Cheryl Ann Vonada
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00316 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
06/12/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
23
06/15/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
24
06/15/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
25
06/15/2018
Certificate of Service
07/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/09/2018
Certificate of No Objection
27
07/10/2018
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
09/28/2018
Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)
10/01/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.