Christopher Lee Menter
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00387 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
11/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/06/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
11/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/07/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
11/08/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
11/13/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
14
11/13/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
15
11/13/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
16
11/13/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
17
11/14/2018
Certificate of Service
18
11/19/2018
Request for Special Notice
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/07/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/08/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
01/09/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/09/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
22
01/09/2019
Proceeding Memo
23
01/10/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
24
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
01/11/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
01/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
05/15/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.