Clifton Mackey Ziegler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00148 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
07/30/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
11
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
08/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/13/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/13/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
08/22/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
16
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.