Charles Edward Sadler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-03624 (alnb)

Trustee's Request for Case Status Change Requiring Action Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds.

THOMAS E. REYNOLDS, TRUSTEE 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 502 Birmingham, AL 35203 REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS CHANGE REQUIRING ACTION Clerk, United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama Robert S. Vance Federal Building 1800 Fifth Avenue North Birmingham, AL 35203 Re: Charles Edward Sadler Bankruptcy Case No. 17 - 03624 Dear Sir / Madam: Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 (e), the original notice of the meeting of creditors mailed in the above - style case provided that no claims should be filed because the Debtor's schedules described no assets from which dividends could be generated. Since then, I discovered property of the estate that will be or has been reduced to cash. After payment of administrative expenses, it appears there will be a distribution to unsecured creditors. Please notify creditors to file proofs of claims. Yours very truly, / s / Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Case 17 - 03624 - TOM7 Doc 15 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 27: 33 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Application to Employ Clydette Hughes of Asset Liquidators, Inc. as Sales Broker/Auctioneer Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In Re: CHARLES EDWARD SADLER,) Bankruptcy Case No. 17 - 03624 Debtors. APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL PERSON Pursuant to 11U.S. C. 327 (a) and Bankruptcy Rule 2014 (a), the Trustee of the captioned bankruptcy case the captioned Debtor - in - possession in Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (hereinafter " Applicant"), requests the Court to approve the employment of Clydette Hughes of Asset Liquidators, Inc. 3902 Angel Drive Bessemer, Alabama 35022 (205) 612 - 4221 assetlig @ gmail. com as Sales Broker / Auctioneer to represent or assist Applicant in carrying out the duties as Trustee under Title 11 of the United States Code. In support of this request, Applicant represents as follows: 1. The person whose employment is requested (hereinafter " said person") (a) is professionally qualified and licensed, if required, for such employment; does not hold or represent an interest adverse to the estate; Case 17 - 03624 - TOM7 Doc 16 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 12: 36: 56 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 4 (c) is a disinterested person as that term is defined in $ 101 (14) of the Bankruptcy Code; and has not served as an examiner in this case. 2. Said person is not employed by and does not represent a creditor in this case unless indicated under (a) below. (a) Said person is employed by or represents the following creditor (s), but Applicant is not aware of any objection by another creditor to said person's employment or of any actual conflict of interest if the employment here requested is approved: (IF NONE, so state) NONE 3. The specific facts showing the necessity for the employment here requested are as follows: The Debtor (s) owns property located at 436 Wilderness Road, Pelham, Alabama. The professional services to be rendered are as follows: To determine the value of the property, assist in locating a purchaser for the property and in consummating the sale. 5. The reasons for the selection of said person are: Said person is a qualified, licensed broker in the area. 6. All of said person's connections with the Debtor, creditors, other parties in interest, and with their respective attorneys and accountants, are as follows: (IF NONE, so state) NONE 7. Except as stated below, the representations made in this Application with respect to said person, apply to each of that person's partners and associates and members of the firm, professional corporation or other entity with whom or with which said person is professionally associated. Case 17 - 03624 - TOM7 Doc 16 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 12: 36: 56 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 4 NONE With the condition that the Court may allow different compensation after the conclusion of said person's employment if the terms and conditions herein proposed prove to have been improvident in light of developments not capable of being presently anticipated, Applicant proposes the following reasonable terms and conditions of said person's employment: Retainer (if any): N / A Allowance for expenses (if any): Applicant is to be reimbursed for expenses associated with the marketing of this property. Hourly basis for said person and for each other person expected to perform work and to be included in any application for compensation: N / A Contingent fee basis (if applicable): If Applicant lists the property and locates a purchaser, Applicant is to receive a 6 % commission on the sales price of the subject property following a closing of such sale and following this Court's Order approving such commission. Should the property be auctioned, Applicant is to receive a 10 % commission of the sales price of the subject property following a closing of such sale and following this Court's Order approving such commission. Other: Applicant respectfully requests this Court to enter an order authorizing Applicant to employ said persons as broker for the estate. Synulli / s / Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee 3 - Case 17 - 03624 - TOM7 Doc 16 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 12: 36: 56 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 4 VERIFIED STATEMENT OF PERSON TO BE EMPLOYED I have read the above and foregoing Application. As required by Bankruptcy Rule 2014 (a), and in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 9011 (b) and 28U.S. C. 1746, I declare under penalty of perjury that the statements there made with reference to me and my professional associates are true and correct. THIS the 13th day of February, 2018. / s / Clydette Hughes Clydette Hughes Asset Liquidators, Inc. 3902 Angel Drive Bessemer. Alabama 35022 (205) 612 - 4221 assetliq @ gmail. com - 4 - Case 17 - 03624 - TOM7 Doc 16 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 12: 36: 56 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 4

Notice to Creditors to File Claims within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90-day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later

Van−004 [Notice to File Claims] (Rev. 03/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−03624−TOM7 Charles Edward Sadler Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−1303 Debtor(s) NOTICE TO FILE CLAIMS Notice is hereby given that there may be assets from which a dividend could be paid in this case. Any creditor wishing to participate if there are proceeds from assets available for distribution must, pursuant to Rule 3002 (c)(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, file a proof of claim within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90−day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later. Notice is further given that should you fail to file a claim within the time fixed, your claim may be barred. If you have previously filed such a claim, you need not file again. A proof of claim form can be obtained at any bankruptcy clerk's office or by visiting www.uscourts.gov/forms/bankruptcy−forms. Claims can be filed electronically through the court's website at: www.alnb.uscourts.gov/electronic−proof−claim. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court cdr Case 17-03624-TOM7 Doc 17 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 13:14:04 Desc Notice to File Claims Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[17] Notice to Creditors to File Claims). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-03624-TOM Charles Edward Sadler Chapter 7 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: crobey Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: van004 Total Noticed: 18 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db Charles Edward Sadler, 436 Wilderness Rd, Pelham, AL 35124-1534 auc +Clydette Hughes, Asset Liquidators, Inc., 3902 Angel Drive, Bessemer, AL 35022-3833 9468324 +AmeriFinancial Solutions. Llc, Po Box 65018, Baltimore, MD 21264-5018 9468319 +Nationstar Mortgage LLC, 8950 Cypress Waters Blvd, Coppell, TX 75019-4620 9468329 +PMAB, LLC, 4135 South Stream Blvd, Suite 400, Charlotte, NC 28217-4636 9468322 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. tr +EDI: QTEREYNOLDS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Thomas E Reynolds, Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC, 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N, Suite 503, Birmingham, AL 35203-3354 smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 18:29:25 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 ba +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 18:29:25 Bankruptcy Administrator, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 9468323 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcies@alliancecollectionservice.com Feb 13 2018 18:31:05 Alliance Collection Service, Inc, Po Box 49, Tupelo, MS 38802-0049 9468325 +EDI: CITICORP.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 At&T Universal Citi Card, Po Box 6500, Sioux Falls, SD 57117-6500 9468326 +EDI: CHASE.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Chase Card, Po Box 15298, Wilmington, DE 19850-5298 9468327 +EDI: DISCOVER.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Discover Financial, Po Box 3025, New Albany, OH 43054-3025 9468318 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy.bnc@ditech.com Feb 13 2018 18:28:50 Ditech, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 6172, Rapid City, SD 57709-6172 9468328 +E-mail/Text: bknotice@ercbpo.com Feb 13 2018 18:29:48 ERC/Enhanced Recovery Corp, 8014 Bayberry Rd, Jacksonville, FL 32256-7412 9468321 +EDI: IRS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Internal Revenue Service TCS, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6432 9498476 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@republicfinance.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:45 Republic Finance, LLC, 1140 Roma Avenue, Hammond, LA 70403 9468320 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@republicfinance.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:45 Republic Finance, 9200 Highway 119 Ste 150, Alabaster, AL 35007-5355 TOTAL: 12 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Charles Edward Sadler brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Thomas E Reynolds ter@reynoldslegalsolutions.com, treynolds@ecf.epiqsystems.com;dnm@reynoldslegalsolutions.com TOTAL: 2 Case 17-03624-TOM7 Doc 18 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 Van−004 [Notice to File Claims] (Rev. 03/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−03624−TOM7 Charles Edward Sadler Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−1303 Debtor(s) NOTICE TO FILE CLAIMS Notice is hereby given that there may be assets from which a dividend could be paid in this case. Any creditor wishing to participate if there are proceeds from assets available for distribution must, pursuant to Rule 3002 (c)(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, file a proof of claim within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90−day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later. Notice is further given that should you fail to file a claim within the time fixed, your claim may be barred. If you have previously filed such a claim, you need not file again. A proof of claim form can be obtained at any bankruptcy clerk's office or by visiting www.uscourts.gov/forms/bankruptcy−forms. Claims can be filed electronically through the court's website at: www.alnb.uscourts.gov/electronic−proof−claim. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court cdr Case 17-03624-TOM7 Doc 18 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 247 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/23/2017
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Charles Edward Sadler
3
08/23/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Charles Edward Sadler.
4
08/23/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Charles Edward Sadler.
08/23/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(17-03624-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21075070. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/23/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/25/2017 at 03:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 11/27/2017.
6
08/23/2017
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 8/23/2017.
7
08/24/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
08/24/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Charles Edward Sadler Case Number 17-01054, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/11/2017, Dismissed for Other Reason on 06/26/2017.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 08/25/2017.
9
08/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 08/26/2017.
10
11/05/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
11
11/28/2017
***ENTERED IN ERROR - NO PDF ATTACHED***Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 11/28/2017. (asc) Modified on 11/28/2017
12
11/28/2017
Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 11/28/2017.
11/28/2017
Corrective Entry - no pdf attached (RE: related document(s) 11 Order Discharging Debtor(s)). (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
14
01/30/2018
Request for Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report
15
02/13/2018
Trustee's Request for Case Status Change Requiring Action Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds.
16
02/13/2018
Application to Employ Clydette Hughes of Asset Liquidators, Inc. as Sales Broker/Auctioneer Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds
17
02/13/2018
Notice to Creditors to File Claims within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90-day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later
18
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[17] Notice to Creditors to File Claims). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
doc
05/22/2018
Response
doc
05/22/2018
Court Audio
doc
05/23/2018
Sell Property
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.