Cavlovic v. J.c. Penney Corporation
Court Docket Sheet

2017-03174 (ca10)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 251 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
08/14/2017
[10489991] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/14/2017 Docketing statement due 08/28/2017 for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Transcript order form due 08/28/2017 for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 08/28/2017 for Ann Cavlovic and J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. [17-3174] [Entered: 08/14/2017 11:17 AM]
08/28/2017
[10493616] Notice of appearance submitted by Rex A. Sharp and Ryan C. Hudson for Appellee Ann Cavlovic for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/28/2017 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 8/28/17.] [17-3174] RS [Entered: 08/28/2017 10:32 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/28/2017
[10493624] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Ryan C. Hudson and Mr. Rex Sharp for Ann Cavlovic. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email [17-3174] [Entered: 08/28/2017 10:45 AM]
08/28/2017
[10493664] Notice of appearance submitted by Reagan E. Bradford for Appellee Ann Cavlovic for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-3174]--[Edited 08/28/2017 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] REB [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:08 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2017
[10493666] Notice of appearance submitted by W. Mark Lanier for Appellee Ann Cavlovic for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/28/2017 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 8/28/17.] [17-3174] WML [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:11 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2017
[10493669] Notice of appearance submitted by Bryce Bruce Bell for Appellee Ann Cavlovic for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-3174]--[Edited 08/28/2017 by JM to remove PDF as pleading was filed by the court on 8/28/17.] BB [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:14 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/28/2017
[10493673] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Reagan E. Bradford for Ann Cavlovic. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-3174] [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:24 PM]
doc
08/28/2017
[10493674] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. W. Mark Lanier for Ann Cavlovic. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email [17-3174] [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:28 PM]
doc
08/28/2017
[10493687] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Bryce Bell for Ann Cavlovic. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-3174] [Entered: 08/28/2017 12:47 PM]
08/28/2017
[10493760] Notice of appearance submitted by Mark A. Perry, Christopher Chorba, Bradley J. Hamburger and Lauren M. Blas for Appellant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/28/2017 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 8/28/17.] [17-3174] MAP [Entered: 08/28/2017 02:48 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/28/2017
[10493808] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Lauren M. Blas, Christopher Chorba, Bradley J. Hamburger for J.C. and Mr. Mark Andrew Perry for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (The names listed are attorneys previously listed in this case.) Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email [17-3174] [Entered: 08/28/2017 03:41 PM]
08/28/2017
[10493821] Notice of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Smith; JoAnn T. Sandifer for Appellant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-3174]--[Edited 08/28/2017 by JM to remove PDF as pleading was filed by the court on 8/28/17.] CAS [Entered: 08/28/2017 04:02 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/28/2017
[10493823] Docketing statement filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-3174] CAS [Entered: 08/28/2017 04:03 PM]
doc
08/28/2017
[10493824] Notice received from J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email [17-3174] CAS [Entered: 08/28/2017 04:05 PM]
08/28/2017
[10493851] Minute order filed - Notice that record is complete due 09/22/2017 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [17-3174] [Entered: 08/28/2017 04:42 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/28/2017
[10493857] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. JoAnn T. Sandifer and Mr. Christopher A. Smith, Esq. for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-3174] [Entered: 08/28/2017 05:00 PM]
doc
08/29/2017
[10494192] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/29/2017. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 10/10/2017 for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. [17-3174] [Entered: 08/29/2017 01:49 PM]
doc
08/30/2017
[10494471] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Case is referred for mediation conferencing; conference scheduled for 09/14/2017 at 2:00 PM (MDT). Please review the attached Notice for additional information. [17-3174] [Entered: 08/30/2017 09:55 AM]
doc
09/11/2017
[10496949] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 10/24/2017 for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. [17-3174] [Entered: 09/11/2017 02:05 PM]
doc
10/24/2017
[10508243] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 10/24/2017 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-3174] MAP [Entered: 10/24/2017 02:51 PM]
doc
10/24/2017
[10508247] Appellant's appendix filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 10/24/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-3174] MAP [Entered: 10/24/2017 02:55 PM]
10/25/2017
[10508480] Minute order filed - Appellee's brief now due 11/24/2017 for Ann Cavlovic. (Text Only - No Attachment) [17-3174] [Entered: 10/25/2017 11:50 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.