Christopher Cobb and Alisha Cobb
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82040 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
07/18/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
01/03/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/29/2019
Dismiss Case - Other
45
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/08/2019
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
03/14/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs
55
03/14/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.