Christopher Hughes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81483 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
06/27/2018
Continue Hearing
62
09/16/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
70
09/27/2018
Conditionally Denying
77
10/15/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
78
10/15/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
79
10/15/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
80
10/15/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.