Clifford G Johnsen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00292 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
11
09/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
09/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
09/17/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
13
09/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
09/25/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/26/2018
Comply (SA)
09/26/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/27/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
09/27/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
10/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
12/07/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.