
01/01/2015
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Leon G. Billings, Tom Jorling, Jefferey G. Miller, Robert W. Adler, William Andreen, Harrison Dunning, Mark Squillace, Sandra B. Zellmer, FILED. Service date 01/01/2015 by CM/ECF. [1406363] [14-1823] [Entered: 01/01/2015 07:45 PM]
330
01/02/2015
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Leon G Billings in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/02/2015 by CM/ECF. [1406370] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/02/2015 09:53 AM]
331
01/05/2015
NEW PARTY, Movant Tom Jorling in 14-1823, Movant Tom Jorling in 14-1909, Movant Tom Jorling in 14-1991, Movant Tom Jorling in 14-1997 and Movant Tom Jorling in 14-2003, ADDED.[1406481] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:35 AM]
332
01/05/2015
NEW PARTY, Movant Jeffrey G Miller in 14-1823, Movant Jeffrey G Miller in 14-1909, Movant Jeffrey G Miller in 14-1991, Movant Jeffrey G Miller in 14-1997 and Movant Jeffrey G Miller in 14-2003, ADDED.[1406484] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:36 AM]
333
01/05/2015
NEW PARTY, Movant Robert W Adler in 14-1823, Movant Robert W Adler in 14-1909, Movant Robert W Adler in 14-1991, Movant Robert W Adler in 14-1997 and Movant Robert W Adler in 14-2003, ADDED.[1406486] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:37 AM]
334
01/05/2015
NEW PARTY, Movant William L. Andreen in 14-1823, Movant William L. Andreen in 14-1909, Movant William L. Andreen in 14-1991, Movant William L. Andreen in 14-1997 and Movant William L. Andreen in 14-2003, ADDED.[1406488] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:38 AM]
335
01/05/2015
NEW PARTY, Movant Harrison Dunning in 14-1823, Movant Harrison Dunning in 14-1909, Movant Harrison Dunning in 14-1991, Movant Harrison Dunning in 14-1997 and Movant Harrison Dunning in 14-2003, ADDED.[1406490] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:39 AM]
336
01/05/2015
NEW PARTY, Movant Mark Squillace in 14-1823, Movant Mark Squillace in 14-1909, Movant Mark Squillace in 14-1991, Movant Mark Squillace in 14-1997 and Movant Mark Squillace in 14-2003, ADDED.[1406492] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:41 AM]
337
01/05/2015
NEW PARTY, Movant Sandra B Zellmer in 14-1823, Movant Sandra B Zellmer in 14-1909, Movant Sandra B Zellmer in 14-1991, Movant Sandra B Zellmer in 14-1997 and Movant Sandra B Zellmer in 14-2003, ADDED.[1406493] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:42 AM]
338
01/05/2015
ATTORNEY, Patrick Parenteau for Sandra B Zellmer Robert W Adler William L. Andreen Mark Squillace Jeffrey G Miller Harrison Dunning Tom Jorling Leon G Billings, in case 14-1991 Patrick Parenteau for Sandra B Zellmer Robert W Adler William L. Andreen Mark Squillace Jeffrey G Miller Harrison Dunning Tom Jorling Leon G Billings, in case 14-2003 Patrick Parenteau for Sandra B Zellmer Robert W Adler William L. Andreen Mark Squillace Jeffrey G Miller Harrison Dunning Tom Jorling Leon G Billings, in case 14-1909 Patrick Parenteau for Sandra B Zellmer Robert W Adler William L. Andreen Mark Squillace Jeffrey G Miller Harrison Dunning Tom Jorling Leon G Billings, in case 14-1823 Patrick Parenteau for Sandra B Zellmer Robert W Adler William L. Andreen Mark Squillace Jeffrey G Miller Harrison Dunning Tom Jorling Leon G Billings, in case 14-1997, [330], ADDED.[1406503] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:47 AM]
339
01/05/2015
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, amicus brief, [319], on behalf of Movant Leon G Billings, Harrison Dunning, Tom Jorling, Jeffrey G Miller, Mark Squillace and Sandra B Zellmer in 14-1823, FILED.[1406510] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:51 AM]
340
01/05/2015
CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of appearance as amicus counsel [321], [320], on behalf of Movant Robert W Adler, William L. Andreen and Leon G Billings in 14-1823, FILED.[1406527] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 08:55 AM]
341
01/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel E. Estrin, Esq. for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. in 14-1823, Attorney Daniel E. Estrin, Esq. for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Inc., Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Inc., Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Inc., Riverkeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc., Trout Unlimited, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Environment America, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island and Environment Florida in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1406875] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 11:03 AM]
342
01/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney James Edward Nutt, Esq. for Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, 14-1997, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1406944] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 11:27 AM]
344
01/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Yinet Pino, Esq. for Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1407593] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 04:08 PM]
345
01/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney David G. Guest, Esq. for Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, Attorney David G. Guest, Esq. for Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, Friends of the Everglades, Florida Wildlife Federation and Sierra Club in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1407763] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 05:23 PM]
346
01/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee [California] State Water Contractors, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Colorado, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition in 14-1823, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska and Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1407796] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 05:55 PM]
347
01/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1407822] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/05/2015 07:05 PM]
348
01/06/2015
CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF [339], [319], on behalf of Movant Leon G Billings, Tom Jorling, Jefferey G. Miller, Robert W. Adler, William Andreen, Harrison Dunning, Mark Squillace, Sandra B. Zellmer in 14-1823, FILED.[1407845] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/06/2015 07:32 AM]
350
01/06/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Judith Naomi Vale, Esq. for Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/06/2015 by CM/ECF. [1408358] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/06/2015 11:45 AM]
354
01/06/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert William Yalen for Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 01/06/2015 by CM/ECF. [1409148] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/06/2015 05:27 PM]
357
01/14/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 01/14/2015 by CM/ECF.[1416008] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/14/2015 04:56 PM]
358
01/16/2015
ATTORNEY, Robert William Yalen, for Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, TERMINATED.[1417703] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003]--[Edited 06/24/2015 by TW] [Entered: 01/16/2015 11:34 AM]
359
01/26/2015
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 01/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423447] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/26/2015 11:02 AM]
360
01/26/2015
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee United States Environmental Protection Agency and Gina McCarthy in 14-1823, Appellant United States Environmental Protection Agency and Gina McCarthy in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 01/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423927] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/26/2015 05:05 PM]
361
01/26/2015
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, 14-1997, FILED. Service date 01/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423942] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/26/2015 07:59 PM]
362
01/26/2015
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee [California] State Water Contractors, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition, Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 01/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1423947] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/26/2015 10:08 PM]
363
01/27/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1909, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 01/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1424007] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/27/2015 06:22 PM]
364
01/28/2015
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,<indicate document>, [362], [361], [360], [359], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Gina McCarthy, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1823, FILED.[1424024] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/28/2015 07:27 AM]
365
01/28/2015
CURED DEFECTIVE REPLY BRIEF [364], [362], [361], [360], [359], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, City of New York, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Gina McCarthy, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1823, FILED.[1424195] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/28/2015 09:39 AM]
370
02/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Julie Steiner for Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, Attorney Julie Steiner for Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 02/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1431210] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/05/2015 09:57 AM]
373
03/24/2015
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 06/15/2015, B, PROPOSED.[1467845] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/24/2015 11:11 AM]
378
04/01/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada and State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 04/01/2015 by CM/ECF.[1474971] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 04/01/2015 05:27 PM]
380
04/02/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee [California] State Water Contractors, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Colorado, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition in 14-1823, RECEIVED. Service date 04/02/2015 by CM/ECF.[1475727] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 04/02/2015 02:40 PM]
384
04/27/2015
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 08/17/2015, B, PROPOSED.[1494000] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 04/27/2015 10:07 AM]
385
05/05/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Julie Steiner for Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, Attorney Julie Steiner for Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 05/05/2015 by CM/ECF. [1501950] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/05/2015 03:58 PM]
387
05/18/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel E. Estrin, Esq. for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Incorporated, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Incorporated, Riverkeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated, Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation, Environment America, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island and Environment Florida in 14-1909, FILED. Service date 05/18/2015 by CM/ECF. [1512471] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/18/2015 01:58 PM]
389
05/19/2015
MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 05/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1513543] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/19/2015 01:17 PM]
390
05/19/2015
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,motion, [389], on behalf of Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, FILED.[1513570] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/19/2015 01:40 PM]
391
05/19/2015
MOTION, to be relieved as attorney, on behalf of Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 05/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1513589] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/19/2015 02:01 PM]
392
05/19/2015
CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION [390], [391], on behalf of Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, FILED.[1513669] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/19/2015 03:06 PM]
395
05/19/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee [California] State Water Contractors, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Colorado, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition in 14-1823, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska and Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder [Colorado], City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 05/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1513936] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/19/2015 05:51 PM]
396
05/19/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska and Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 05/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1513943] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/19/2015 06:20 PM]
397
05/20/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to be relieved as attorney [391] filed by Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, FILED. [1513981][397] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/20/2015 07:38 AM]
398
05/20/2015
ATTORNEY, Yinet Pino, for Miccosukee Tribe of Indians of Florida, TERMINATED.[1513983] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/20/2015 08:12 AM]
401
05/26/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney David G. Guest, Esq. for Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 05/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1517769] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/26/2015 04:03 PM]
405
05/28/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Judith Naomi Vale, Esq. for Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada and State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, Attorney Judith Naomi Vale, Esq. for Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 05/28/2015 by CM/ECF. [1519625] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/28/2015 01:07 PM]
409
06/26/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert William Yalen Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, FILED. Service date 06/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1541676] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 06/26/2015 03:23 PM]
411
07/10/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel E. Estrin, Esq. for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Incorporated, Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, Trout Unlimited, Incorporated and Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated in 14-1823, Attorney Daniel E. Estrin, Esq. for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Incorporated, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Incorporated, Riverkeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated, Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation, Environment America, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island and Environment Florida in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/10/2015 by CM/ECF. [1551159] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/10/2015 02:58 PM]
412
07/15/2015
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 10/19/2015, PROPOSED.[1554349] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/15/2015 12:21 PM]
413
07/15/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee [California] State Water Contractors, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder, City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Colorado, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition in 14-1823, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder, City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder, City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska and Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder, City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/15/2015 by CM/ECF. [1555060] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/15/2015 07:40 PM]
415
07/16/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1555581] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/16/2015 12:07 PM]
416
07/21/2015
MOTION, to be relieved as attorney, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades and Sierra Club in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/21/2015 by CM/ECF. [1558873] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/21/2015 02:21 PM]
418
07/23/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/23/2015, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington and Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 07/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1561276] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/23/2015 07:44 PM]
419
07/23/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/23/2015, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington and Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 07/23/2015 by CM/ECF.[1561277] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/23/2015 07:49 PM]
422
07/31/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska and Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/31/2015 by CM/ECF. [1567113] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/31/2015 05:47 PM]
424
08/04/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/04/2015, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, RECEIVED. Service date 08/04/2015 by CM/ECF.[1569045] [14-1823] [Entered: 08/04/2015 03:59 PM]
425
08/04/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/04/2015, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, RECEIVED. Service date 08/04/2015 by CM/ECF.[1569050] [14-1823] [Entered: 08/04/2015 04:00 PM]
428
08/10/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel E. Estrin, Esq. for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Incorporated, Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, Trout Unlimited, Incorporated and Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated in 14-1823, Attorney Daniel E. Estrin, Esq. for Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Incorporated, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Incorporated, Riverkeeper, Inc., Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated, Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation, Environment America, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island and Environment Florida in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF. [1572746] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/10/2015 02:37 PM]
430
08/11/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee [California] State Water Contractors, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder, City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Colorado, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition in 14-1823, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for State of Colorado, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, Idaho Water Users Association, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, City of Boulder, City of Aurora [Colorado], Imperial Irrigation District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, El Dorado Irrigation District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Salt River Project, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, City of Colorado Springs, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Peter D. Nichols, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 08/11/2015 by CM/ECF. [1573683] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/11/2015 01:01 PM]
432
08/12/2015
ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah and State of Wyoming in 14-1823, Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska and Attorney Annette Quill for State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1909, Attorney Annette Quill for Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 08/12/2015 by CM/ECF. [1574873] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/12/2015 12:28 PM]
434
08/21/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/21/2015, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, RECEIVED. Service date 08/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1582431] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/21/2015 03:53 PM]
435
08/21/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/21/2015, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, RECEIVED. Service date 08/21/2015 by CM/ECF.[1582435] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/21/2015 03:54 PM]
437
08/26/2015
CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 11/30/2015, PROPOSED.[1585761] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 08/26/2015 04:34 PM]
439
09/16/2015
CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 12/01/2015, SET.[1599735] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/16/2015 11:53 AM]
443
10/01/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting The United States Conference of Mayors, American Water Works Association's, Association of Metropolitan Water Agencies's, National Association of Clean Water Agencies's, National Association of Water Companies's, and Water Environment Federation's motions to file amicus curiae brief [266] in 14-1823, [264] in 14-1823, FILED. [1611263][443] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/01/2015 04:43 PM]
444
10/06/2015
ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1614159] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/06/2015 04:40 PM]
445
10/07/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 10/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1614501] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/07/2015 10:43 AM]
446
10/07/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club, FILED. Service date 10/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1614770] [14-1823] [Entered: 10/07/2015 01:36 PM]
447
10/07/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, FILED. Service date 10/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1614826] [14-1823] [Entered: 10/07/2015 02:35 PM]
448
10/07/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Incorporated, Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, Trout Unlimited, Incorporated and Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 10/07/2015 by CM/ECF. [1614845] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/07/2015 02:47 PM]
449
10/08/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee [California] State Water Contractors, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder, City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Colorado, State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota, State of Wyoming, Washington County [Utah] Water District and Western Urban Water Coalition in 14-1823, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder, City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition, State of Colorado and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1909, Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 10/08/2015 by CM/ECF. [1615572] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/08/2015 12:22 PM]
452
10/16/2015
**REVISED**ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1620931] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/16/2015 11:19 AM]
453
10/16/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee City of New York in 14-1823, Appellant City of New York in 14-2003, FILED. Service date 10/16/2015 by CM/ECF. [1621009] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/16/2015 11:53 AM]
454
10/19/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, FILED. Service date 10/19/2015 by CM/ECF. [1622099] [14-1823] [Entered: 10/19/2015 11:41 AM]
455
10/22/2015
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington and Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 10/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1625395] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/22/2015 11:53 AM]
456
10/23/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada and State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 10/23/2015 by CM/ECF. [1626615] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/23/2015 01:00 PM]
457
10/26/2015
ATTORNEY, Barbara D. Underwood for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1991 Barbara D. Underwood for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-2003 Barbara D. Underwood for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1909 Barbara D. Underwood for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1823 Barbara D. Underwood for State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, in case 14-1997, [455], ADDED.[1627127] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/26/2015 08:11 AM]
458
10/26/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency, FILED. Service date 10/26/2015 by CM/ECF. [1627527] [14-1823] [Entered: 10/26/2015 11:26 AM]
459
10/28/2015
MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, FILED. Service date 10/23/2015 by email.[1629298] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/28/2015 08:40 AM]
462
10/29/2015
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [459] filed by Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida in 14-1823, FILED. [1631201][462] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/29/2015 04:35 PM]
463
10/30/2015
ATTORNEY, Steven M. Davis for Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, in case 14-1991 Steven M. Davis for Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, in case 14-1909 Steven M. Davis for Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, in case 14-2003 Steven M. Davis for Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, in case 14-1823 Steven M. Davis for Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, in case 14-1997, [462], ADDED.[1631397] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/30/2015 09:06 AM]
464
11/06/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 11/06/2015, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Catskill-Deleware Natural Water Alliance, Incorporated, Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Federated Sportsmen's Clubs of Ulster County, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, Trout Unlimited, Incorporated and Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 11/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1636974] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 11/06/2015 02:18 PM]
465
11/06/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 11/06/2015, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency, RECEIVED. Service date 11/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1637103] [14-1823] [Entered: 11/06/2015 03:32 PM]
469
11/22/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 11/22/2015, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1823, Appellant Gina McCarthy and United States Environmental Protection Agency in 14-1991, RECEIVED. Service date 11/22/2015 by CM/ECF.[1648142] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 11/22/2015 01:33 PM]
471
11/24/2015
FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 11/24/2015, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington and Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1649856] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 11/24/2015 11:46 AM]
475
11/25/2015
LETTER, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington and Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, RECEIVED. Service date 11/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1652031] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 11/25/2015 06:24 PM]
478
12/01/2015
CASE, before RDS, DC, SLC. C.JJ., HEARD.[1653631] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/01/2015 12:05 PM]
479
12/07/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM GUNSTER, with fee, RECEIVED. [1658125] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/07/2015 04:10 PM]
489
12/09/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Rufino Osorio, TRANSMITTED.[1707880] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/18/2016 04:09 PM]
480
12/10/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from R. DUBOIS, with fee, RECEIVED.[1661511] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/10/2015 06:44 PM]
488
12/14/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Michelle A. McLeod, TRANSMITTED.[1707865] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/18/2016 04:05 PM]
487
12/15/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Roland Dubois, TRANSMITTED.[1707853] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/18/2016 04:03 PM]
481
12/16/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from BERG HILL ET AL, with fee, RECEIVED.[1666102] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/16/2015 05:40 PM]
482
12/22/2015
ARGUMENT CD, sent regular mail to Berg Hil Greenleaf Ruscitti LLP, CO TRANSMITTED.[1670464] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/22/2015 04:33 PM]
483
12/28/2015
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM HUNTON & WILLIAMS LLP, with fee, RECEIVED. [1672492] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/28/2015 04:39 PM]
484
12/30/2015
ARGUMENT CD,sent via UPS next day to Hunton & Williams TRANSMITTED.[1673613] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/30/2015 08:07 AM]
485
02/02/2016
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM REINER AND REINER, with fee, RECEIVED.[1697224] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/02/2016 04:58 PM]
486
02/04/2016
ARGUMENT CD, sent to David Reiner, TRANSMITTED.[1707737] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/18/2016 03:29 PM]
491
03/03/2016
NEW CASE MANAGER, Kryzia Molina, ASSIGNED.[1718200] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/03/2016 01:30 PM]
492
04/21/2016
REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, by Vermont Law School with fee, RECEIVED.[1755601] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 04/21/2016 02:00 PM]
493
04/29/2016
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Laura Murphy of the Vermont Law School, TRANSMITTED.[1764020] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/03/2016 04:29 PM]
494
04/29/2016
ARGUMENT CD, sent to Robert Yalen, TRANSMITTED.[1764052] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 05/03/2016 04:42 PM]
496
07/12/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/12/2016 by CM/ECF. [1813130] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/12/2016 11:31 AM]
497
07/12/2016
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 07/12/2016 by CM/ECF. [1813409] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/12/2016 02:00 PM]
498
07/12/2016
ATTORNEY, Alisa Coe for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1991 Alisa Coe for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1909 Alisa Coe for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-2003 Alisa Coe for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1823 Alisa Coe for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1997, [496], ADDED.[1813496] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/12/2016 02:58 PM]
499
07/12/2016
ATTORNEY, Bradley Marshall for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1991 Bradley Marshall for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1909 Bradley Marshall for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-2003 Bradley Marshall for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1823 Bradley Marshall for Friends of the Everglades Florida Wildlife Federation Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida Sierra Club, in case 14-1997, [497], ADDED.[1813500] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/12/2016 03:01 PM]
501
10/25/2016
NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Murray, ASSIGNED.[1891245] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 10/25/2016 10:42 AM]
503
12/12/2016
NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1924846] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 12/12/2016 10:17 AM]
505
01/18/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Murray, ASSIGNED.[1949276] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 09:20 AM]
506
01/18/2017
OPINION, reversing the judgment of the district court and reinstating the challenged rule, by RDS, DC, SLC, FILED Judge Chin dissents by seperate opinion.[1949316] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 09:34 AM]
507
01/18/2017
OPINION, Dissenting, by Judge Chin, FILED.[1949326] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 09:37 AM]
509
01/18/2017
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 01/18/2017, to SDNY (WHITE PLAINS), ISSUED.[1949343] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 09:43 AM]
511
01/18/2017
JUDGMENT, FILED.[1949505] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 10:54 AM]
512
01/18/2017
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1950041] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 04:25 PM]
513
01/18/2017
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1950042] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 04:25 PM]
514
01/18/2017
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1950044] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 04:25 PM]
515
01/18/2017
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1950046] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 04:27 PM]
516
01/18/2017
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[1950047] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 01/18/2017 04:27 PM]
517
01/24/2017
ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District, FILED. Service date 01/24/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail.[1953936] [14-1823] [Entered: 01/24/2017 03:40 PM]
520
02/15/2017
STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant South Florida Water Management District in 14-1823, South Florida Water Management District in 14-1909, Appellee South Florida Water Management District in 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED.[1969068] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/15/2017 09:09 AM]
521
02/15/2017
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 02/15/2017, to SDNY (WHITE PLAINS), ISSUED.[1969078] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/15/2017 09:13 AM]
522
03/03/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 03/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [1981657] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/03/2017 01:16 PM]
523
03/03/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, FILED. Service date 03/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [1982045] [14-1823] [Entered: 03/03/2017 04:54 PM]
524
03/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Jeffrey B. Crockett [523], in place of attorney Steven M. Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[1982239] [14-1823] [Entered: 03/06/2017 09:26 AM]
525
03/06/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [522], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED.[1982270] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/06/2017 09:42 AM]
526
03/06/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated and Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 03/06/2017 by CM/ECF. [1982447] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/06/2017 10:55 AM]
527
03/06/2017
PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee Florida Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Everglades, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida and Sierra Club in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 03/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[1982465] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/06/2017 11:00 AM]
528
03/06/2017
ATTORNEY, Todd D. Ommen, [526], in place of attorney Daniel E. Estrin, SUBSTITUTED.[1982741] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:01 PM]
529
03/06/2017
PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Incorporated, Environment America, Environment Florida, Environment New Hampshire, Environment Rhode Island, Riverkeeper, Inc., Theodore Gordon Flyfishers, Incorporated, National Wildlife Federation and Waterkeeper Alliance, Incorporated in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 03/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[1982860] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/06/2017 02:38 PM]
530
03/06/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 03/06/2017 by CM/ECF. [1983100] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/06/2017 04:26 PM]
532
03/06/2017
PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 03/06/2017 by CM/ECF.[1983262] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/06/2017 07:49 PM]
533
03/07/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [530], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED.[1983390] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/07/2017 09:27 AM]
534
03/07/2017
ATTORNEY, Scott William Boak, [530], in place of attorney Thomas Aquinas Harnett SUBSTITUTED.[1983409] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/07/2017 09:34 AM]
536
03/07/2017
LETTER, caption adjustment, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington, RECEIVED. Service date 03/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[1983800] [14-1823] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:38 PM]
537
03/07/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc, [532], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-2003, FILED.[1984028] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/07/2017 03:20 PM]
538
03/07/2017
PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Washington, and the Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED. Service date 03/07/2017 by CM/ECF.[1984121] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/07/2017 04:08 PM]
539
03/08/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE: PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC [538], on behalf of Appellee State Of New York, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Michigan, Minnesota, Missouri, Washington in 14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003, FILED.[1984447] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 03/08/2017 09:20 AM]
543
04/18/2017
ORDER, petition for rehearing/petition for rehearing en banc denied, on behalf of Intervenor-Plaintiffs-Appellees, Miccosukee Tribe Of Indians Of Florida, Friends of the Everglades, Florida Wildlife Federation, and Sierra Club FILED.[2013839] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:50 PM]
545
04/18/2017
ORDER, petition for rehearing/petition for rehearing en banc denied, on behalf of Appellees, The States Of New York, Connecticut, Illinois, Maine, Michigan and Washington, and the Government of the Province of Manitoba, Canada, FILED.[2013854] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:56 PM]
546
04/25/2017
JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2018974] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 04/25/2017 01:35 PM]
547
07/20/2017
U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellant South Florida Water Management District and Appellant-Cross-Appellee Arizona Department of Water Resources, Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder, City of Colorado Springs, City of New York, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Gina McCarthy, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, State of Alaska, State of Colorado, State of Idaho, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Wyoming, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and [California] State Water Contractors in 14-1823, Appellant Central Arizona Water Conservation District, Central Utah Water Conservancy District, City and County of Denver, by and through its Board of Water Commissioners, City and County of San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, City of Aurora [Colorado], City of Boulder, City of Colorado Springs, El Dorado Irrigation District, Idaho Water Users Association, Imperial Irrigation District, Kane County [Utah] Water Conservancy District, Las Vegas Valley Water District, Lower Arkansas Valley Water Conservancy District, Metropolitan Water District of Southern California, National Water Resources Association, Salt Lake & Sandy [Utah] Metropolitan Water District, Salt River Project, San Diego County Water Authority, Southeastern Colorado Water Conservancy District, Washington County [Utah] Water District, Western Urban Water Coalition and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1909, Appellant Gina McCarthy, United States Environmental Protection Agency and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1991, Appellant South Florida Water Management District and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-1997, Appellant City of New York and Appellant-Cross-Appellee State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota and State of Wyoming in 14-2003 extension to file Writ of Certiorari until September 15, 2017, FILED.[2083301] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 07/20/2017 05:07 PM]
548
09/13/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Leon G Billings, requesting that Laura B. Murphy be removed as counsel for Amici Curiae Leon G. Billings et al. Ms. Murphy no longer works at the Vermont Law School Environmental and Natural Resources Law Clinic (ENRLC), RECEIVED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2123395] [14-1823] [Entered: 09/13/2017 11:56 AM]
550
09/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Laura B. Murphy, for Leon G. Billings et al., TERMINATED.[2124137] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/14/2017 09:09 AM]
551
09/21/2017
U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 09/19/2017, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 17-418, RECEIVED.[2130450] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/21/2017 11:56 AM]
552
09/27/2017
U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 09/25/2017, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 17-446, RECEIVED.[2134191] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 09/27/2017 09:59 AM]
553
02/26/2018
U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 02/26/2018, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 17-446, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[2244094] [14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003] [Entered: 02/26/2018 03:34 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.