Christopher Harvey and Heather Harvey
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00063 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Certificate of No Objection
doc
05/23/2018
Relief from Stay
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
06/06/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
25
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
06/14/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
06/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
28
06/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/27/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.