Chip A Haag
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00255 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
10/15/2018
Entry of Appearance
40
11/06/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
11/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/06/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
42
11/06/2018
Certificate of Service
43
11/23/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
11/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
12/12/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
45
12/12/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
46
12/13/2018
Certificate of No Objection

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.