Charles Edward Forrest
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00200 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
06/26/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
06/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/26/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
06/26/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/28/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
06/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/29/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
07/19/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
07/24/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/30/2018
Entry of Appearance
16
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
17
08/02/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
19
08/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
21
08/20/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
22
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
08/23/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.