Christian J Harris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00211 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
4
07/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
07/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
7
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
07/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
07/10/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
07/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
12
07/17/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
13
07/18/2018
Change of Address
07/19/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
07/20/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
15
07/20/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
16
07/20/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
17
07/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
18
07/20/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
07/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
20
08/28/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
21
08/29/2018
Certificate of No Objection
22
08/30/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
08/30/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
24
08/30/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
08/30/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
09/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.