Cesar L. Nidoy and Gina G. Nidoy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00163 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/06/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Cesar l. Nidoy and Gina g. Nidoy
64
08/13/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
65
12/13/2018
Monthly Operating Report
66
12/13/2018
Monthly Operating Report
67
03/21/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
68
03/21/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
69
04/11/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
04/12/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
04/16/2019
Hearing
71
04/30/2019
Monthly Operating Report
72
04/30/2019
Monthly Operating Report
73
05/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
74
05/03/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.