Cheatham v. adt Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2015-cv-02137 (azd)

STATUS REPORT Re Stay Order (Doc. No. 134) by Janet Cheatham.

Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 142 Filed 05/08/17 Page 1 of 4 1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 142 Filed 05/08/17 Page 2 of 4 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Hallam Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and 7 ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL 8 (USDC CD Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] The Parties 21 on February 6, 2017 filed the requested Joint Report. [Doc. 138] Thirty days later, the 22 Parties filed a status report in which they updated the Court on their progress toward a final 23 settlement and requested an additional stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 139] The Court 24 granted that request, extending its stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days from March 20, 25 2017 (that is, until June 18, 2017) and ordering the continuation of 30-day status reports. 26 [Doc. 140] The immediate filing is the second of those status reports. 27 On March 23, 2017, Plaintiffs in the Edenborough action filed an unopposed Motion 28 for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The motion presented to the-2-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 142 Filed 05/08/17 Page 3 of 4 1 Edenborough Court the settlement agreement reached by the parties to the Actions 2 (including the Parties to the Arizona Action) and asked the Court for approval of that 3 agreement, for certification of the proposed settlement class, for appointment of the 4 settlement class representatives, for appointment of settlement class counsel, and for 5 approval of the manner and form of notice to the members of the settlement class. As an 6 exhibit to the Motion for Preliminary Approval, Plaintiffs filed a proposed settlement 7 timeline requesting a final approval hearing on August 17, 2017. The Edenborough Court 8 set a hearing date of April 27, 2017 for Plaintiffs’ unopposed Motion for Preliminary 9 Approval, but on April 17, 2017 entered an order vacating that hearing, noting that "the 10 matter was suitable for disposition without oral argument." As of this date, the 11 Edenborough Court has not issued a ruling on Plaintiffs’ unopposed Motion for 12 Preliminary Approval. 13 As directed in the Stay Order, the Parties will file the next status report in the 14 Arizona Action on the first weekday after thirty days from the date of this filing has passed 15 (that is, on June 8, 2017), and every thirty days thereafter. 16 17 Respectfully submitted this 8th day of May, 2017. 18 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 19 20 By s/Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/J. Steven Sparks Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) 21 William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 22 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 23 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com fbalint@bffb.com 24 bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 25 McNEW P.A. Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., 26 Suite 100 27 Boca Raton, FL 33431 (561)299-0257 28 mcnew@mcnew.net-3-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 142 Filed 05/08/17 Page 4 of 4 1 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) 2 Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 3 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN 4 PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 5 Chicago, IL 60654 6 (312) 494-4400 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com 7 Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com 8 Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 9 Attorneys for Defendant 10 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 12 I hereby certify that on May 8, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 13 document to the Clerk’s Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 14 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 15 16 By: s/Karen Vanderbilt 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-4-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Extend Stay by ADT LLC.

Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 143 Filed 06/08/17 Page 1 of 4 1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT AND JOINT MOTION 19 TO EXTEND STAY ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 143 Filed 06/08/17 Page 2 of 4 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6 • Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9 • Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11 • Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13 • Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] The Parties 21 on February 6, 2017 filed the requested Joint Report. [Doc. 138] Thirty days later, the 22 Parties filed a status report in which they updated the Court on their progress toward a final 23 settlement and requested an additional stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 139] The Court 24 granted that request, extending its stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days from March 20, 25 2017 (that is, until June 18, 2017) and ordering the continuation of 30-day status reports. 26 [Doc. 140] The immediate filing is the third of those status reports. 27 On March 23, 2017, Plaintiffs filed an unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval 28 of Class Action Settlement in the Edenborough case. The motion presented to the-2-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 143 Filed 06/08/17 Page 3 of 4 1 Edenborough Court the settlement agreement reached by the parties to the Actions 2 (including the Parties to the Arizona Action) and asked the Court for approval of that 3 agreement, for certification of the proposed settlement class, for appointment of the 4 settlement class representatives, for appointment of settlement class counsel, and for 5 approval of the manner and form of notice to the members of the settlement class. As an 6 exhibit to the Motion for Preliminary Approval, Plaintiffs filed a proposed settlement 7 timeline requesting a final approval hearing on August 17, 2017. The Edenborough Court 8 set a hearing date of April 27, 2017 for Plaintiffs’ unopposed Motion for Preliminary 9 Approval, but on April 17, 2017 entered an order vacating that hearing, noting that "the 10 matter was suitable for disposition without oral argument." As of this date, however, the 11 Edenborough Court has not issued a ruling on Plaintiffs’ unopposed Motion for 12 Preliminary Approval. 13 On June 5, 2017, the Parties submitted to the Edenborough Court a Joint Request 14 For Case Management Conference, to which the Court has not yet responded. 15 To allow continued supervision of the class settlement approval process by the 16 Edenborough Court, the Parties hereby request that this Arizona Action be stayed an 17 18 additional 90 days. As directed in the Court’s March 20, 2017 order [Doc. 140], the Parties 19 will file the next status report with this Court on the first weekday after thirty days from 20 the date of this filing has passed (that is, on July 10, 2017), and every thirty days thereafter. 21 Respectfully submitted this 8th day of June, 2017. 22 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 23 24 By s/Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/J. Steven Sparks Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) 25 William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 26 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 27 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 28 fbalint@bffb.com-3-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 143 Filed 06/08/17 Page 4 of 4 bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 1 McNEW P.A. 2 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 100 3 Boca Raton, FL 33431 4 (561)299-0257 mcnew@mcnew.net 5 6 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 7 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 8 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 9 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 10 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 11 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com 12 Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 13 14 Attorneys for Defendant 15 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 17 I hereby certify that on June 8, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 18 document to the Clerk’s Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 19 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 20 21 By: s/Zina B. Seyferth 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-4-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) re Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.

Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 145 Filed 07/10/17 Page 1 of 5 1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 145 Filed 07/10/17 Page 2 of 5 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] The Parties 21 on February 6, 2017 filed the requested Joint Report. [Doc. 138] Thirty days later, the 22 Parties filed a status report in which they updated the Court on their progress toward a final 23 settlement and requested an additional stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 139] The Court 24 granted that request, extending its stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days from March 20, 25 2017 (that is, until June 18, 2017) and ordering the continuation of 30-day status reports. 26 [Doc. 140] 27 On June 8, 2017, the Parties in their third status report requested a continued stay 28 of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 143] The Court on June 15, 2017 granted the Parties’ request,-2-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 145 Filed 07/10/17 Page 3 of 5 1 extending the stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days (that is, until September 13, 2017), 2 and ordered the Parties to submit a status report on or before July 10, 2017, in addition to 3 continued status reports every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 144] 4 On March 23, 2017, Plaintiffs filed an unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval 5 of Class Action Settlement in the Edenborough case. The motion presented to the 6 Edenborough Court the settlement agreement reached by the parties to the Actions 7 (including the Parties to the Arizona Action) and asked the Court for approval of that 8 agreement, for certification of the proposed settlement class, for appointment of the 9 settlement class representatives, for appointment of settlement class counsel, and for 10 approval of the manner and form of notice to the members of the settlement class. As an 11 exhibit to the Motion for Preliminary Approval, Plaintiffs filed a proposed settlement 12 timeline requesting a final approval hearing on August 17, 2017. The Edenborough Court 13 set a hearing date of April 27, 2017 for Plaintiffs’ unopposed Motion for Preliminary 14 Approval, but on April 17, 2017 entered an order vacating that hearing, noting that "the 15 matter was suitable for disposition without oral argument." 16 As of this date, however, the Edenborough Court has not issued a ruling on 17 18 Plaintiffs’ unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval. On June 5, 2017, the Parties 19 submitted a Joint Request For Case Management Conference. In response, the 20 Edenborough Court on July 7, 2017 issued an Order setting a Case Management 21 Conference for July 20, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the proposed settlement. 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-3-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 145 Filed 07/10/17 Page 4 of 5 1 Respectfully submitted this 10th day of July, 2017. 2 3 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 4 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 5 By s/Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/J. Steven Sparks 6 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 7 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 8 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 9 fbalint@bffb.com bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 10 McNEW P.A. 11 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 100 12 Boca Raton, FL 33431 13 (561)299-0257 mcnew@mcnew.net 14 15 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 16 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 17 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 18 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 19 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 20 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com 21 Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 22 23 Attorneys for Defendant 24 25 26 27 28-4-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 145 Filed 07/10/17 Page 5 of 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1 I hereby certify that on July 10, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 2 document to the Clerk’s Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 3 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 4 5 By: s/Karen Vanderbilt 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-5-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.

Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 146 Filed 08/09/17 Page 1 of 5 1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 146 Filed 08/09/17 Page 2 of 5 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] The Parties 21 on February 6, 2017 filed the requested Joint Report. [Doc. 138] Thirty days later, the 22 Parties filed a status report in which they updated the Court on their progress toward a final 23 settlement and requested an additional stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 139] The Court 24 granted that request, extending its stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days from March 20, 25 2017 (that is, until June 18, 2017) and ordering the continuation of 30-day status reports. 26 [Doc. 140] 27 On June 8, 2017, the Parties in their third status report requested a continued stay 28 of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 143] The Court on June 15, 2017 granted the Parties’ request,-2-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 146 Filed 08/09/17 Page 3 of 5 1 extending the stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days (that is, until September 13, 2017), 2 and ordered the Parties to submit a status report on or before July 10, 2017, in addition to 3 continued status reports every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 144] 4 On March 23, 2017, Plaintiffs filed an unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval 5 of Class Action Settlement in the Edenborough case, the Honorable Jon S. Tigar presiding. 6 The motion presented to Judge Tigar the settlement agreement reached by the parties to the 7 Actions (including the Parties to the Arizona Action) and asked the Court for approval of 8 that agreement, for certification of the proposed settlement class, for appointment of the 9 settlement class representatives, for appointment of settlement class counsel, and for 10 approval of the manner and form of notice to the members of the settlement class. As an 11 exhibit to the Motion for Preliminary Approval, Plaintiffs filed a proposed settlement 12 timeline leading to a final approval hearing on August 17, 2017. 13 On July 20, 2017, Judge Tigar held a Case Management Conference, at which the 14 Court and the Parties addressed a number of issues related to preliminary approval of the 15 proposed Class Settlement. On July 24, 2017, Plaintiffs filed a supplemental declaration 16 in support of preliminary approval of the proposed Class Settlement, and a revised 17 18 proposed timetable leading to a final approval hearing 107 days from the date of entry of a 19 preliminary approval order. Plaintiffs’ Motion for Preliminary Approval remains under 20 advisement. 21 The next status report to this Court is due September 8, 2017. Since this Arizona 22 Action is stayed by earlier Order of the Court until September 13, 2017, the Parties expect 23 in their September status report to request a continued stay of the Arizona Action while the 24 settlement approval process continues in the Edenborough action. 25 26 27 28-3-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 146 Filed 08/09/17 Page 4 of 5 1 Respectfully submitted this 9th day of August, 2017. 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 4 By s/Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/J. Steven Sparks 5 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 6 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 7 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 8 fbalint@bffb.com bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 9 McNEW P.A. 10 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 100 11 Boca Raton, FL 33431 12 (561)299-0257 mcnew@mcnew.net 13 14 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 15 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 16 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 17 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 18 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 19 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com 20 Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 21 22 Attorneys for Defendant 23 24 25 26 27 28-4-Case 2:15-cv-02137-DGC Document 146 Filed 08/09/17 Page 5 of 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1 I hereby certify that on August 9, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 2 document to the Clerk’s Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 3 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 4 5 By: _Karen Vanderbilt 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-5-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) re Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Extend Stay by Janet Cheatham.

1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT AND JOINT MOTION 19 TO EXTEND STAY ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] The Parties 21 on February 6, 2017 filed the requested Joint Report. [Doc. 138] Thirty days later, the 22 Parties filed a status report in which they updated the Court on their progress toward a final 23 settlement and requested an additional stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 139] The Court 24 granted that request, extending its stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days from March 20, 25 2017 (that is, until June 18, 2017) and ordering the continuation of 30-day status reports. 26 [Doc. 140] 27 On June 8, 2017, the Parties in their third status report requested a continued stay 28 of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 143] The Court on June 15, 2017 granted the Parties’ request,-2-1 extending the stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days (that is, until September 13, 2017), 2 and ordered the Parties to submit a status report on or before July 10, 2017, in addition to 3 continued status reports every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 144] 4 On March 23, 2017, Plaintiffs filed an unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval 5 of Class Action Settlement in the Edenborough case, the Honorable Jon S. Tigar presiding. 6 The motion presented to Judge Tigar the settlement agreement reached by the parties to the 7 Actions (including the Parties to the Arizona Action) and asked the Court for approval of 8 that agreement, for certification of the proposed settlement class, for appointment of the 9 settlement class representatives, for appointment of settlement class counsel, and for 10 approval of the manner and form of notice to the members of the settlement class. As an 11 exhibit to the Motion for Preliminary Approval, Plaintiffs filed a proposed settlement 12 timeline leading to a final approval hearing on August 17, 2017. 13 As the Parties reported in their August 9, 2017 Joint Status Report Regarding Notice 14 of Settlement [Doc. 146], Judge Tigar held a Case Management Conference on July 20, 15 2017, at which the Court and the Parties addressed a number of issues related to preliminary 16 approval of the proposed Class Settlement and, on July 24, 2017, Plaintiffs filed a 17 18 supplemental declaration in support of preliminary approval of the proposed Class 19 Settlement and a revised proposed timetable leading to a final approval hearing 107 days 20 from the date of entry of a preliminary approval order. 21 As of the date of this joint filing, the Parties have no new information to report; 22 Plaintiffs’ Motion for Preliminary Approval remains under advisement. 23 To allow continued supervision of the class settlement approval process by the 24 Edenborough Court, the Parties respectfully request that this Arizona Action be stayed an 25 additional ninety days. As directed in the Court’s March 20, 2017 order [Doc. 140], the 26 Parties will file the next status report with this Court on the first weekday after thirty days 27 from the date of this filing has passed (that is, on October 9, 2017), and every thirty days 28 thereafter.-3-1 Respectfully submitted this 7th day of September, 2017. 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 4 By s/Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/J. Steven Sparks 5 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 6 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 7 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 8 fbalint@bffb.com bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 9 McNEW P.A. 10 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 100 11 Boca Raton, FL 33431 12 (561)299-0257 mcnew@mcnew.net 13 14 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 15 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 16 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 17 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 18 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 19 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com 20 Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 21 22 Attorneys for Defendant 23 24 25 26 27 28-4-CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1 I hereby certify that on September 7, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 2 document to the Clerk’s Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 3 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 4 By/s Karen Vanderbilt 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-5-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement by ADT LLC.

1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6 • Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9 • Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11 • Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13 • Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] The Parties 21 on February 6, 2017 filed the requested Joint Report. [Doc. 138] Thirty days later, the 22 Parties filed a status report in which they updated the Court on their progress toward a final 23 settlement and requested an additional stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 139] The Court 24 granted that request, extending its stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days from March 20, 25 2017 (that is, until June 18, 2017) and ordering the continuation of 30-day status reports. 26 [Doc. 140] 27 On June 8, 2017, the Parties in their third status report requested a continued stay 28 of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 143] The Court on June 15, 2017 granted the Parties’ request,-2-1 extending the stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days (that is, until September 13, 2017), 2 and ordered the Parties to submit a status report on or before July 10, 2017, in addition to 3 continued status reports every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 144] 4 On September 7, 2017, the Parties in their sixth status report requested a continued 5 stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 147] The Court on September 11, 2017 granted the 6 Parties’ request, extending the stay of the Arizona Action by 88 days (that is, until 7 December 8, 2017), and ordered the Parties to continue filing status reports every 30 days. 8 [Doc. 148] 9 On March 23, 2017, Plaintiffs filed an unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval 10 of Class Action Settlement in the Edenborough case, the Honorable Jon S. Tigar presiding. 11 The motion presented to Judge Tigar the settlement agreement reached by the parties to the 12 Actions (including the Parties to the Arizona Action) and asked the Court for approval of 13 that agreement, for certification of the proposed settlement class, for appointment of the 14 settlement class representatives, for appointment of settlement class counsel, and for 15 approval of the manner and form of notice to the members of the settlement class. As an 16 exhibit to the Motion for Preliminary Approval, Plaintiffs filed a proposed settlement 17 18 timeline leading to a final approval hearing on August 17, 2017. 19 On July 20, 2017, Judge Tigar held a Case Management Conference, at which the 20 Court and the Parties addressed a number of issues related to preliminary approval of the 21 proposed Class Settlement. On July 24, 2017, Plaintiffs filed a supplemental declaration 22 in support of preliminary approval of the proposed Class Settlement, and a revised 23 proposed timetable leading to final approval hearing 107 days from the date of entry of a 24 preliminary approval order. Plaintiffs’ Motion for Preliminary Approval remains under 25 advisement. 26 The next status report to this Court is due November 8, 2017. 27 28-3-1 Respectfully submitted this 9th day of October, 2017. 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 4 By s/Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/J. Steven Sparks 5 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 6 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 7 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 8 fbalint@bffb.com bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 9 McNEW P.A. 10 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 100 11 Boca Raton, FL 33431 12 (561)299-0257 mcnew@mcnew.net 13 14 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 15 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 16 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 17 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 18 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 19 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com 20 Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 21 22 Attorneys for Defendant 23 24 25 26 27 28-4-CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1 I hereby certify that on October 9, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 2 document to the Clerk’s Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 3 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 4 5 By: Zina Seyferth 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-5-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.

1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] The Parties 21 on February 6, 2017 filed the requested Joint Report. [Doc. 138] Thirty days later, the 22 Parties filed a status report in which they updated the Court on their progress toward a final 23 settlement and requested an additional stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 139] The Court 24 granted that request, extending its stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days from March 20, 25 2017 (that is, until June 18, 2017) and ordering the continuation of 30-day status reports. 26 [Doc. 140] 27 On June 8, 2017, the Parties in their third status report requested a continued stay 28 of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 143] The Court on June 15, 2017 granted the Parties’ request,-2-1 extending the stay of the Arizona Action by 90 days (that is, until September 13, 2017), 2 and ordered the Parties to submit a status report on or before July 10, 2017, in addition to 3 continued status reports every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 144] 4 On September 7, 2017, the Parties in their sixth status report requested a continued 5 stay of the Arizona Action. [Doc. 147] The Court on September 11, 2017 granted the 6 Parties’ request, extending the stay of the Arizona Action by 88 days (that is, until 7 December 8, 2017), and ordered the Parties to continue filing status reports every 30 days. 8 [Doc. 148] 9 On March 23, 2017, Plaintiffs filed an unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval 10 of Class Action Settlement in the Edenborough case, the Honorable Jon S. Tigar presiding. 11 The motion presented to Judge Tigar the settlement agreement reached by the parties to the 12 Actions (including the Parties to the Arizona Action) and asked the Court for approval of 13 that agreement, for certification of the proposed settlement class, for appointment of the 14 settlement class representatives, for appointment of settlement class counsel, and for 15 approval of the manner and form of notice to the members of the settlement class. 16 On October 16, 2017, Judge Tigar issued his "Order Granting Motion for 17 18 Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, etc." [Edenbourough ECF 114 ("the 19 Preliminary Approval Order")]. In the Preliminary Approval Order, Judge Tigar as 20 requested (a) preliminarily approved the settlement, (b) preliminarily certified the proposed 21 Settlement Class and appointed Class representatives and Class Counsel, (c) approved the 22 form of Class Notice, and (d) established a notice and final approval schedule culminating 23 in a Final Approval Hearing at 2:00 pm on February 1, 2018. 24 Accordingly, the Parties in this action propose that the next status report be 25 submitted one week after the final approval hearing, on February 8, 2018. 26 27 28-3-1 Respectfully submitted this 8th day of November, 2017. 2 3 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 4 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 5 By s/Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/J. Steven Sparks 6 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 7 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 8 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 9 fbalint@bffb.com bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 10 McNEW P.A. 11 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 100 12 Boca Raton, FL 33431 13 (561)299-0257 mcnew@mcnew.net 14 15 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 16 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 17 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 18 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 19 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 20 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com 21 Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 22 23 Attorneys for Defendant 24 25 26 27 28-4-CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1 I hereby certify that on November 8, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 2 document to the Clerk’s Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 3 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 4 5 By:/s/Karen Vanderbilt 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28-5-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.

1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the Arizona 17 18 Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report be filed 19 addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint 20 status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] 21 On October 16, 2017, Judge Tigar issued his "Order Granting Motion for 22 Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, etc." [Edenbourough ECF 114 ("the 23 Preliminary Approval Order")]. In the Preliminary Approval Order, Judge Tigar as 24 requested (a) preliminarily approved the settlement, (b) preliminarily certified the proposed 25 Settlement Class and appointed Class representatives and Class Counsel, (c) approved the 26 form of Class Notice, and (d) established a notice and final approval schedule culminating 27 in a Final Approval Hearing at 2:00 pm on February 1, 2018. 28 -2- 1 The Final Hearing was conducted on February 1, 2018, and Judge Tigar has taken 2 the matter under advisement. On February 5, 2018, Judge Tigar requested supplemental 3 briefing in 21 days on the impact of In re Hyundai & Kia Fuel Econ. Litig., No. 15-56014, 4 2018 WL 505343, at *3 (9th Cir. Jan. 23, 2018). 5 Accordingly, the Parties in this action propose that the next status report be 6 submitted in approximately 30 days, on Friday, March 9, 2018. 7 Respectfully submitted this 7th day of February, 2018. 8 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 9 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 10 By s/ Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/ J. Steven Sparks 11 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 12 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 13 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 14 fbalint@bffb.com 15 bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) McNEW P.A. 16 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., 17 Suite 100 Boca Raton, FL 33431 18 (561)299-0257 19 mcnew@mcnew.net 20 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) 21 Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 22 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 23 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 24 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 25 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com 26 Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 27 28 Attorneys for Defendant -3- 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 2 I hereby certify that on February 7, 2018, I electronically transmitted the attached 3 document to the Clerk's Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 4 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 5 6 By: Karen Vanderbilt 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 -4-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement by ADT LLC.

1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6 • Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9 • Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11 • Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13 • Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Edenborough Court is overseeing the certification and 17 18 approval process for that settlement. This Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the 19 Arizona Action for 45 days (that is, until March 16, 2017), while directing that a joint report 20 be filed addressing several matters not explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that 21 a joint status report be filed every 30 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] 22 The Edenborough Court held a Fairness Hearing regarding the settlement on 23 February 1, 2018, and Judge Tigar has taken the matter under advisement. On February 5, 24 2018, Judge Tigar requested supplemental briefing in 21 days on the impact of In re 25 Hyundai & Kia Fuel Econ. Litig., No. 15-56014, 2018 WL 505343, at *3 (9th Cir. Jan. 23, 26 2018). On February 26, 2018, both Plaintiffs and ADT filed submissions regarding 27 Hyundai to the Edenborough Court for Judge Tigar's consideration. 28 -2- 1 Accordingly, the Parties in this action propose that the next status report be 2 submitted in 31 days, on Monday, April 9, 2018. 3 Respectfully submitted this 9th day of March, 2018. 4 5 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 6 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 7 By s/ Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/ J. Steven Sparks 8 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 10 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 fbalint@bffb.com 12 bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) McNEW P.A. 13 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., Suite 100 14 Boca Raton, FL 33431 15 (561)299-0257 mcnew@mcnew.net 16 17 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 18 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 19 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 20 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 21 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 22 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com 23 Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 24 25 Attorneys for Defendant 26 27 28 -3- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1 I hereby certify that on March 9, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 2 document to the Clerk's Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 3 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 4 5 By: /s Zina Seyferth 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 -4-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.

1 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) 2 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 3 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) 8 SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 9 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 (602) 532-5769 10 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 11 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 12 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 13 14 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 15 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT 18 REGARDING NOTICE OF v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Edenborough Court is overseeing the certification and 17 18 approval process for that settlement. This Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the 19 Arizona Action, while directing that a joint report be filed addressing several matters not 20 explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint status report be filed every 30 21 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] 22 The Edenborough Court held a Fairness Hearing regarding the settlement on 23 February 1, 2018, and Judge Tigar took the matter under advisement. On February 5, 2018, 24 Judge Tigar requested supplemental briefing on the impact of In re Hyundai & Kia Fuel 25 Econ. Litig., No. 15-56014, 2018 WL 505343, at *3 (9th Cir. Jan. 23, 2018). On February 26 26, 2018, both Plaintiffs and ADT filed submissions regarding Hyundai to the 27 Edenborough Court for Judge Tigar's consideration. And on March 29, 2018, Judge Tigar 28 issued an order (i) overruling the sole objection to the proposed class settlement, but (ii) -2- 1 staying the matter pending resolution of the petition for en banc review (and any 2 subsequent Ninth Circuit proceedings) in Hyundai. 3 Given the stay of the Edenborough Action, the Parties in this action propose that the 4 next status report be submitted within five (5) days from the date the Edenborough Court 5 issues an order lifting the stay or other ruling on the motion for final approval. 6 7 Respectfully submitted this 9th day of April, 2018. 8 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 9 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 10 By s/ Francis J. Balint, Jr. By s/ J. Steven Sparks 11 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) J. Steven Sparks (015561) William F. King (023941) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 12 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 13 Phoenix, AZ 85016 (602) 532-5769 (602) 274-1100 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 14 fbalint@bffb.com 15 bking@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) McNEW P.A. 16 Attorneys for Plaintiff 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., 17 Suite 100 Boca Raton, FL 33431 18 (561)299-0257 19 mcnew@mcnew.net 20 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) 21 Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) 22 BARTLIT BECK HERMAN PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 23 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 24 Chicago, IL 60654 (312) 494-4400 25 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com 26 Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com 27 28 Attorneys for Defendant -3- 1 Certificate of Service 2 I hereby certify that on April 9, 2017, I electronically transmitted the attached 3 document to the Clerk's Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby transmitting 4 a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 5 6 By: /s/ Karen Vanderbilt 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 -4-

STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.

Francis J. Balint, Jr. (Az. Bar No. 007669) 1 William F. King (Az. Bar No. 023941) BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, 2 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 2325 E. Camelback Rd., Suite 300 3 Phoenix, AZ 85016 4 (602) 274-1100 fbalint@bffb.com 5 bking@bffb.com 6 Attorneys for Plaintiff 7 J. Steven Sparks (Az. Bar No. 015561) SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 8 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 9 (602) 532-5769 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com 10 [Additional Counsel on Signature Page] 11 Attorneys for Defendant ADT LLC 12 13 UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT 14 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 15 16 JANET CHEATHAM, Case No.: 2:15-CV-02137-DGC 17 Plaintiff, JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING NOTICE OF 18 v. SETTLEMENT 19 ADT CORPORATION, and ADT LLC, 20 Defendants. 21 In response to the Court's Order [Doc. 157], the Parties apologize to the Court for 22 the lapse in submitting monthly status reports. In the last Joint Status Report [Doc. 156] 23 the Parties had requested an extension on filing the next status report until 5 days after the 24 lifting or other modification of Judge Tigar's stay order in the Edenborough action. The 25 Parties overlooked that this Court had not affirmatively granted that request, and will 26 immediately resume submission of monthly status reports in accordance with the Court's 27 earlier Order [Doc. 134]. 28 1 On January 23, 2017, the parties to the above-captioned action (the "Arizona 2 Action") notified the Court pursuant to LRCiv 40.2(d) [Doc. 133 (the "Joint Notice of 3 Settlement")] that they had reached an agreement to settle through certification of a 4 nationwide settlement class the claims alleged in the Arizona Action and those alleged in 5 the following related actions: 6  Dale Baker and Stephanie Dillard v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC 7 d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 15-cv-02038-CSB-EIL (USDC CD 8 Illinois); 9  Michael Edenborough v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Inc., Case 10 No. 16-cv-02233-JST (USDC ND California); 11  Santiago L. Hernandez v. ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security Services, Case No. 12 50-2016-CA-002944XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. Florida); and 13  Patricia Wilson v. The ADT Corporation and ADT, LLC d/b/a ADT Security 14 Services, Case No. 50-2016-CA-004410XXXXMB (Cir. Ct. 15th Jud. Cir. 15 Florida) 16 (collectively, the "Actions"). The Edenborough Court is overseeing the certification and 17 18 approval process for that settlement. This Court on January 30, 2017 agreed to stay the 19 Arizona Action, while directing that a joint report be filed addressing several matters not 20 explained in the Joint Notice of Settlement, and that a joint status report be filed every 30 21 days thereafter. [Doc. 134 (the "Stay Order")] 22 The Edenborough Court held a Fairness Hearing regarding the settlement on 23 February 1, 2018, and Judge Tigar took the matter under advisement. On February 5, 2018, 24 Judge Tigar requested supplemental briefing on the impact of In re Hyundai & Kia Fuel 25 Econ. Litig., No. 15-56014, 2018 WL 505343, at *3 (9th Cir. Jan. 23, 2018). On February 26 26, 2018, both Plaintiffs and ADT filed submissions regarding Hyundai to the 27 Edenborough Court for Judge Tigar's consideration. 28 -2- 1 On March 29, 2018, Judge Tigar issued an order (i) overruling the sole objection to 2 the proposed class settlement, but (ii) staying the matter pending resolution of the petition 3 for en banc review (and any subsequent Ninth Circuit proceedings) in Hyundai. 4 On July 27, 2018, the Ninth Circuit accepted the petition for en banc review. In re 5 Hyundai And Kia Fuel Econ. Litig., 897 F.3d 1003, 1007 (9th Cir. 2018). The rehearing en 6 banc is currently scheduled for September 27, 2018. 7 Until the Edenborough Court reaches a final determination on the settlement, the 8 parties will continue to submit monthly status reports. 9 Respectfully submitted this 14th day of September, 2018. 10 BONNETT, FAIRBOURN, SANDERS & PARKS, P.C. 11 FRIEDMAN & BALINT, P.C. 12 By s/ J. Steven Sparks By s/ Francis J. Balint, Jr. J. Steven Sparks (015561) 13 Francis J. Balint, Jr. (007669) 3030 North Third Street, Suite 1300 14 William F. King (023941) Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099 2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300 (602) 532-5769 15 Phoenix, AZ 85016 Steve.Sparks@SandersParks.com (602) 274-1100 16 fbalint@bffb.com C. Sanders McNew (Pro Hac Vice) 17 bking@bffb.com McNEW P.A. 2385 NW Executive Center Dr., 18 Attorneys for Plaintiff Suite 100 19 Boca Raton, FL 33431 (561)299-0257 20 mcnew@mcnew.net 21 Mark L. Levine (Pro Hac Vice) 22 Mark S. Ouweleen (Pro Hac Vice) 23 Daniel R. McElroy (Pro Hac Vice) BARTLIT BECK HERMAN 24 PALENCHAR & SCOTT LLP 25 54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300 Chicago, IL 60654 26 (312) 494-4400 27 Mark.Levine@bartlit-beck.com Mark.Ouweleen@bartlit-beck.com 28 Daniel.McElroy@bartlit-beck.com Attorneys for Defendant -3- 1 Certificate of Service 2 I hereby certify that on September 14th, 2018, I electronically transmitted the 3 attached document to the Clerk's Office using the CM/ECF System for filing thereby 4 transmitting a Notice of Electronic Filing to all CM/ECF registrants. 5 6 By: /s/ Karen Vanderbilt 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 -4-

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 511 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/23/2015
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2015-008263. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12261844 filed by ADT LLC, ADT Corporation (submitted by J. Sparks).
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Civil Cover Sheet
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115056453" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115056453','949964','11','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)
4 Attachments
2
10/23/2015
*Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT Corporation, ADT LLC (submitted by J. Sparks). (KGM) *Modified to add filer on 10/26/2015
10/23/2015
***State Court record received on 10/23/15***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Janet Cheatham: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Arbitration upon ADT Corporation and ADT LLC on 9/15/15 (ADT LLC) & 9/24/15 (ADT Corporation).***Docketed in U.S. District Court on 10/23/15 for case management purposes.*** (KGM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/23/2015
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12261844. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-02137-PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115056506" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115056506','949964','17','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> MAG 25 Instructions)
1 Attachment
4
11/09/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney C Sanders McNew on behalf of ADT Corporation and ADT LLC.
11/10/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX164989 as to C Sanders McNew. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/10/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
6
11/06/2015
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
7
11/12/2015
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
8
11/12/2015
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David K. Duncan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-15-2137-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
9
11/12/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ADT Corporation.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
10
11/12/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ADT LLC.
11
11/16/2015
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/16/2015.
12
11/16/2015
ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/16/2015.
13
11/20/2015
STIPULATION re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Janet Cheatham.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
14
11/20/2015
ORDER pursuant to 13 Stipulation: re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ADT Corporation, 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ADT LLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/2015.
15
11/23/2015
NOTICE re: Certification by ADT Corporation, ADT LLC re: 11 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions.
16
11/24/2015
NOTICE re: Service of Court's November 16, 2015 Order (Dkt. #11) by Janet Cheatham.
17
12/17/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ADT LLC filed by Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
1 Attachment
18
12/17/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ADT Corporation filed by Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit A - King Declaration
2
Exhibit 1 to King Declaration
3
Exhibit 2 to King Declaration
4
Exhibit 3 to King Declaration
5
Exhibit 4 to King Declaration
6
Exhibit 5 to King Declaration
7
Exhibit B - Cheatham Declaration
8
Exhibit 1 to Cheatham Declaration
9
Exhibit 2 to Cheatham Declaration
9 Attachments
19
12/23/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ADT Corporation.
20
12/24/2015
Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 19 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant ADT Corporation.
21
12/30/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Janet Cheatham.
22
01/05/2016
SUPPLEMENT to Declaration of William F. King in Opposition to the ADT Corporation's Motion to Dismiss re: 18 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
23
01/06/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 1/6/2016. Discussion held. Deadlines discussed. Court will enter a case management order. APPEARANCES: Francis Balint Jr. and William King for Plaintiff. Sanders McNew and Steven Sparks for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:50 PM to 5:20 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
24
01/11/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ADT LLC.
25
01/12/2016
** AMENDED BY DOC. 55*CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2016. Class Certification Motion due by 10/14/2016. Response due 11/4/2016. Reply due 11/18/2016 A Hearing is set for 12/2/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/11/2016. (TCA) Modified on 4/29/2016
26
01/18/2016
SUPPLEMENT in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant ADT Corporation.
27
02/01/2016
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Plaintiff Janet Cheatham's Initial Disclosure Statement by Janet Cheatham. *Modified to correct event type on 2/2/2016
28
02/02/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT Corporation, ADT LLC.
29
02/03/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janet Cheatham.
30
02/11/2016
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ADT LLC's motion to strike 10 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2016.
31
03/01/2016
ANSWER to Complaint by ADT LLC.
32
03/02/2016
STIPULATION re: Discovery by Janet Cheatham.
1
Text of Proposed Order
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
33
03/10/2016
MOTION to Strike Purported Affirmative Defenses by Janet Cheatham.
34
03/14/2016
ORDER pursuant to 32 Stipulation re ESI granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/14/2016.
35
03/14/2016
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/14/2016.
36
03/14/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
37
03/25/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
38
03/28/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re: 33 MOTION to Strike Purported Affirmative Defenses filed by ADT LLC.
39
03/29/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 33 MOTION to Strike Purported Affirmative Defenses filed by Janet Cheatham.
40
03/31/2016
MOTION to Amend/Correct 31 Answer to Complaint by ADT LLC.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
41
04/01/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
42
04/04/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Janet Cheatham for proceedings held on 01/06/2016, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
43
04/06/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janet Cheatham.
44
04/06/2016
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Janet Cheatham. Amendment to 43 Notice of Service of Discovery.
45
04/11/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
46
04/15/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mark L Levine on behalf of ADT LLC.
04/15/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX170794 as to Mark L Levine. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
04/15/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Rebecca Weinstein Bacon on behalf of ADT LLC.
04/15/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX170795 as to Rebecca Weinstein Bacon. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
04/15/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel R McElroy on behalf of ADT LLC.
04/15/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX170796 as to Daniel R McElroy. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
04/15/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
50
04/18/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct 31 Answer to Complaint filed by Janet Cheatham.
51
04/11/2016
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings held on 01/06/2016, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2016.
52
04/27/2016
MINUTE ORDER: A Telephone Discovery Conference set for 4/29/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Parties to call the Court on one conference line. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
53
04/28/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct 31 Answer to Complaint (Reply In Support of Its Motion for Leave to Serve An Amended Answer) filed by ADT LLC.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
54
04/29/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 4/29/2016. Plaintiff still awaiting production of documents in 2 separate categories from defendants. Plaintiff request an extension of all case management deadlines. Discussion held. Defendants shall produce the smaller set of documents responsive to 2/3/16 request by 5/13/2016. Completion of production including the ESI documents shall be 5/27/2016. Court will grant request to extend deadlines and enter an amended case management order. Parties are advised that the Court will not extend deadlines further absent extraordinary circumstances. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Francis Balint Jr. for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Rebecca Bacon and Daniel McElroy for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 11:02 AM to 11:28 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
55
04/29/2016
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 9/2/2016. Class certification motion due by 11/23/2016. Response due 12/14/2016. Reply due 12/30/2016. Hearing on motion for class certification is set for 1/6/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/2016.
56
05/02/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
57
05/03/2016
ORDER finding as moot 33 Motion to Strike; granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/3/2016.
58
05/10/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
59
05/11/2016
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Notice of Removal by ADT LLC.
60
05/16/2016
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery re Responses to Written Discovery by Janet Cheatham. *Modified to correct event type on 5/16/2016
61
05/18/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janet Cheatham.
62
05/26/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
63
06/02/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ADT Corporation, ADT LLC for proceedings held on 4-29-16, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
64
06/02/2016
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE proceedings held on 04/29/2016, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2016.
65
06/09/2016
*MOTION to Amend/Correct 55 Amended Case Management Order by ADT LLC.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025115982664" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025115982664','949964','192','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to correct event type on 6/10/2016
1 Attachment
66
06/17/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janet Cheatham.
67
06/20/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
68
06/29/2016
*Supplement to 65 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct by ADT LLC. *Modified to correct event type on 6/30/2016
69
07/06/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janet Cheatham.
70
07/06/2016
ORDER granting 65 Motion to Amend/Correct: Fact discovery due 11/20/16; class cert. motion due 12/14/16; class cert. hearing 2/17/17 at 3:00 PM before The Honorable David G. Campbell, 401 W Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/6/2016.
71
07/20/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
72
07/26/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT LLC identifying Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC for ADT LLC.
73
08/12/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janet Cheatham.
74
08/12/2016
NOTICE re: Intent to Issue Subpoenas by Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
75
08/30/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of ADT LLC, filed by Janet Cheatham.
76
09/14/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
77
09/16/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mark S Ouweleen on behalf of ADT LLC.
09/19/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX176503 as to Mark S Ouweleen. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
09/19/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 77 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
79
10/06/2016
OBJECTION re: 75 Notice of Deposition by Defendant ADT LLC.
80
10/06/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Janet Cheatham.
81
10/07/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Gary Friar, filed by ADT LLC.
82
10/07/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Ryan Petty, filed by ADT LLC.
83
10/18/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Matthew W Brewer on behalf of ADT LLC.
10/18/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177620 as to Matthew W Brewer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
10/18/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 83 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
85
10/19/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Janet Cheatham, filed by ADT LLC.
86
10/19/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Michael Edenborough, filed by ADT LLC.
87
10/21/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Beaver, filed by ADT LLC.
88
11/01/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Steve Shapiro, filed by Janet Cheatham.
89
11/01/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of ADT, LLC 30(b)(6), filed by Janet Cheatham.
90
11/02/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Cross-Notice Steve Shapiro, filed by ADT LLC.
91
11/02/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Shirley McGee, filed by ADT LLC.
92
11/02/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Ranjinder Sidhu, filed by ADT LLC.
93
11/03/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Taber Manning, filed by Janet Cheatham.
94
11/08/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
95
11/08/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Tana Barton Haas, filed by ADT LLC.
96
11/08/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Taber Manning, filed by ADT LLC.
97
11/14/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Cross-Notice of Jim Black, filed by ADT LLC.
98
11/14/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Cross-Notice of Jason Shockley, filed by ADT LLC.
99
11/14/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Cross-Notice of Mike Shultz, filed by ADT LLC.
100
11/14/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by ADT LLC.
101
11/23/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Arthur Orduna, filed by Janet Cheatham.
102
12/02/2016
NOTICE of Deposition of Cheryl McCarthy, filed by ADT LLC.
103
12/14/2016
MOTION to Certify Class Redacted by Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Text of Proposed Order
3 Attachments
104
12/14/2016
STATEMENT of Common Evidence in Support of Motion for Class Certification re: 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted by Plaintiff Janet Cheatham.
105
12/14/2016
DECLARATION of Francis J. Balint re: 104 Statement, 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted by Plaintiff Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit 1-15
2
Exhibit 16-20
3
Exhibit 21-28
4
Exhibit 29-37
5
Exhibit 38-45
6
Exhibit 46-51
6 Attachments
106
12/14/2016
DECLARATION of Dwight J. Duncan, MS, CFA re: 104 Statement, 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted by Plaintiff Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
107
12/14/2016
DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Zwirn re: 104 Statement, 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted by Plaintiff Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit 1-2
1 Attachment
108
12/14/2016
DECLARATION of Professor Thomas J. Maronick, DBA/JD re: 104 Statement, 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted by Plaintiff Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit 1-2
1 Attachment
109
12/14/2016
NOTICE re: Lodging Documents Under Seal by Janet Cheatham.
110
12/14/2016
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Janet Cheatham. Modified on 1/31/2017
111
12/14/2016
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Plaintiff's Statement of Evidence in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Janet Cheatham. Modified on 1/31/2017
112
12/14/2016
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Francis J. Balint, Jr. in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Janet Cheatham. Modified on 1/31/2017
113
12/14/2016
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Francis J. Balint, Jr. in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Janet Cheatham. Modified on 1/31/2017
114
12/14/2016
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Francis J. Balint, Jr. in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Janet Cheatham. Modified on 1/31/2017
115
12/14/2016
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 21 to the Declaration of Francis J. Balint, Jr. in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Janet Cheatham. Modified on 1/31/2017
116
12/14/2016
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 23 to the Declaration of Francis J. Balint, Jr. in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Janet Cheatham. Modified on 1/31/2017
117
12/22/2016
MOTION to Strike 104 Statement of Common Evidence In Support of Motion for Class Certification by ADT LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
118
12/28/2016
*MOTION to Expedite Review of 117 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Statement of Common Evidence In Support of Motion for Class Certification by ADT LLC.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116824145" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116824145','949964','329','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to add link on 12/28/2016
1 Attachment
119
12/28/2016
Notice of Confidential Doc. Designation Withdrawal pursuant to LRCiv.5.6.d.
120
12/28/2016
MOTION to Seal Document 116 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 112 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 114 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 113 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by ADT LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Text of Proposed Order
4 Attachments
121
01/03/2017
RESPONSE to Motion re: 117 MOTION to Strike 104 Statement of Common Evidence In Support of Motion for Class Certification, 118 MOTION to Expedite Review of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Statement of Common Evidence In Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Janet Cheatham.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
122
01/03/2017
NOTICE re: Supplemental Citation of Authority in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Janet Cheatham re: 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
123
01/05/2017
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion to Strike. The Court denies Defendants' motion to strike but grants Defendants' motion to file a response Plaintiff's motion for class certification [103, 104] up to 36-pages in length; granting 118 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/5/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
124
01/10/2017
RESPONSE to Motion re: 120 MOTION to Seal Document 116 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 112 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 114 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, 113 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Janet Cheatham.
125
01/10/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted filed by ADT LLC.
126
01/10/2017
*DECLARATION of Daniel McElroy in support of 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted Declaration of McElroy In Support filed by ADT LLC.
1
Exhibit Exs 1 - 21
2
Exhibit Exs 22 - 25
3
Exhibit Exs 26 - 28
4
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116869381" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116869381','949964','359','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit Exs 29 - 32) *Modified to correct event type on 1/11/2017
4 Attachments
127
01/10/2017
*DECLARATION of Dr. Debra J Aron in support of 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted Declaration of Debra J. Aron filed by ADT LLC. *Modified to correct event type on 1/11/2017
128
01/10/2017
*DECLARATION of Rene Befurt in support of 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted filed by ADT LLC. *Modified to correct event type on 1/11/2017
129
01/10/2017
*Declaration of Dr. Philip Levis in support of 103 MOTION to Certify Class Redacted Declaration filed by ADT LLC. *Modified to correct event type on 1/11/2017
130
01/10/2017
*DECLARATION of Catherine Tucker in support of 103 MOTION to Certify Class filed by ADT LLC. *Modified on 1/11/2017
131
01/10/2017
MOTION to Seal Document 125 Response in Opposition to Motion [Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification] by ADT LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
132
01/10/2017
*SEALED LODGED Proposed Exs 18 & 21 re: 131 MOTION to Seal Document 125 Response in Opposition to Motion [Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification]. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by ADT LLC.
1
Exhibit 18
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116869552" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116869552','949964','382','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit 21) Modified on 1/31/2017
2 Attachments
133
01/23/2017
*Joint NOTICE of Settlement and Joint MOTION to Stay and Joint Request for Stay by Janet Cheatham. *Modified on 1/24/2017 to change to a pending Motion to Stay
134
01/30/2017
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion to Stay. The parties have notified the Court of an agreement to settle this and other cases on a nationwide basis, but do not explain where certification of a nationwide class and settlement approval will be sought, when motions for certification and settlement approval will be filed, or how long they expect the settlement process to take. The Court will not grant an open-ended motion to stay, but instead will stay this case for 45 days. Within five days of this order, the parties should file a joint report responding to the issues identified above. A status report should be filed 30 days thereafter. In light of this settlement, the Court will deny the pending motion to certify as moot, subject to re-filing if the settlement is not completed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1-30-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
135
01/30/2017
ORDER finding as moot 103 Motion to Certify Class. See Doc. 134. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1-30-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
136
01/30/2017
ORDER finding as moot 120 Motion to Seal Document. See Doc. 134. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1-30-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
137
01/30/2017
ORDER finding as moot 131 Motion to Seal Document. See Doc. 134. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1-30-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
138
02/06/2017
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Janet Cheatham.
139
03/08/2017
STATUS REPORT re Notice of Settlement and Stay Order Doc 134 by Janet Cheatham. *Modified linkage on 3/9/2017
140
03/20/2017
ORDER. The Court will extend the stay of this case for 90 days from today's date, with a status report to be filed every 30 days as previously noted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-20-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
141
04/06/2017
STATUS REPORT re Notice of Settlement and Doc. 134 by Janet Cheatham.
142
05/08/2017
STATUS REPORT Re Stay Order (Doc. No. 134) by Janet Cheatham.
143
06/08/2017
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Extend Stay by ADT LLC.
144
06/15/2017
ORDER re: 143 JOINT MOTION to Extend Stay filed by ADT LLC. Stay is extended an additional 90 days. Next status Report due by 7/10/2017, then every 30 days. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/15/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
145
07/10/2017
STATUS REPORT (Joint) re Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.
146
08/09/2017
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.
147
09/07/2017
STATUS REPORT (Joint) re Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Extend Stay by Janet Cheatham.
148
09/11/2017
ORDER re: 147 Report - Status filed by Janet Cheatham Stay Deadline set for 12/8/2017. The parties shall file a status report every 30 days re the status of settlement of this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
149
10/09/2017
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement by ADT LLC.
150
11/08/2017
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.
151
11/09/2017
ORDER re: 150 Report - Status filed by Janet Cheatham Joint status report due by 2/8/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/9/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
152
02/07/2018
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.
153
02/15/2018
ORDER re: 152 Report - Status filed by Janet Cheatham. Status Report due by 3/9/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/15/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
154
03/09/2018
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Re Notice of Settlement by ADT LLC.
155
03/09/2018
ORDER re: 154 Report - Status filed by ADT LLC. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 4/9/2018 regarding the settlement status of this litigation. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/9/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
156
04/09/2018
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.
09/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
09/13/2018
ORDER re: 156 Report - Status filed by Janet Cheatham, 134 Order on Motion to Stay. The parties have not filed a status report since 4/9/2018. 156. The parties shall jointly file a status report regarding the settlement in this matter on or before 9/28/2018 and shall file a status report every 30 days thereafter until further ordered by the Court. Status Report due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/13/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
158
09/14/2018
STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Notice of Settlement by Janet Cheatham.
09/17/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
159
09/17/2018
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 158 Report - Status filed by Janet Cheatham. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.