Chapman et al v. The City of Clanton
Court Docket Sheet

2:2015-cv-00125 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 397 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/23/2015
COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment against The City of Clanton (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602035759.), filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L
13
Exhibit M
14
Exhibit N
15
fee receipt
15 Attachments
2
02/23/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Candice Chapman.
3
02/23/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stedman Kine.
4
02/23/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael Littlefield.
5
02/23/2015
Summons Issued as to The City of Clanton and returned to counsel for personal service on the defendant.
6
02/24/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield. The City of Clanton served on Debbie Orange by process server on 2/24/2015, answer due 3/17/2015.
7
03/17/2015
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The City of Clanton.
03/17/2015
***Attorney James Wallace Porter, II for The City of Clanton added pursuant to 7 motion (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
03/18/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to The City of Clanton; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/30/2015.
1
standing order & format
1 Attachment
9
03/18/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The City of Clanton re 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
10
03/18/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The City of Clanton.
11
03/19/2015
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 7 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 4/9/2015; the def shall have until 4/16/2015 to file any response it may wish to file; the motion will be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/19/15.
12
04/09/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
1
Exhibit Ex. 1
2
Exhibit Ex. 2
3
Exhibit Ex. 3
4
Exhibit Ex. 4
5
Exhibit Ex. 5
6
Exhibit Ex. 6
7
Exhibit Ex. 7
8
Exhibit Ex. 8) Modified on 4/10/2015 to clarify text to reflect as also in response to
10
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01712456779" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01712456779','56541','39','','2','1','',''}};">10</a> brief in support of motion (qc/djy,)
9 Attachments
13
04/09/2015
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield re 12 Response to Motion, 11 Order to Show Cause.
04/13/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Mediation Conference Call held on 4/13/2015 (NO PDF Attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
04/15/2015
ORDER setting Mediation Conference for 4/28/2015 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody, in Courtroom 4B, US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; further ORDERING that counsel and the parties or a representative with full authority to settle the case shall appear at and attend this conference; on or before the close of business on 4/24/2015 each party shall provide the undersigned judge with a confidential mediation conference statement; the statement should not be filed with the clerk's office and should not be served on the other parties, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/15/15. Furnished to calendar group & WS.
04/15/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Mediation Conference Call held on 4/15/2015 (No PDF attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
04/16/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The City of Clanton. Modified on 4/17/2015 to clarify text to reflect as also a REPLY to 12 RESPONSE (qc/djy,).
16
04/28/2015
ORDER continuing Mediation Conference to 5/7/2015 @ 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody, in Courtroom 4B, US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/28/15. Furnished to calendar group & WS (previously set for 4/28/2015 @ 10:00 AM).
04/28/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Mediation Conference held on 4/28/2015 (NO PDF Attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
05/01/2015
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by All Plaintiffs
18
05/07/2015
ORDER continuing Mediation Conference to 5/14/2015 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody, in Courtroom 4B, US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/7/15. Furnished to calendar group & WS (reset from 5/7/2015).
05/07/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Mediation Conference held on 5/7/2015 (No PDF Attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Mediation Conference held on 5/14/2015 (NO PDF aAttached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
05/28/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis Conrad Anderson, IV on behalf of The City of Clanton
20
05/28/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Will Hill Tankersley, Jr on behalf of The City of Clanton
21
05/28/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Chase T Espy on behalf of The City of Clanton
22
06/10/2015
ORDER continuing the Mediation Conference to 6/16/2015 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coodym, in Courtroom 4B, US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/10/15. Furnished to calendar group & WS. (continued from 5/14/15).
06/11/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Mediation Conference held on 6/11/2015 (NO PDF Attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Mediation Conference held on 6/15/2015 (NO PDF Attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
07/07/2015
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by The City of Clanton.
1
Exhibit Executed Settlement Agreement
2
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01712514937" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01712514937','56541','100','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Text of Proposed Order) Modified on 7/8/2015 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Candice Chapman, Michael Littlefield, and Stedman Kine (qc/djy,)
2 Attachments
24
07/09/2015
ORDER (1) GRANTING; 23 Joint MOTION to Dismis; (2) the Court retains jurisdiction for (2) years from the date of this order to enforce the terms of the Parties' Settlement Agreement; and (3) the plf's claims for injunctive and declaratory relief are DISMISSED without prejudice; (4) the 7 MOTION TO DISMISS is DENIED as moot; (5) this case will continue on the claims for damages and attorney's fees. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/9/15.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
25
07/13/2015
ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/3/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/13/15.
26
07/22/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by The City of Clanton. Modified on 9/9/2015 to clarify text to remove jury demand notation as the PDF document does not include a jury demand (qc/djy,).
27
07/22/2015
Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery by The City of Clanton. Modified on 7/23/2015 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, and Michael Littlefield (qc/djy,).
28
07/23/2015
ORDER GRANTING 27 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery to the extent that the time for filing the Report of Parties Planning Meeting is EXTENDED to 9/3/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/23/15.
29
09/03/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
30
09/08/2015
ORDER directing that the parties are to file a new report of parties planning meeting no later than 9/15/15, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/8/15.
31
09/08/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
32
09/09/2015
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 6/30/2016 before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III, in Montgomery, AL; Non-Jury Trial set for 8/15/2016 before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III, in Montgomery, AL; Amended Pleadings for plf due by 1/15/2016 and for def due by 2/1/2016; Discovery due by 5/1/2016; dispositive and daubert Motions due by 4/1/2016; Mediation Notice due by 4/27/2016, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/9/15. Furnished to calendar group & EB.
33
10/13/2015
First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Class Action Complaint
1 Attachment
34
10/20/2015
Case reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
35
10/21/2015
ORDER directing that defendant file a response to the 33 First MOTION to Amend1] Complaint on or before 11/3/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/21/15.
36
10/21/2015
ORDER RESCHEDULING the Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2016 to 7/7/2016 before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; the Non-Jury Trial date will remain as previously scheduled, 8/15/2016 before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins, in Courtroom 2B of the FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/21/15. Furnished to calendar group & AR.
37
10/21/2015
GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER for any motions to remand, motions to dismiss, motions for judgment on the pleadings, motions for summary judgment, and Daubert motions setting briefing schedule, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/21/15.
38
10/22/2015
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 40 ORDER) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield. Modified on 10/23/2015.
1
Exhibit Motion and Brief in Support of Class Certification
2
Exhibit Plaintiffs' Jury Demand
2 Attachments
39
10/23/2015
MOTION to Withdraw 38 Amended Complaint, by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
40
10/23/2015
ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw 38 Amended Complaint; The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/23/2015.
41
11/02/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 33 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by The City of Clanton.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
42
11/04/2015
ORDER granting 33 Motion to Amend the complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/4/15.
43
11/04/2015
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
1
Supplement Legal brief in support of class certification
2
Supplement Plaintiffs' Jury Demand
2 Attachments
11/04/2015
MOTION to Certify Class by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.(NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry 43 attachment 1). (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/04/2015
LEGAL BRIEF in Support re 43 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry 43 attachment 1). (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/04/2015
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry 43 attachment 2). (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
11/10/2015
MOTION to Dismiss by The City of Clanton.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
45
11/17/2015
(VACATED pursuant to 48 ORDER) ORDER directing the defendant's file a response brief to the 43 MOTION to Certify Classon or before 12/7/2015; plf's reply brief, if any shall be due 7 days after the date the response is filed, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/17/15. Modified on 11/23/2015.
46
11/17/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Carl Cook on behalf of The City of Clanton
47
11/20/2015
MOTION to Stay re 45 Order, Set Deadlines, or Alternately Motion to Amend by The City of Clanton.
48
11/23/2015
ORDER directing that the pls file a response to the 47 MOTION to Stay on or before 11/30/2015; further ORDERING that all briefing deadlines on the motion for class certification are suspended, and the 45 order setting briefing deadlines on the motion for class certification is VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/23/15.
49
11/23/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 47 MOTION to Stay re 45 Order, Set Deadlines, or Alternately Motion to Amend filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
50
11/24/2015
ORDER GRANTING 47 MOTION to Stay deadlines; further ORDERING that the 43 MOTION for class certification is DENIED without prejudice to refile the motion within 14 days after the court enters a ruling on the 44 motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/24/15.
51
12/01/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
52
12/08/2015
REPLY BRIEF filed by The City of Clanton.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
3 Attachments
53
12/18/2015
NOTICE by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield re 52 Reply Brief, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 51 Response to Motion Notice of Supplemental Authority
1
Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority
2
Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Supplemental Authority
2 Attachments
54
12/23/2015
ORDERED that, on or before 12/30/2015, Dft may file a supplemental reply in support of its motion to dismiss; Dft's supplemental reply shall be addressed solely to the 53 notice of supplemental authority. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/23/2015.
55
12/30/2015
SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY in support of 44 motion to dismiss re: Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority filed by The City of Clanton. Modified on 1/4/2016 to clarify text to reflect heading of main pdf document (qc/djy,).
56
02/08/2016
NOTICE by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield Second Notice of Supplemental Authority
1
Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority
2
Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Supplemental Authority
3
Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Supplemental Authority
3 Attachments
57
02/16/2016
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 56 Notice (Other), filed by The City of Clanton.
1
Exhibit Form CR-50
1 Attachment
58
03/23/2016
MOTION for Extension of Deadline To amend complaint, add parties, and complete discovery by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
59
04/01/2016
ORDER GRANTING plf's unopposed 58 MOTION to extend Deadlines; this case and all deadlines in the 32 scheduling order are STAYED pending further orders of the court; the pretrial conference previously set for 7/7/2016 is CONTINUED generally; the trial previously set for 8/15/2016 is CONTINUED generally. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/1/16. Furnished to calendar group & AR. Furnished to calendar & AR (terminates Pretrial Conference 07/07/2016; Non-Jury Trial 08/15/2016).
60
04/11/2016
MOTION to Stay Discovery by The City of Clanton.
61
04/13/2016
ORDER further clarifying 59 order: pursuant to the 4/1/2016 order, this case, including discovery, and all deadlines in the 32 scheduling order are STAYED pending further orders of the court; def's 60 MOTION to Stay discovery is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/13/16.
62
04/27/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by George Daniel Evans on behalf of Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield
63
04/27/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by George Daniel Evans on behalf of Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield
64
04/27/2016
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Restated Complaint And Memorandum of Law in Support by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
1
Exhibit 1 - Second Amended and Restated Complaint
1 Attachment
04/27/2016
***Attorney Alexandria Parrish for Candice Chapman,Alexandria Parrish for Stedman Kine,Alexandria Parrish for Michael Littlefield added pursuant to 63 notice (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
05/02/2016
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why 64 Motion for Leave to File a second amended complaint should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 5/16/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/2/16.
66
05/16/2016
RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' 64 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Restated Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by The City of Clanton. Modified on 5/17/2016 to reflect actual title, clean up text, and include names of exhibits.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
67
05/23/2016
REPLY BRIEF re 66 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs Reply to Clantons Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to File Second Amended and Restated Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
68
06/15/2016
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Chief Judge William Keith Watkins, Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case as presiding and referral judges.
69
07/20/2016
ORDER Setting Motion Hearing re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss for 8/18/2016 @ 02:30 PM before Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth, in Courtroom 2F. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/20/16. Furnished to calendar group & AR.
70
08/11/2016
Notice to counsel: Counsel are advised that the hearing in the cases referred to in note 1 of the Court's 69 order of 7/20/2016, has been moved from 10:00 AM to 1:00 PM on 8/18/2016. The hearing will still be held in Courtroom 2-F. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/11/16.
71
08/18/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth: Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2016 re 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Clanton, 64 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Restated Complaint And Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Stedman Kine, Candice Chapman, Michael Littlefield (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Patricia G. Starkie.)
72
10/05/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Knox Friedman on behalf of The City of Clanton
73
12/15/2016
ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint; further ORDERING that the pending 44 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT given that plfs are granted leave to file their second amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/9/16.
74
12/15/2016
AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED AND RESTATED COMPLAINT against The City of Clanton, Judicial Correction Services, LLC, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, CHC Companies, Inc., filed by Candice Chapman, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield, Deangelo Barnett, Tracy Dubose.
1
Exhibit A - Failure to Report Letter
2
Exhibit B - Notice to Show Cause
3
Exhibit C - Petitions for Revocation
4
Exhibit D - Warrants
4 Attachments
75
12/20/2016
Summons Issued; summons and 74 Amended Complaint mailed CMRRR to CHC Companies, Inc., Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Judicial Correction Services, LLC.
76
12/27/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 74 Amended Complaint, by The City of Clanton.
77
12/29/2016
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and amended complaint signed by Julie Buckner for Correct Care Solutions, LLC served on 12/27/2016, answer due 1/17/2017.
78
12/29/2016
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and amended complaint signed by Julie Buckner for CHC Companies, Inc. served on 12/27/2016, answer due 1/17/2017.
79
12/29/2016
MOTION TO DISMISS All Claims in the 74 Second Amended Complaint and Restated Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The City of Clanton. Modified on 12/30/2016 to create link to Doc. 74 and reflect actual title.
80
12/29/2016
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 74 Amended Complaint, 79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The City of Clanton.
1
Exhibit Report of Sue Bell Cobb
2
Exhibit Judicial Inquiry Commission Complaint
3
Exhibit Municipal Judge Oath
4
Exhibit Magistrate/Warrant Clerk Oath
5
Exhibit Declaration of Jim Porter
6
Exhibit Declaration of Warren Kinney
6 Attachments
81
01/03/2017
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and amended complaint signed by Alexa (illegible) for Judicial Correction Services, LLC served on (no date given), answer due 1/23/2017.
82
01/17/2017
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 74 Second Amended and Restated Complaint by CHC Companies, Inc., Correct Care Solutions, LLC. Modified on 1/18/2017 to create link to Doc. 74.
1
Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss
1 Attachment
01/17/2017
***Attorney Brian C. Richardson added for CHC Companies, Inc., and Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (see Doc. 82 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2017
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 74 Second Amended and Restated Complaint filed by CHC Companies, Inc., Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (NO PDF, see Doc. 82 for pdf.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
01/18/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Maurine C Evans on behalf of Deangelo Barnett, Candice Chapman, Tracy Dubose, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield
84
01/19/2017
MOTION to Strike DOC. 80 -1 THROUGH 80 -6 OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY by Deangelo Barnett, Candice Chapman, Tracy Dubose, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield. Modified on 4/25/2017 to create actual hyperlink to Doc. 80.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01712812813" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01712812813','56541','319','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit A - Declaration of G. Daniel Evans) Modified on 1/20/2017 to clarify text to reflect attachment 1 as Exhibit A (qc/djy,). Added alternative MOTION to Stay as reflected in main PDF document on 1/20/2017 (qc/djy,)
1 Attachment
85
01/19/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Deangelo Barnett, Candice Chapman, Tracy Dubose, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
86
01/23/2017
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Judicial Correction Services, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
01/23/2017
***Attorney Wilson F. Green added for Judicial Correction Services, LLC. (see Doc. 86 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
01/26/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Stephen Logsdon on behalf of Judicial Correction Services, LLC
88
01/26/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Kyle Winborn on behalf of Judicial Correction Services, LLC
89
01/26/2017
REPLY BRIEF in support of 79 motion to dismiss; re 85 Response in Opposition to Motion, 80 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, filed by The City of Clanton. Modified on 1/27/2017 to clarify text to reflect as in support of 79 motion to dismiss (qc/djy,).
90
01/26/2017
RESPONSE to Motion re 84 MOTION to Strike DOCS. 80-1 THROUGH 80-6 OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STAY MOTION to Stay filed by The City of Clanton.
91
02/07/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Deangelo Barnett, Candice Chapman, Tracy Dubose, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield. Modified on 2/8/2017 to clarify text to reflect as also re 82 MOTION to dismiss (qc/djy,).
92
02/07/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended and Restated Complaint filed by Deangelo Barnett, Candice Chapman, Tracy Dubose, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
93
02/14/2017
REPLY BRIEF re 86 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Judicial Correction Services, LLC.
94
02/14/2017
REPLY BRIEF re 92 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by CHC Companies, Inc., Correct Care Solutions, LLC.
95
02/22/2017
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Correct Care Solutions, LLC.
96
02/22/2017
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by CHC Companies, Inc.
97
02/23/2017
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Judicial Correction Services, LLC.
98
02/24/2017
NOTICE by The City of Clanton re 89 Reply Brief, 79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 80 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, Supplemental Authority
1
Exhibit Ray v. Childersburg Memorandum Opinion
2
Exhibit Fourth Amended Complaint - Ray
2 Attachments
99
04/25/2017
ORDER: Before the Court is plaintiffs' 84 Motion to strike documents 80 -1 through 80 -6 or, in the alternative, to stay the motion containing those documents. Defendant concedes that the documents should be struck. See Resp. Mot. to Strike 3, ECF No. 90 ("[T]he City of Clanton would concede to the Court striking the Exhibits attached to its Motion to Dismiss.") Accordingly, plaintiffs' motion 84 is GRANTED. The documents labeled ECF No. 80 -1 through 80 -6 shall be struck. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2017.
100
04/25/2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION: This case is one of several before the Court that all contain similar allegations: that Alabama cities attempting to increase municipal budgets were running debtors prisons and implementing policies that adversely impacted indigent residents of those cities. Currently before the Court are motions to dismiss plaintiffs amended complaint under FRCP 12(b)(6). Such motions were filed by the City of Clanton, Judicial Correction Services (JCS), and CHC Companies, Inc. These motions will be granted in part and denied in part as further set out in the opinion. Though distinct in certain ways, this case is similar to other cases pending before this Court, most notably McCullough v. City of Montgomery, 2:15-cv-463, and Carter v. City of Montgomery,2:15-cv-555. This memorandum opinion should be read in conjunction with the opinions issued in those cases, as the issues overlap and Court will not repeat its analysis in this memorandum opinion. The memorandum opinions in those cases can be found at docket entry 131 in McCullough and docket entry 97 in Carter. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2017.
101
04/25/2017
ORDER: Upon consideration of defendants' motions 79, 82, 86 to dismiss the amended complaint, the supporting memoranda of points and authorities, the oppositions and replies thereto, the motions hearing, and the entire record herein, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motions be, and hereby are, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. As stated in the memorandum opinion issued on this date, defendants' motions are GRANTED with respect to count eleven. Count eleven is hereby dismissed. Defendants' motions are DENIED with respect to the remaining claims. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/25/2017.
102
05/04/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Ginny Willcox Leavens on behalf of The City of Clanton
103
05/04/2017
MOTION TO LIFT STAY re 59 Order by Deangelo Barnett, Candice Chapman, Tracy Dubose, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield. Modified on 5/12/2017 to create link to Doc. 59.
1
Exhibit 1 - Evans' 4 27 17 ltr to counsel
2
Exhibit 2 -Emails between counsel
2 Attachments
104
05/08/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 103 MOTION TO LIFT STAY filed by The City of Clanton.
105
05/09/2017
ANSWER to 74 Amended Complaint, by The City of Clanton.
106
05/09/2017
ANSWER to 74 Amended Complaint, by CHC Companies, Inc., Correct Care Solutions, LLC.
107
05/09/2017
ANSWER to 74 Amended Complaint, by Judicial Correction Services, LLC.
108
05/15/2017
REPLY BRIEF re [104] Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Deangelo Barnett, Candice Chapman, Tracy Dubose, Stedman Kine, Michael Littlefield.
109
09/08/2017
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by The City of Clanton.
110
09/28/2017
ORDER DENYING as moot [76] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer second amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/28/2017.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.