Chinh Van Nguyen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00119 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/17/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
04/17/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
04/17/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/17/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/17/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
04/17/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
04/18/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/17/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
04/17/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
04/18/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
7
04/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
04/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
04/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
04/24/2019
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (CM11)
11
04/24/2019
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
12
04/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
04/29/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/02/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
05/03/2019
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (BKCONV01)
05/03/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/03/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
19
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
20
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
21
05/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
05/09/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/20/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
05/23/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
23
05/24/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
05/24/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.