Chappell v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00201 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/10/2018
Complaint
2
09/10/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
09/10/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
09/10/2018
Unissued Summons
5
09/10/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
09/10/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/27/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
09/28/2018
Scheduling Order
09/28/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/30/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
9
10/06/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
11/19/2018
Answer to Complaint
11
11/19/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
12
12/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
13
01/18/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
14
02/01/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.