Cole Sprinkle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00268 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/14/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
08/14/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/15/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
6
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
7
08/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
8
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
08/29/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/29/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
08/30/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
09/05/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
16
09/12/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
09/13/2018
Calendar Remark (Matter Continued / Rescheduled) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
09/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
09/14/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
09/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.