Conger v. K & D Fisheries LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00231 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
02/06/2018
ORDER: re Renewed Seaman's Motion to Reinstate Maintenance and Cure 35 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/06/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
46
05/22/2018
Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment
47
06/20/2018
Expedite
48
07/02/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
07/12/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
07/31/2018
Amend/Correct
52
08/15/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
53
08/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
09/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
09/13/2018
Trial Brief
57
09/18/2018
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
09/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
09/21/2018
Bench Trial - Begun
60
09/21/2018
Witness List Public Doc
61
09/21/2018
Exhibit List
62
09/24/2018
Order
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
12/06/2018
Dismiss
12/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.