Christensen v. Commissioner of Soc. Sec. Admin.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00181 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/06/2018
Complaint
2
08/06/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/06/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
08/06/2018
Unissued Summons
5
08/07/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
08/07/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/21/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
08/25/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
8
09/15/2018
Notice of Appearance
9
10/19/2018
Answer to Complaint
10
10/19/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
11
10/19/2018
Scheduling Order
10/19/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
13
12/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
14
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
15
12/27/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
16
12/27/2018
Declaration
17
12/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
18
01/14/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
19
01/16/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
20
05/07/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
21
05/08/2019
Judgment
22
05/22/2019
Amend/Correct
23
05/22/2019
Memorandum

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.