Charles v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00230 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/04/2018
Complaint
2
10/04/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
10/04/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/04/2018
Unissued Summons
4
10/16/2018
Order
5
10/17/2018
Notice (Other)
6
11/15/2018
Order
7
11/16/2018
Notice (Other)
8
12/10/2018
Answer to Complaint
9
12/11/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
10
12/28/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
11
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
12
01/31/2019
Order
13
01/31/2019
Stipulation
14
02/01/2019
Withdraw
02/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/21/2019
Status Report
17
02/21/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
02/22/2019
Docket Annotation re Duplicate Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/27/2019
Scheduling Order
19
04/19/2019
Witness List

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.