Cole Sprinkle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00017 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/18/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
01/18/2019
Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/18/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
3
01/18/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
4
01/18/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
5
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
6
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
01/21/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/22/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
01/22/2019
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/22/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
01/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
02/01/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/01/2019
Credit Counseling Deficiency to Chambers (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
02/08/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
14
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
02/12/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
17
03/01/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
18
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
03/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/05/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
03/15/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
21
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.