Clyde Taylor, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2013-bk-03794 (alnb)

Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr. (RE: related document(s)[36] Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management).

Fill in this information to identify your case: Debtor 1 Clyde Taylor, Jr. First Name Middle Name Last Name Debtor 2 (Spouse if, filing) First Name Middle Name Last Name United States Bankruptcy Court for the: NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA Case number 13-03794 (if known) Official Form 423 Certification About a Financial Management Course 12/15 If you are an individual, you must take an approved course about personal financial management if: you filed for bankruptcy under chapter 7 or 13, or you filed for bankruptcy under chapter 11 and § 1141 (d)(3) does not apply. In a joint case, each debtor must take the course. 11 U.S.C. §§ 727(a)(11) and 1328(g). After you finish the course, the provider will give you a certificate. The provider may notify the court that you have completed the course. If the provider does notify the court, you need not file this form. If the provider does not notify the court, then Debtor 1 and Debtor 2 must each file this form with the certificate number before your debts will be discharged. If you filed under chapter 7 and you need to file this form, file it within 60 days after the first date set for the meeting of creditors under § 341 of the Bankruptcy Code. If you filed under chapter 11 or 13 and you need to file this form, file it before you make the last payment that your plan requires or before you file a motion for a discharge under § 1141(d)(5)(B) or § 1328(b) of the Bankruptcy Code. Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(c). In some cases, the court can waive the requirement to take the financial management course. To have the requirement waived, you must file a motion with the court and obtain a court order. Part 1: Tell the Court About the Required Course. You must check one: I completed an approved course in personal financial management: Date I took the course 01/22/18 Name of approved provider Consumer Financial Education Foundation of America Certificate Number T11823562 I am not required to complete a course in personal financial management because the court has granted my motion for a waiver of the requirement based on (check one): Incapacity. I have a mental illness or a mental deficiency that makes me incapable of realizing or making rational decisions about finances. Disability. My physical disability causes me to be unable to complete a course in personal financial management in person, by phone, or through the internet, even after I reasonably tried to do so. Active duty. I am currently on active military duty in a military combat zone. Residence. I live in a district in which the United States trustee (or bankruptcy administrator) has determined that the approved instructional courses cannot adequately meet my needs. Part 2: Sign Here I certify that the information I have provided is true and correct. /s/ Clyde Taylor, Jr. Clyde Taylor, Jr. Date January 23, 2018 Signature of debtor named on certificate Printed name of debtor Official Form 423 Certification About a Financial Management Course Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 13-03794-TOM13 Doc 39 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 08:50:26 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 T11823562 Clyde Taylor Jr. 22nd day of January, 2018. Case 13-03794-TOM13 Doc 39 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 08:50:26 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr.

B2830 (Form 2830) (4/16) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA In re Clyde Taylor, Jr. Case No. 13-03794 Debtor(s) CHAPTER 13 DEBTOR'S CERTIFICATIONS REGARDING DOMESTIC SUPPORT OBLIGATIONS AND SECTION 522(q) Part I. Certification Regarding Domestic Support Obligations (check no more than one) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1328(a), I certify that: I owed no domestic support obligation when I filed my bankruptcy petition, and I have not been required to pay any such obligation since then. I am or have been required to pay a domestic support obligation. I have paid all such amounts that my chapter 13 plan required me to pay. I have also paid all such amounts that became due between the filing of my bankruptcy petition and today. Part II. If you checked the second box, you must provide the information below. My current address: My current employer and my employer's address: Part III. Certification Regarding Section 522(q) (check no more than one) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1328(h), I certify that: I have not claimed an exemption pursuant to §522(b)(3) and state or local law (1) in property that I or a dependent of mine uses as a residence, claims as homestead, or acquired as a burial plot, as specified in §522(p)(1), and (2) that exceeds $160,375* in value in the aggregate. I have claimed an exemption in property pursuant to §522(b)(3) and state or local law (1) that I or a dependent of mine uses as a residence, claims as a homestead, or acquired as a burial plot, as specified in §522(p)(1), and (2) that exceeds $160,375* in value in the aggregate. Part IV. Debtor's Signature I certify under penalty of perjury that the information provided in these certifications is true and correct to the best of my knowledge and belief. Executed on January 23, 2018 /s/ Clyde Taylor, Jr. Date Clyde Taylor, Jr. Debtor *Amounts are subjected to adjustment on 4/01/19, and every 3 years thereafter with respect to cases commenced on or after the date of adjustment. Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 13-03794-TOM13 Doc 40 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 08:51:40 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 1/23/2018.

Information to identify the case: Debtor 1 Clyde Taylor Jr. Social Security number or ITIN xxx−xx−7198 First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ Debtor 2 Social Security number or ITIN _ _ _ _ First Name Middle Name Last Name (Spouse, if filing) EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION Case number: 13−03794−TOM13 Order of Discharge (12/15) IT IS ORDERED: A discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 1328(a) is granted to: Clyde Taylor Jr. By the court: Tamara O Mitchell Dated: 1/23/18 United States Bankruptcy Judge Explanation of Bankruptcy Discharge in a Chapter 13 Case This order does not close or dismiss the case. Most debts are discharged Most debts are covered by the discharge, but Creditors cannot collect discharged debts not all. Generally, a discharge removes the debtors' personal liability for debts provided for This order means that no one may make any by the chapter 13 plan. attempt to collect a discharged debt from the debtors personally. For example, creditors cannot In a case involving community property: Special sue, garnish wages, assert a deficiency, or rules protect certain community property owned otherwise try to collect from the debtors personally by the debtor's spouse, even if that spouse did on discharged debts. Creditors cannot contact the not file a bankruptcy case. debtors by mail, phone, or otherwise in any attempt to collect the debt personally. Creditors who violate this order can be required to pay Some debts are not discharged debtors damages and attorney's fees. Examples of debts that are not discharged are: However, a creditor with a lien may enforce a claim against the debtors' property subject to that ♦ debts that are domestic support lien unless the lien was avoided or eliminated. For obligations; example, a creditor may have the right to foreclose a home mortgage or repossess an automobile. ♦ debts for most student loans; This order does not prevent debtors from paying any debt voluntarily. 11 U.S.C. § 524(f). ♦ debts for certain types of taxes specified in 11 U.S.C. §§ 507(a)(8)(C), 523(a)(1)(B), or 523(a)(1)(C) to the extent not paid in full under the plan; For more information, see page 2 > ATTENTION DEBTOR: IMPORTANT DOCUMENT! PLEASE KEEP FOR YOUR RECORDS! Form 3180W Chapter 13 Discharge page 1 Case 13-03794-TOM13 Doc 41 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:27:23 Desc Ch 13 Discharge Page 1 of 2 ♦ debts that the bankruptcy court has ♦ debts for restitution, or damages, decided or will decide are not discharged awarded in a civil action against the in this bankruptcy case; debtor as a result of malicious or willful injury by the debtor that caused personal injury to an individual or the ♦ debts for most fines, penalties, forfeitures, death of an individual; and or criminal restitution obligations; ♦ debts for death or personal injury ♦ some debts which the debtors did not caused by operating a vehicle while properly list; intoxicated. ♦ debts provided for under 11 U.S.C. § In addition, this discharge does not stop 1322(b)(5) and on which the last payment creditors from collecting from anyone else who or other transfer is due after the date on is also liable on the debt, such as an insurance which the final payment under the plan company or a person who cosigned or was due; guaranteed a loan. ♦ debts for certain consumer purchases made after the bankruptcy case was filed if This information is only a general obtaining the trustee's prior approval of summary of a chapter 13 discharge; some incurring the debt was practicable but was exceptions exist. Because the law is not obtained; complicated, you should consult an attorney to determine the exact effect of the discharge in this case. Form 3180W Chapter 13 Discharge page 2 Case 13-03794-TOM13 Doc 41 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:27:23 Desc Ch 13 Discharge Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 273 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/26/2013
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $281 Filed by Clyde Taylor Jr.
3
08/26/2013
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr.
4
08/26/2013
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr.
08/26/2013
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(13-03794-13) [misc,volp13] (281.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 15543305. Fee Amount 281.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/27/2013
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
6
08/26/2013
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/02/2013 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing will be set at a later date. Proof of Claim due by 12/31/2013. Government Proof of Claim due by 02/24/2014 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/02/2013.
7
08/27/2013
Notice of Confirmation Hearing Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/5/2013 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 2 (BGC) Birmingham.
8
08/27/2013
Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To File Proper Schedules Incomplete Filings due by 9/3/2013. Show Cause hearing to be held on 9/17/2013 at 02:00 PM at 505 20th St N Ctrm 2 (BGC) Financial Ctr Birmingham.
9
08/27/2013
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr.
10
08/27/2013
Tax Documents for the Year for 2012 Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr.
11
08/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13) Southern Division). Notice Date 08/29/2013.
12
08/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing). Notice Date 08/29/2013.
13
08/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 08/29/2013.
14
08/29/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Notice Date 08/29/2013.
15
09/03/2013
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
16
10/03/2013
Meeting of Creditors Held 10/02/2013.
17
11/13/2013
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
18
11/20/2013
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 11/20/2013.
19
11/22/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 11/22/2013.
20
02/20/2014
Trustee Objection to Claim 12 of creditor ALABAMA POSTAL CREDIT UNION in the amount of $4495.94 Filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford.
21
02/21/2014
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 20 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford). Hearing scheduled 4/1/2014 at 01:45 PM at Courtroom 2 (BGC) Birmingham.
22
02/23/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/23/2014.
23
04/04/2014
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #20; Trustee's Objection to Claim #12 of Alabama Postal Credit Union in the amount of $4,495.94) Hearing scheduled 04/15/2014 at 01:45 PM at Courtroom 2 (BGC) Birmingham.
24
04/17/2014
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #20; Trustee's Objection to Claim #12 of Alabama Postal Credit Union in the amount of $4,495.94) Hearing scheduled 04/29/2014 at 01:45 PM at Courtroom 2 (BGC) Birmingham.
25
05/01/2014
Notice and Order RE: Doc #20; Trustee's Objection to Claim #12 of Alabama Postal Credit Union in the amount of $4,495.94. Hearing scheduled 06/12/2014 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham
26
05/01/2014
For cause, it is ordered that the foregoing case is to be reassigned and transferred from Judge Benjamin G Cohen to Judge Tamara O Mitchell.
27
05/03/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Notice and Order). Notice Date 05/03/2014.
28
06/11/2014
Response to (Re Item: 20 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford) Filed by Creditor Alabama Postal Credit Union
29
06/12/2014
PDF with attached Audio File - Recording Date/Time [6/12/14 10:08 AM] Run Time [00:00:48] File Size [ 570 KB] RE: Doc #20; Trustee's Objection to Claim #12 of Alabama Postal Credit Union in the amount of $4,495.94
30
06/17/2014
ORDER Overruling Signed on 06/17/2014 RE: Doc #20; Trustee's Objection to Claim #12 of Alabama Postal Credit Union in the amount of $4,495.94.
31
06/19/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order Overruling). Notice Date 06/19/2014.
32
07/07/2017
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Ally Financial serviced by Ally Servicing LLC (Claim No. 5) To Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
07/07/2017
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(13-03794-TOM13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20896136. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 32) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
07/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC). Notice Date 07/09/2017.
34
11/14/2017
Trustee's Letter to Cease Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
35
01/08/2018
Trustee's Certification of Plan Completion. (Ch13troffice, tt)
36
01/08/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management for Debtor., Notice of Requirement to File Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q). Financial Management Course due:2/7/2018.
37
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
38
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
39
01/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr. (RE: related document(s)[36] Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management).
40
01/23/2018
Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Clyde Taylor Jr.
05/24/2018
Request for Trustee's Final Report (For Court Users Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/23/2018
Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 1/23/2018.
doc
05/25/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.