Chicago Bridge and Iron Company, N.V. v. Fairbanks Joint Crafts Council, AFL-CIO et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00100 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
11
06/01/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
06/04/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/08/2018
Answer to Complaint
14
06/08/2018
Answer to Complaint
15
06/11/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
16
07/09/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
17
07/12/2018
Notice of Appearance
18
07/25/2018
Scheduling Order
19
08/06/2018
Judgment on the Pleadings
20
08/27/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
21
09/11/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
22
09/21/2018
Notice (Other)
23
09/25/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/03/2018
ORDER denying 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [Motion to Dismiss]. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/3/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
26
03/29/2019
Compel
27
04/12/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
04/15/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
04/15/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
30
04/17/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
31
05/17/2019
Protective Order
05/21/2019
Order on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.