Center for Biological Diversity v. Zinke et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00064 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
07/09/2018
Notice (Other)
07/10/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/23/2018
Stipulation
16
07/31/2018
Order on Stipulation
17
08/06/2018
Compel
18
08/06/2018
Affidavit
19
08/09/2018
Stay
20
08/20/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
21
08/20/2018
Declaration
08/22/2018
Order on Motion to Stay (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/27/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
24
11/16/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/15/18.
25
11/26/2018
Response to Order
26
12/04/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
27
12/06/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
28
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
29
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
12/07/2018
Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
12/14/2018
Response to Order
31
12/17/2018
Order
32
12/19/2018
Notice (Other)
33
01/31/2019
Amend/Correct
02/01/2019
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.