Continental Circuits LLC v. Intel Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-cv-02026 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 473 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/22/2016
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13100710 filed by Continental Circuits LLC. (submitted by Joseph Schenk)
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116040274" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116040274','987227','12','','2','1','',''}};">6</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
6 Attachments
2
06/22/2016
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13100710. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-02026-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116040330" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116040330','987227','14','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent)
1 Attachment
3
06/23/2016
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Continental Circuits LLC.
4
06/23/2016
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Complaint filed by Continental Circuits LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. For future reference, the automated Civil Cover Sheet can be found on www.azd.uscourt.gov under the Rules, General Orders & Forms tab, under Forms. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
5
06/23/2016
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.

Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116040397" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116040397','987227','21','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> AO 121)
1 Attachment
6
06/23/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Circuits LLC.
7
06/24/2016
*NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLC. *Modified to correct event on 8/22/2016*
8
06/24/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Bradley W Caldwell on behalf of Continental Circuits LLC.
9
06/24/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jason D Cassady on behalf of Continental Circuits LLC.
10
06/24/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jason S McManis on behalf of Continental Circuits LLC.
11
06/24/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John Austin Curry on behalf of Continental Circuits LLC.
12
06/24/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Warren J McCarty III on behalf of Continental Circuits LLC.
06/24/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 175, receipt number PHX173358 as to Bradley W Caldwell, Jason D Cassady, John Austin Curry, Warren J McCarty, Jason S McManis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/24/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
14
07/06/2016
*Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified on 7/8/2016 to Reflect District Judge Assignment Not Magistrate Consent; NEF regenerated (MAP)/
15
07/08/2016
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-16-2026-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
16
07/08/2016
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/8/2016.
17
07/08/2016
NOTICE re: Service of Court's Order by Continental Circuits LLC re: 16 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions.
18
07/14/2016
SUMMONS Submitted by Continental Circuits LLC.
19
07/14/2016
SUMMONS Submitted by Continental Circuits LLC.
20
07/15/2016
Summons Issued as to Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, Intel Corporation. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025116130551" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025116130551','987227','68','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Summons)
1 Attachment
21
07/27/2016
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Continental Circuits LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint for Patent Infringement, Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet upon Intel Corporation on 7/15/2016.
22
07/27/2016
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Continental Circuits LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint for Patent Infringement, Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet upon Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation on 7/15/2016.
23
08/01/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ibiden Company Limited. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
24
08/01/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
25
08/02/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intel Corporation.
26
08/04/2016
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth
1 Attachment
27
08/05/2016
ORDER pursuant to 26 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 10/4/2016. The Court will not grant further extension to this deadline absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/5/2016.
28
08/15/2016
SUMMONS Submitted by Continental Circuits LLC.
29
08/16/2016
Summons Issued as to Ibiden Company Limited. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
30
08/16/2016
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Continental Circuits LLC: Acknowledgment of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint for Patent Infringement, Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet upon Ibiden Co., Ltd. on 8/16/2016.
31
09/07/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Frank J West on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited and Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
32
09/07/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard D Kelly on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited and Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
33
09/07/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lisa M Mandrusiak on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited and Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
34
09/07/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jacob A Doughty on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited and Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
09/08/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX176099 as to Frank J West. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/08/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX176100 as to Richard D Kelly. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/08/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX176097 as to Lisa M Mandrusiak. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/08/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX176098 as to Jacob A Doughty. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
09/08/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
36
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elizabeth M Reilly on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, and Intel Corporation.
37
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sarah Beigbeder Petty on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, and Intel Corporation.
38
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nina Tallon on behalf of Intel Corporation.
39
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard W O'Neill on behalf of Intel Corporation.
40
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joseph J Mueller on behalf of Intel Corporation.
41
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joseph F Haag on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, and Intel Corporation.
42
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Rachel Weiner Cohen on behalf of Intel Corporation.
43
09/14/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jason Choy on behalf of Intel Corporation.
09/15/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 270, receipt number PHX176471 as to Elizabeth M Reilly, Sarah Beigbeder Petty, Joseph F Haag, Nina Tallon, Richard W ONeill, Joseph J Mueller, Rachel Weiner Cohen, Jason Choy. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
09/15/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
45
09/15/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Steven Campbell on behalf of Intel Corporation.
46
09/15/2016
NOTICE re: Representation in Pro Hac Vice Applications by Intel Corporation.
47
09/21/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney William F Lee on behalf of Intel Corporation.
09/21/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX176713 as to William F Lee. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
09/21/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
49
10/04/2016
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
50
10/04/2016
DECLARATION of Kenneth M. Motolenich-Salas re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
4
Exhibit Exhibit D
5
Exhibit Exhibit E
6
Exhibit Exhibit F
7
Exhibit Exhibit G
8
Exhibit Exhibit H)(Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth
8 Attachments
51
10/04/2016
ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/4/2016.
52
10/04/2016
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Intel Corporation.
53
10/04/2016
DECLARATION of Jason Choy in Support of Intel Corporation's Motion to Dismiss re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Defendant Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
19 Attachments
54
10/21/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
55
10/21/2016
DECLARATION of Jason S. McManis re: 54 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
7 Attachments
56
10/24/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Akihiro Yamazaki on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited and Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
10/25/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177874 as to Akihiro Yamazaki. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
10/25/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
58
10/31/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
59
10/31/2016
DECLARATION of Kenneth M. Motolenich-Salas re: 58 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
1
Exhibit I
2
Exhibit J
3
Exhibit K
4
Exhibit L)(Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth
4 Attachments
60
10/31/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Intel Corporation.
61
11/10/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A Protective Order
2
Exhibit B ESI Order
2 Attachments
62
11/17/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Intel Corporation for proceedings held on November 17, 2016, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
63
11/18/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on November 17, 2016, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
64
11/17/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 11/17/2016. Telephonic Scheduling Conference is reset for 12/2/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 4:14 PM to 4:53 PM.
65
11/23/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
66
11/29/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, Intel Corporation.
67
11/19/2016
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings held on 11/17/2016, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Elva Cruz-Lauer). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2017.
68
12/01/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A - ESI Order
2
Exhibit B - Protective Order
2 Attachments
69
12/02/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Tallon on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
70
12/02/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/2/2016. Court has reviewed and approves the revised protective and ESI orders. Court will enter the orders. Revised case management report discussed. Court will enter a case management order. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Bradley Caldwell, Warren McCarty III, Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Chad Campbell and Aaron Matz for Defendant Intel Corporation. Joseph Mueller and Nina Tallon for Defendants Intel Corporation,Ibiden Company and Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation. Frank West and Kenneth Motolenich-Salas for Defendant Ibiden Company and Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:08 PM to 3:23 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
71
12/02/2016
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/2/2016.
72
12/02/2016
ORDER re ESI. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/2/2016.
73
12/02/2016
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/3/2017. Dispositive motions due by 3/30/2018. Status Conference set for 3/2/2017 at 03:00 PM Status Conference set for 6/2/2017 at 03:00 PM Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/4/2017 at 10:00 AM Status Conference set for 9/5/2017 at 03:00 PM Status Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 03:00 PM Status Conference set for 3/9/2018 at 03:00 PM all in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/2/2016.
74
12/02/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
75
12/02/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intel Corporation for proceedings held on December 2, 2016, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
76
12/02/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
77
12/05/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on December 2, 2016, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
78
12/05/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
79
12/06/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
80
12/06/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
81
12/07/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
82
12/09/2016
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings held on 12/02/2016, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2017.
83
12/21/2016
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Richard D. Kelly, Frank J. West, Jacob A. Doughty, Akihiro Yamazaki, and Lisa M. Mandrusiak of Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, P.C. by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion.
1
Text of Proposed Order)(Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth
1 Attachment
84
12/22/2016
ORDER granting 83 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Richard D. Kelly, Frank J. West, Jacob A. Doughty, Akihiro Yamazaki, and Lisa M. Mandrusiak of Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, P.C. are removed as counsel of record for Ibiden U.S.A. Corp. and Ibiden Co., Ltd. in this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/16.
85
12/22/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
86
12/22/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
87
12/22/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, Intel Corporation.
88
12/30/2016
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
89
01/04/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
90
01/05/2017
ORDER: Hearing as to 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. The Court has allotted 30 minutes per side for argument. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/5/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
91
01/09/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
92
01/09/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
93
01/13/2017
IT IS ORDERED the motion hearing for 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Intel Corporation, 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, Ibiden Company Limited presently set for 2/3/2017 at 10:00 AM, is RESET. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY! Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Ordered by Judge David G Campbell. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
94
01/19/2017
IT IS ORDERED the motion hearing for 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Intel Corporation, 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, Ibiden Company Limited presently set for 2/3/2017 at 3:00 PM, is RESET. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY! Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Ordered by Judge David G Campbell. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
95
01/26/2017
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion, Intel Corporation filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
96
01/26/2017
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A - Amended Complaint
1 Attachment
97
01/26/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading 95 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header.
98
01/31/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
99
01/31/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
100
02/01/2017
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney the firm of Gallagher & Kennedy and counsel Kenneth Motolenich-Salas by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order)(Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth
1 Attachment
101
02/01/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Steven Campbell on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
102
02/01/2017
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to withdraw (Doc. 100) is granted. Kenneth Motolenich-Salas of Gallagher & Kennedy, P.A. is removed as counsel of record forIbiden U.S.A. Corp. and Ibiden Co., Ltd. in this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/17.
103
02/01/2017
NOTICE re: Joint Notice to Update the Court Regarding Recent Case Developments Affecting Motions to Dismiss by Continental Circuits LLC re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.
104
02/02/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
105
02/03/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
106
02/03/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
107
02/03/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2017.ORDERED taking under advisement 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; taking under advisement 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Court will issue an order. APPEARANCES: Bradley Caldwell, Warren McCarty III, Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Joseph Mueller, Nina Tallon, Chad Campbell for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 10:00 AM to 11:29 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
108
02/07/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS HEARING by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 2/3/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
109
02/07/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation for proceedings held on February 3, 2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
110
02/14/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING Proceedings held on 02/03/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017.
111
02/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
112
02/21/2017
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/21/2017.
113
03/02/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
114
03/02/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference held on 3/2/2017. Discussion held. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jason Cassady, Warrren McCarty III and Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Joseph Mueller, Chad Campbell and Matt Holt for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:02 PM to 3:13 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
115
03/03/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Telephonic Status Conference by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 3/2/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
116
03/03/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation for proceedings held on March 2, 2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
117
03/06/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
118
03/06/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
119
03/08/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
120
03/08/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
121
03/08/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Reese Bowen on behalf of Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
122
03/11/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
123
03/13/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document JOINT MOTION TO SEAL SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
124
03/13/2017
*FILED at Doc. 128 *SEALED LODGED Proposed SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT re: 123 Joint MOTION to Seal Document JOINT MOTION TO SEAL SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Continental Circuits LLC. *.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025117123024" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025117123024','987227','396','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Exhibit E) *Modified on 3/17/2017
5 Attachments
125
03/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
126
03/10/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 03/02/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2017.
127
03/17/2017
ORDER granting 123 Motion to Seal. ORDERED The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal the document lodged as Doc. 124 on the Court's docket. FURTHER ORDERED On or before 3/24/17 Plaintiff shall file a redacted version of the Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement on the public docket in this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/17/17.
128
03/17/2017
SEALED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025117141851" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025117141851','987227','405','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Exhibit E)
5 Attachments
129
03/22/2017
ORDER. Telephone Conference re potential motion to dismiss amended complaint set for 3/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/22/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
130
03/24/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 3/24/2017. Defendant's request leave of Court to file motion to dismiss as to portions of plaintiff's second amended complaint. Discussion held. Request granted. Defendants' motion to dismiss 12-15 pages due 3/31/17; Plaintiff response 12-15 pages due 4/12/17; defendants reply 7 pages due 4/19/17. Oral argument to be set if necessary after briefing. A mediation deadline is set for 9/29/2017. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Bradley Caldwell, Jason Cassady, Warrn McCarty III, Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Joseph Mueller and Chad Campbell for Defendants (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 10:02 AM to 10:34 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
131
03/24/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Telephone Conference by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 3/24/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
132
03/24/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intel Corporation for proceedings held on 03/24/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
133
03/24/2017
REDACTED Second Amended Complaint re: 128 Amended Complaint by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025117175580" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025117175580','987227','417','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Exhibit E) Modified on 3/30/2017
5 Attachments
134
03/27/2017
ANSWER to 128 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Continental Circuits LLC by Intel Corporation.
135
03/27/2017
ANSWER to 128 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Continental Circuits LLC by Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Ibiden Company Limited.
136
03/29/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
137
03/28/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE proceedings held on 03/24/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Candy L. Potter). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2017.
138
03/30/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading 133, 134, 135 have been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header
139
03/30/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
140
03/31/2017
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Discovery Requests by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation. *Modified to correct event type on 4/3/2017
141
03/31/2017
*NOTICE of Service of Discovery re: Discovery Requests by Intel Corporation. *Modified to correct event type on 4/3/2017
142
03/31/2017
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereof (Redacted Version) by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
143
03/31/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document Defendants Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, And Ibiden Co. Ltd.s Partial Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLCs Second Amended Complaint And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
144
03/31/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Defendants Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, And Ibiden Co. Ltd.s Partial Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLCs Second Amended Complaint And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (Confidential Version) re: 143 Joint MOTION to Seal Document Defendants Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, And Ibiden Co. Ltd.s Partial Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLCs Second Amended Complaint And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
145
04/03/2017
NOTICE re: Service of Subpoenas by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
146
04/12/2017
ORDER granting the parties' 143 Joint Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal the document lodged on the Court's docket as Doc. 144. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 04/12/2017.
147
04/12/2017
SEALED PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Continental Circuit LLC's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
148
04/12/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document JOINT MOTION TO SEAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
149
04/12/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed CONTINENTIAL CIRCUIT LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re: 148 Joint MOTION to Seal Document JOINT MOTION TO SEAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Declaration of Jason S. McManis
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
4 Attachments
150
04/14/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
151
04/17/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
152
04/17/2017
ANSWER to 134 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Continental Circuits LLC.
153
04/17/2017
ANSWER to 135 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Continental Circuits LLC.
154
04/19/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
155
04/19/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 142 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thereof (Redacted Version) filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
156
04/19/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Partial Motion to Dismiss Continental Circuits LLC's Second Amended Complaint by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
157
04/19/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLC's Second Amended Complaint (Confidential Version) re: 156 Joint MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Partial Motion to Dismiss Continental Circuits LLC's Second Amended Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
158
04/20/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading 152 and 153 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header
159
04/26/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
160
04/26/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
161
04/26/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
162
04/26/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
163
04/26/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
164
04/27/2017
ORDER granting 156 Joint Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall accept for filing under seal the document lodged on the Court's docket as Doc. 157. If a redacted version of this document has not been filed in the public record, Defendants shall do so no later than May 3, 2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/27/17.
165
04/27/2017
SEALED REPLY re: 147 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
166
04/27/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
167
05/03/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
168
05/08/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
169
05/11/2017
ORDER granting 148 Motion to Seal. The following documents are sealed: Continental Circuits LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/11/17.
170
05/11/2017
SEALED RESPONSE (OPPOSITION) to Motion re: 147 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Declaration of Jason McManis
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025117360044" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025117360044','987227','567','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Exhibit A - C)
2 Attachments
171
05/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
172
05/23/2017
MINTUE ORDER: Plaintiff Continental Circuits, LLC shall file a redacted version of their opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss on the public docket by 5/26/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
173
05/25/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
174
05/25/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
175
05/26/2017
REDACTION to 170 Response to Motion REDACTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
McManis Declaration
2
Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A
3
Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
4 Attachments
176
06/01/2017
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Claim Construction Briefing and Number of Terms by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
177
06/01/2017
STATEMENT of Plaintiff's and Defendants' Joint Claim Construction Statement by Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLC.
178
06/02/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
179
06/02/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
180
06/02/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference held on 6/2/2017. Joint stipulated request regarding claim construction briefing page limits and number of terms 176 discussed. Motion granted. Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jason Cassady, Warren McCarty III, Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Joseph Mueller and Chad Campbell for Defendants (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 3:03 PM to 3:09 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
181
06/02/2017
ORDER granting 176 (1) the page limit for opening and responsiveclaim construction briefs is twenty-two pages; and (2) the parties may present the Court with three categories of claim construction disputes (not including disputes over terms that Defendants assert are indefinite) as set forth in the parties Joint Claim Construction Statement, even if those disputes implicate more than ten claim terms. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/2/2017.
182
06/05/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Status Conference by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 6/2/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
183
06/05/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ibiden Company Limited, Intel Corporation for proceedings held on June 2, 2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
184
06/06/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited.
185
06/07/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
186
06/06/2017
*(AMENDED BY DOC. 187)- *NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Proceedings held on 06/02/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter Jennifer A. Pancratz). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (RCO) *Modified file date from 6/7/17 to 6/6/17; NEF regenerated on 6/7/2017 (SCH). *Modified to reference amended version on 6/7/2017
187
06/07/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Proceedings held on 06/02/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter Jennifer A. Pancratz). Amended to correct case type on cover page. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017.
188
06/08/2017
OPENING BRIEF by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation (Redacted Opening Markman Brief).
1
Affidavit Declaration of Jason Choy
2
Exhibits Index
3
Exhibits 1-14
4
Exhibits 15-19
5
Exhibit 20
6
Exhibits 21-22
7
Exhibits 23-24
7 Attachments
189
06/08/2017
OPENING BRIEF by Continental Circuits LLC CONTINENTAL CIRCUITS LLC'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF.
1
Declaration of Warren J. McCarty
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
6
Exhibit E
7
Exhibit F
8
Exhibit G
9
Exhibit H
10
Exhibit I
10 Attachments
190
06/08/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document 188 Brief - Opening (Markman) by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
191
06/08/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, and Ibiden Co. Ltd.'s Opening Marking Brief, Exhibits 15 & 16 re: 190 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 188 Brief - Opening (Markman). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit 15
2
Exhibit 16
2 Attachments
192
06/13/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
193
06/13/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
194
06/19/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
195
06/19/2017
SEALED ORDER granting/denying in part 142 (redacted version), 147 (sealed version) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to State a Claim. The motion is granted as to Plaintiff's (a) direct infringement claims against Ibiden as to unnamed products sold to customers other than Intel, (b) indirect infringement claims related to the unnamed Ibiden products intended for customers other than Intel, and (c) willfulness claims against both Defendants. The motion is denied as to Plaintiff's induced infringement claims against Intel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/17. (All Cnsl)
196
06/19/2017
*SEALED ORDER granting/denying in part 142 (redacted version), 147 (sealed version) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to State a Claim. The motion is granted as to Plaintiff's (a) direct infringement claims against Ibiden as to unnamed products sold to customers other than Intel, (b) indirect infringement claims related to the unnamed Ibiden products intended for customers other than Intel, and (c) willfulness claims against both Defendants. The motion is denied as to Plaintiff's induced infringement claims against Intel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/17. (MAP) *Modified on 6/19/2017 to seal pursuant to DGC Chambers (MAP)*.
197
06/19/2017
ORDER granting/denying in part 142 (redacted version), 147 (sealed version) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to State a Claim. The motion is granted as to Plaintiff's (a) direct infringement claims against Ibiden as to unnamed products sold to customers other than Intel, (b) indirect infringement claims related to the unnamed Ibiden products intended for customers other than Intel, and (c) willfulness claims against both Defendants. The motion is denied as to Plaintiff's induced infringement claims against Intel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/17.
198
06/26/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
199
06/29/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation (Redacted Responsive Markman Brief).
1
Affidavit Declaration of Jason Choy
2
Exhibits Index
3
Exhibits 25 - 30
3 Attachments
200
06/29/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Continental Circuits LLC (Redacted Responsive Claim Construction Brief).
1
Declaration of Warren J. McCarty
2
Exhibit Index
3
Exhibits A-C
4
Exhibits D-I
5
Exhibit J Part 1 of 2
6
Exhibit J Part 2 of 2
7
Exhibits K-N
7 Attachments
201
06/29/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document 199 Brief - Response (Markman) by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
202
06/29/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document 200 Brief - Response (Claim Construction) by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
203
06/29/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, and Ibiden Co. Ltd.'s Responsive Markman Brief re: 201 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 199 Brief - Response (Markman). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit 25
2
Exhibit 26
3
Exhibit 30
3 Attachments
204
06/29/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Continental Circuits LLC's Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Exhibits A & D-G re: 202 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 200 Brief - Response (Claim Construction). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit D
3
Exhibit E
4
Exhibit F
5
Exhibit G
5 Attachments
205
06/30/2017
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Continental Circuits' Second Amended Complaint 128 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Continental Circuits LLC by Intel Corporation.
206
06/30/2017
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Continental Circuits' Second Amended Complaint 128 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Continental Circuits LLC by Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Ibiden Company Limited.
207
07/03/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading 205 and 206 have been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header.
208
07/05/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
209
07/05/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
210
07/05/2017
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Jason S. McManis filed by Warren J McCarty, III.
211
07/06/2017
NOTICE re: Patent Information by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
212
07/12/2017
STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Regarding Proposed Format for Claim Construction Hearing) by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
213
07/14/2017
ANSWER to 205 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Continental Circuits LLC.
214
07/14/2017
ANSWER to 206 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Continental Circuits LLC.
215
07/17/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
216
07/17/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
217
07/17/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
218
07/18/2017
In-Court Hearing regarding claim construction set for 8/4/2017 at 10:00 AM IS MOVED IN TIME ONLY. The in-court hearing regarding claim construction is set for 8:30 AM on 84/2017 in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/18/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
219
07/18/2017
ORDER pursuant to 212 Stipulation re format for claim construction hearing. The hearing shall begin promptly at 8:30 AM to accommodate counsels' format suggestion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/18/2017.
220
07/18/2017
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading 213 and 214 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.

If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.

If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header
221
07/18/2017
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
222
07/19/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
223
07/24/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
224
07/28/2017
ORDER. In preparation for next week's Markman hearing, the parties should file short memoranda explaining the effect that their proposed constructions (or indefiniteness arguments) would have on the merits of this case. Having each party explain its reasons for seeking a proposed construction or decision on indefiniteness will aid the Court in determining precisely what must be decided, understanding the context of the parties' arguments, and arriving at constructions that will be most helpful when eventually placed in jury instructions. The memoranda should be filed by 5:00 PM Arizona time on August 2, 2017, and should not exceed six pages each. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7-28-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
225
08/02/2017
MEMORANDUM (Defendants' Supplemental Markman Brief Regarding the Parties' Proposed Constructions) (Redacted Version) pursuant to 224 Order by Defendants Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
226
08/02/2017
MEMORANDUM CONTINENTAL CIRCUITS LLCS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM PER ORDER DKT. NO. 224 224 Order by Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLC.
227
08/02/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document 225 Memorandum (Defendants' Supplemental Markman Brief Regarding the Parties' Proposed Constructions) by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
228
08/02/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Defendants' Supplemental Markman Brief Regarding the Parties' Proposed Constructions (Confidential Version) re: 227 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 225 Memorandum (Defendants' Supplemental Markman Brief Regarding the Parties' Proposed Constructions). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
229
08/02/2017
ORDER. In advance of Friday's hearing, the parties should jointly compile a list of technical terms and unique words likely to be used during the hearing. The parties should provide the list, organized alphabetically, to the court reporter before the hearing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8-2-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
230
08/03/2017
MEMORANDUM (Redacted Version) CONTINENTAL CIRCUITS LLCS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM PER ORDER DKT. NO. 224 224 Order by Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLC.
231
08/03/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document 226 Memorandum Continental Circuits LLC's Claim Construction Memorandum Per Order Dkt. No. 224 by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
232
08/03/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
233
08/03/2017
*ORDER granting the parties' motions to seal (Docs. 190, 201, 202, 227, 231) are granted. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal the documents lodged on the Court's docket as Docs. 191, 203, 204, 226, and 228. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/3/2017. (ATD) *Modified on 8/3/2017 to unseal; inadvertently filed under sealed event
234
08/03/2017
SEALED OPENING MARKMAN BRIEF re: 188 Opening Brief by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit 15
2
Exhibit 16) (ATD
2 Attachments
235
08/03/2017
SEALED RESPONSIVE MARKMAN BRIEF re: 199 Response Brief by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit 25
2
Exhibit 26
3
Exhibit 30) (ATD
3 Attachments
236
08/03/2017
SEALED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF re: 200 Response Brief by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit D
3
Exhibit E
4
Exhibit F
5
Exhibit G) (ATD
5 Attachments
237
08/03/2017
SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM re: 230 Memorandum by Continental Circuits LLC.
238
08/03/2017
SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL MARKMAN BRIEFING re: 225 Memorandum Supplemental Markman Brief) by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
239
08/04/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Claim Construction Hearing held on 8/4/2017. APPEARANCES: Bradley Caldwell, Jason Cassady, Warren McCarty III, Justin Nemunaitis, Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Joseph Mueller, Nina Tallon, Chad Campbell for Defendants A Telephone Conference is set for 8/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 8:31 AM to 1:51 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
240
08/05/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Claim Construction Hearing by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 8/4/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
241
08/07/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
242
08/08/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation for proceedings held on 08/04/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
243
08/09/2017
ORDER re: 189, 188 Markman Briefing and hearing. See Order for additional detail. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/2017.
244
08/11/2017
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Elizabeth M. Reilly filed by Chad Steven Campbell.
245
08/14/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
246
08/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Intel Corporation.
247
08/15/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation.
248
08/17/2017
ORDER re: 239 In-Court Hearing, Set/Reset Hearings, Common Prompts (Text Only). Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a conference call to include all counsel and the Court for the 8/24/2017 telephonic hearing at 10:00 AM If counsel prefers to use a dial-in number, counsel shall email the dial-in information to all counsel and the Court no later than 8/22/2017 at 4:00 PM Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/17/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
249
08/18/2017
APPLICATION re: Commission to Take Oral Deposition of Japanese Witnesses by Plaintiff Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
250
08/18/2017
NOTICE re: Joint Notice Pursuant to Markman Order by Continental Circuits LLC re: 243 Order.
251
08/18/2017
ORDER re: 249 Application filed by Continental Circuits LLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/18/2017.
252
08/21/2017
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ibiden Company Limited.
253
08/14/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MARKMAN HEARING proceedings held on 08/04/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2017.
254
08/24/2017
ORDER. As requested in the Court's order at Doc. 243, the parties have conferred and proposed a deadline for the means plus function briefing. Doc. 250. In light of today's conference call, the deadline for the briefing will be September 15, 2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8-24-17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
255
08/24/2017
*(AMENDED BY DOC. 258) - TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Telephone Conference by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 8/24/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). *Modified to reference amended version on 8/24/2017
256
08/24/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 8/24/2017. Discussion held re: stipulation non-infringement under Court order and stay of case. Status hearing set for 9/5/2017 at 3:00 PM remains. Parties shall be prepared to discuss further the stipulation and stay of case. Court will enter a text order on the briefing extension from 9/8/2017 to 9/15/2017. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Jason Cassady, Bradley Caldwell, Warren McCarty III, Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Joseph Mueller, Chad Campbell, Matt Holt for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 10:04 AM to 10:20 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
257
08/24/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation for proceedings held on August 24, 2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
258
08/24/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST AMENDED by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 8/24/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
259
08/25/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE proceedings held on 08/24/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2017.
260
09/05/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Conference held on 9/5/2017. Stipulation of dismissal and stay of case discussed. Court will stay all litigation deadlines. Parties to file by close of business on 9/7/2017 a stipulation of dismissal. If the parties are unable to file the stipulation, a conference call will be placed to the Court by 4:00 PM on 9/7/2017. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Jason Cassady, Warren McCarty III, Bradley Caldwell, John Curry, Joseph Schenk for Plaintiff. Chad Campbell and Joseph Mueller for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:11 PM to 3:16 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
261
09/05/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Continental Circuits LLC for proceedings held on 9/5/2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
262
09/05/2017
NOTICE re: Lodging by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
4
Exhibit Exhibit D (redacted)
5
Exhibit Exhibit E Part 1 of 3 (redacted)
6
Exhibit Exhibit E Part 2 of 3 (redacted)
7
Exhibit Exhibit E Part 3 of 3 (redacted)
7 Attachments
263
09/05/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document Portions of the Joint Notice of Lodging by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
264
09/05/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Sealed Exhibits D and E. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit Sealed Exhibit E Part 1 of 3
2
Exhibit Sealed Exhibit E Part 2 of 3
3
Exhibit Sealed Exhibit E Part 3 of 3
3 Attachments
265
09/06/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation for proceedings held on September 5, 2017, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s).
266
09/07/2017
STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT AND NON-INDEFINITENESS by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit A-D
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
267
09/07/2017
Joint MOTION to Seal Document 266 Stipulation and Joint Motion for Entry of Final Judgment of Non-Infringement and Non-Indefiniteness by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
268
09/07/2017
SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibits A - D to Stipulation and Joint Motion for Entry of Final Judgment of Non-Infringement and Non-Indefiniteness re: 267 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 266 Stipulation and Joint Motion for Entry of Final Judgment of Non-Infringement and Non-Indefiniteness. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit B
2
Exhibit C
3
Exhibit D Part 1 of 2
4
Exhibit D Part 2 of 2
4 Attachments
269
09/13/2017
ORDER granting 263, 267 Motions to Seal. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal the documents lodged as Docs. 264 and 268 on the Court's docket. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/12/17.
270
09/13/2017
Sealed Exhibits to 262 Joint Notice of Lodging by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation.
1
Exhibit E Part 1 of 4
2
Exhibit E Part 2 of 4
3
Exhibit E Part 3 of 4
4
Exhibit E Part 4 of 4)(MAP
4 Attachments
271
09/13/2017
Sealed Exhibits A - D to 266 Stipulation and Joint Motion for Entry of Final Judgment of Non-Infringement and Non-Indefiniteness by Continental Circuits LLC.
1
Exhibit B
2
Exhibit C
3
Exhibit D Part 1 of 2
4
Exhibit D Part 2 of 2)(MAP
4 Attachments
272
09/06/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 09/05/2017, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2017.
273
09/13/2017
FINAL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to and for the reasons set forth in Continental Circuits LLC'sand Defendants Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, and Ibiden Co., Ltd.'s September 7, 2017 Stipulation And Joint Motion For Entry Of Final Judgment Of Non-Infringement And Non-Indefiniteness 266 THE COURT ENTERS FINAL JUDGMENT of: 1. non-infringement of all asserted claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,501,582 ("the '582 patent"), U.S. Patent No. 8,278,560 ("the '560 patent"), U.S. Patent No. 8,581,105 ("the '105 patent"), and U.S. Patent No. 9,374,912 ("the '912 patent") (collectively the ("Patents-in-Suit") in view of the Court's construction of the Category 1 terms in the Claim Construction Order (ECF No. 243); and 2. non-indefiniteness under 35 U.S.C.
274
10/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Federal Circuit re: 273 Judgment, 243 Order by Continental Circuits LLC. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-14742290.
275
10/19/2017
USCA Case Number re: 274 Notice of Appeal. Case number 18-1076, Federal Circuit.
276
10/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Federal Circuit re: 273 Judgment, 243 Order by Ibiden Company Limited, Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Intel Corporation. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-14779083.
277
10/26/2017
Federal Circuit Case Number re: 276 Notice of Appeal. Case number 18-1103, Federal Circuit.
278
10/27/2017
NOTICE by Continental Circuits LLC Regarding Federal Circuit Transcript Purchase Order Form 22 - A transcript is already on file.
279
02/15/2018
MANDATE for the Federal Circuit granting the motion to voluntarily dismiss 18-1103 re: 276 Notice of Appeal filed by Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Ibiden Company Limited, Intel Corporation.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.