Charlie P. Bungay, Sr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00410 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/30/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
11/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
11/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
11/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/03/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
12/03/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/03/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
12/03/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
12/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
12/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
12/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
12/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
12/06/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
02/11/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
14
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/25/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/26/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
17
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
03/04/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.