Chasity Marie Alexander
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00068 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/06/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
03/06/2019
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
03/06/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
03/07/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
03/07/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
03/07/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
5
03/07/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
03/07/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
03/08/2019
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
8
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
03/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
03/12/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
03/28/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
04/15/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.