Coleen Louise Mueller
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00396 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/12/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
11/12/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/12/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/13/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/15/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
11
11/19/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11/28/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/28/2018
Comply (SA)
13
12/07/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
14
12/07/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
15
12/07/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
12/27/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
12/27/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
18
12/27/2018
Certificate of Service
19
12/27/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
01/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
01/28/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/31/2019
Proceeding Memo
22
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
23
02/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
24
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
25
02/18/2019
Entry of Appearance
26
03/12/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
27
03/12/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
28
03/13/2019
Proceeding Memo
29
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.