Christine Marie Stelly and Danny Joseph Stelly, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

3:2018-bk-00026 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Extend Entry of Discharge
05/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/14/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
22
06/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/18/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.