Chinh Van Nguyen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00399 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/14/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
11/14/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
3
11/14/2018
Declaration About Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec and 202)
4
11/14/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
5
11/14/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
11/14/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/15/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
11/15/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/15/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
14
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
11/29/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
18
11/29/2018
Schedule J (Form 106J)
19
11/29/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
20
11/29/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
21
11/29/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
22
11/29/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
11/29/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
12/11/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
12/18/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
12/19/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
12/19/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/31/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
12/31/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
01/10/2019
Proceeding Memo
28
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
29
01/11/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
01/11/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
01/25/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
32
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
33
01/29/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
02/05/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
02/14/2019
Reopen Chapter 13 Case (Fee) (CM20)
35
02/14/2019
Schedule I (Form 106I)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.