Cherepski v. Apple inc
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2013-cv-00433 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 592 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/26/2013
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. filed by Donald Cherepski. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt# LIT041054. Summons issued and returned to Counsel for service.
1
https://ecf.ared.uscourts.gov/doc1/02713029365" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02713029365','94116','9','','2','0','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet).
1 Attachment
2
07/30/2013
ORDER OF TRANSFER directing the Clerk of the Court to randomly reassign this case. Signed by Donna Jackson on 7/30/2013 at the Direction of the Court.
3
07/30/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 2 Order of Recusal, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge J. Leon Holmes.
4
07/30/2013
ORDER OF RECUSAL, the Clerk is directed to assign this action to another judge. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/30/13.
5
07/30/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to 4 Order of Recusal, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller.
6
07/31/2013
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, filed by Donald Cherepski. Apple Inc served on 7/30/2013.
7
08/15/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of Apple Inc
8
08/15/2013
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Apple Inc
9
08/15/2013
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time by Apple Inc
10
08/16/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting unopposed 9 motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond re 1 complaint up to and including 9/4/13. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/16/13.
11
08/16/2013
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/23/2013. Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/6/2013. Propsoed Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/27/2014 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/16/13.
12
09/04/2013
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Apple Inc
13
09/04/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Apple Inc.
14
09/18/2013
RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Donald Cherepski.
15
09/18/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 14 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Donald Cherepski.
16
09/24/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Apple Inc.
17
10/17/2013
ORDER directing the clerk to randomly reassign this case because defendant Apple, Inc. appears on the undersigned's recusal list. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/17/2013.
18
10/17/2013
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Based on 17 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Kristine G. Baker.
19
11/06/2013
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Apple Inc, Donald Cherepski.
20
12/19/2013
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/27/2014 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker; Discovery due by 6/27/2014; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/6/2014; Status Report due by 8/28/2014. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/19/13.
21
04/22/2014
MOTION to Clarify by Donald Cherepski
22
04/23/2014
ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's motion for clarification and staying the dates in the Final Scheduling Order. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will be issued, if necessary, after the Court has ruled on the 12 pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker.
23
07/17/2014
OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/17/2014.
24
07/23/2014
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 3/23/2015 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 1/7/2015; Motions due by 1/22/2015; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 3/2/2015; Status Report due by 1/22/2015; and jury instructions are due by 03/16/2015. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 07/23/2014.
25
07/31/2014
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Apple Inc.
26
01/22/2015
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Apple Inc.
27
01/23/2015
ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to 26 stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, each party to bear his or its own costs and fees incurred in the litigation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 01/23/2015.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.