Charles King, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01457 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
12/23/2018
Relief from Stay
12/23/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
12/23/2018
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
41
12/23/2018
Affidavit
42
12/26/2018
Final Hearing Set
44
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
03/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
57
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
58
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.