Cole v. Gene by Gene, Ltd.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2014-cv-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
195
07/24/2018
USCA Order
196
08/21/2018
USCA Order
197
10/02/2018
USCA Order
198
10/10/2018
USCA Mandate
199
12/21/2018
Summary Judgment
200
12/21/2018
Declaration
201
01/04/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
01/08/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
203
01/25/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
204
01/25/2019
Declaration
205
01/25/2019
Seal Document
207
01/29/2019
Order on Motion to Seal Document
208
01/30/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
02/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.