Clark v. bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.

1:2017-cv-00158 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 21 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/13/2017
COMPLAINT against Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2051583, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jane Clark.
1
Summons
2
Disclosure Statement
3
Civil Cover Sheet
3 Attachments
2
04/14/2017
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial.
3
04/14/2017
Summons Issued as to Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
4
05/17/2017
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Michael H. Wilck on 04/17/17 by Jane Clark. Waiver of Service due by 5/17/2017.
5
05/17/2017
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Clark. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. waiver sent on 4/17/2017, answer due 6/16/2017.
6
06/13/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jane Clark.
7
06/14/2017
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. on 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/14/2017.
8
07/13/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant to Appear and Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Jane Clark.
9
07/18/2017
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 8/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/18/2017.
07/18/2017
Answer due from Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. on 8/16/2017 pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
09/08/2017
Order re: 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, (Status Conference set, via telephone conference, for 9/20/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray.) To access the telephone conference, the parties' attorneys are to use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/7/2017.
09/20/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Status Conference (telephone) held on 9/20/2017. (Digital Court Recording) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/22/2017
MOTION to Dismiss by Jane Clark.
13
09/26/2017
ORDER entered re 12 Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action be DISMISSED from the active docket of the Court, with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, unless otherwise agreed. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/25/2017.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.