Charles Kenneth Hunt and Tiffany Ann Karling-Hunt
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00316 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
09/21/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
3
09/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
09/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
09/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
09/21/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
7
09/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
09/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/22/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
09/24/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
09/28/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
16
09/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
10/12/2018
Notice of Non-Compliance (LBF37)
18
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
10/16/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
20
10/25/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
21
10/25/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
22
10/25/2018
Certificate of Service
10/30/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
10/31/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
24
10/31/2018
Certificate of Service
11/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
11/30/2018
Request for Special Notice
26
11/30/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
27
12/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
28
12/04/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
29
12/07/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.