Chad Sidney Andrew Russell and Mandy Leah Russell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00011 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
79
06/07/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
80
06/07/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
82
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
83
07/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
84
07/24/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
85
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.